Pan v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hua-Cheng Pan
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2012cv01063
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION AND ORDER granting 92 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/20/2017. (er)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 58 Sealed Motion to Dismiss; denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 62 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 82 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 84 Motion for Leave to File. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/31/2016. (cw)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The Court grants 43 MOTION to Compel to this extent: Discovery cutoff date is extended to 8/13/2015, to permit additional discovery to be taken relating to the reindeer snow globe. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/15/2015. (agm)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED with regard to Counts I, II, VI and VII of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and GRANTED with regard to Counts III, IV, and V finding as moot 15 Motion for Leave to File. Counts III, IV and V are hereby DISMISSED as to Defendant Kohls. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/12/2013. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hua-Cheng Pan
Represented By: John Anastasios Zervas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Weber Herlihy
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?