Barbour v. Federal Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Barbour
Defendant: Federal Prisons, State Prisons, State Mental Facilities, Local Jails and Private Prisons
Case Number: 2:2010cv00978
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 32 Motion on Appellate Leave to Repeal Dismissal, as this Court has no authority to overrule orders issued by the Court of Appeals. To the extent that Mr. Barbour has directed his filing to this Court, he is requesting relief which simply cannot be granted. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/09/2013. (dh1)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Impeachment. The Clerk is directed not to accept any additional filings from Mr. Barbour in this case, and to return those filings to him, unless they are accompanied by a certificate from a licensed attorney that there is a good faith basis for making that filing. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/01/2012. (dh1)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 1 and DISMISSING this case. This dismissal does not eliminate Plaintiff's obligation to pay the $350.00 filing fee, which was due at the time he filed his complaint, and that fee is assessed as well. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/09/2011. (dh1)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this case be dismissed for failure to pay the required filing fee. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 1/10/2011. (er1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbour v. Federal Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Mental Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Jails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?