King v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Matthew King
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv00800
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FAIRFIELD
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/15/2017. (cw)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS granting 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Objections to R&R due by 11/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/25/2017. (ew)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Matthew King is AWARDED attorney fees in the amount of $1,893.75. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/16/2011. (cw)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/19/2011. (pes1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew King
Represented By: Marcia W Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?