Sharpe et al v. Sierra Leone Ministry of Surveys, Lands and Environment et al

Plaintiff: James Johannes Sharpe and Ubadire Nathaniel Nwoko
Defendant: Sierra Leone Ministry of Surveys, Lands and Environment, Bassem Mohamed, Estate of Jamil Said and Miles Investments (S.L.) Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00187
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER adopting 30 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/8/15. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 10, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be dismissed against Sierra Leone Ministry of Surveys, Lands and Environment on the ground that sovereign immunity bars this Court from hearing Plaintiffs' claims against that Defendant. In addition, b ecause Plaintiffs have provided proof of waiver of service as to Miles Investments, the Court will not recommend dismissal of that Defendant for failure to effect proper service of process. Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 9/10/2015. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 4, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 the Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/4/15. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 20, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER that 19 Answer filed on behalf of defendant Miles Investments is stricken, and the Court recommends that the Cross-Claim filed on behalf of Miles Investments be dismissed. Objections to R&R due within fourteen days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 1/20/2015. (agm1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe et al v. Sierra Leone Ministry of Surveys, Lands and Environment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johannes Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubadire Nathaniel Nwoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Leone Ministry of Surveys, Lands and Environment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bassem Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Jamil Said
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Investments (S.L.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?