Cadle et al v. Shelton et al
Plaintiff: Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Life Insurance Company and Mary Beth Cadle
Defendant: Michael Shelton, Michael A. Moseley, Roberta K. Lohiser, Dean P. Lohiser, J.A.M. A Minor Child and W.L.M. A Minor Child
Case Number: 2:2011cv00787
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Agreed Judgment Entry, Order of Disbursement and Dismissal Entry. Upon disbursement of the funds, as indicated in this entry, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice to all future actions. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/01/2013. (dh1)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing the party Defendants, either jointly or independently, to submit a brief status report within 14 days of the date of this Order. The status report(s) should update the Court as to any developments in this case and outline what, if any factual and/or legal issues remain. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/19/2013. (dh1)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 Defendant Michael Shelton's Motion for Summary Judgment. Additionally, the Motion of Defendant, Estate of William L. Moseley III, to Strike Improper Exhibits 16 is denied as moot in light of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/26/2013. (dh1)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER rescheduling the Settlement Conference originally scheduled for 02/25/13 to 03/12/13 at 1:30 p.m. The trial attorneys and parties shall be present at the conference. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/01/2013. (dh1)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER scheduling a Settlement Conference for 2/25/2013 at 1:30 PM. Interpleader Plaintiffs have requested they be excused from the conference and Defendants do not object. The Court will not require Plaintiffs to be present at the conference. No later than 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference, each party shall submit a Confidential Assessment letter to chambers. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/06/13. (dh1)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing Production of Documents within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 1-2-2013. (plb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadle et al v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Cadle
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta K. Lohiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean P. Lohiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A.M. A Minor Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L.M. A Minor Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?