Sanchez-Rosario v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Arturo Sanchez-Rosario
Case Number: 2:2012cv00488
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFICINCY ORDER: Plf w/in 28 days of the date of this order to pay the required filing ($5.00) or move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/7/12. (sh1)
July 6, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Arturo Sanchez-Rosario be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/6/12. (sh1)
August 6, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 5 in that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. This action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 8/6/12. (sem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Rosario v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Sanchez-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.