Reynolds v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Dorothea Reynolds
Defendant: Robert W Smith, Ginine Trim, Sheri Duffey, Officer Calhoun, Officer Owens, Luke Meeker, Cynthia Bartlett, Linda Woods, Jennifer Roach, Dean McCombs and John and/or Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2011cv00277
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: UNION
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 230 Motion for Summary Judgment. GRANTING as to Plaintiffs failure to protect claim against defendants Owens, McCombs, Meeker, Wood, Trim, and Calhoun and DENYING in all other respects. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/28/2017. (cw)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 252 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/18/2017. (cw)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 242 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/7/2017. (agm)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 233 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/21/2017. (agm)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying 119 Motion for Reconsideration and in the alternative, Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Review. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/25. (cw)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; OVERRULING Defendants' Objections, DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/8/2015. (cw)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Luke Meeker, Jennifer Roach, Cynthia Bartlett, Dean McCombs, Officer Calhoun, Ginine Trim, Sheri Duffey, Linda Woods, Robert W Smith, Officer Owens. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/1/2015. (pes)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Discovery Dispute Conference Order: counsel participated in a discovery dispute conf w/ Magistrate Judge Abel on 5/7/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/7/13. (sh1)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Stay discovery and case dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/19/13. (sh1)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: the December 14, 2012 settlement mediation is CANCELLED; Order to be mailed to Mediator Fred Gittes, 723 Oak St., Cols. OH 43215. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/9/12. (sh1)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER in re: confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/15/12. (sh1)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Dorothea Reynolds is GRANTED; Plf has an additional 120 days in which to serve Linda Woods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/8/12. (sh1)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 30 Report and Recommendations.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs state law claims and her claims against defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/1/2012. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Reynolds
Represented By: Nader Nabil Malek
Represented By: David B Malik
Represented By: Dennis J Niermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginine Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Meeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?