Trimbur et al v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Renee K. Trimbur, The Kyron Tool & Machine Co., Inc. and C4R'S LLC
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00160
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2016 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have advised the Court that a settlement has been reached in this case. The Court directs the Clerk to administratively close this case and remove it from this Court's active docket. The case may be re-opened upon proper motion of any party. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/23/2016. (dh1)
March 2, 2016 213 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Plaintiff's Punitive Damage and Attorney Fee Claims and to Reconsider the Court's Decision Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Punitive Damage and Attorney Fee Claims and denying as moot 163 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Financial Condition. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/02/2016. (dh1)
September 28, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 125 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/28/2015. (pes)
August 10, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 117 Defendants' Motion to Strike; granting 106 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 90 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/10/2015. (dh1)
January 16, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 and 93 Motion to Compel. Replies to 90 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/17/2015. Responses to 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 2/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/16/2015. (pes1)
November 25, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice to re-filing 48 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court vacates 44 the Order Setting Trial Date and Settlement Conference. The Clerk is directed to issue an amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/25/2014. (dh1)
September 24, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/23/2014. (pes1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimbur et al v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee K. Trimbur
Represented By: Ruthellen Quillen Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kyron Tool & Machine Co., Inc.
Represented By: Ruthellen Quillen Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C4R'S LLC
Represented By: Ruthellen Quillen Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: R Leland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: R Leland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?