Sturtz v. JPMorgan Chase & Co dba JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Sturtz
Defendant: Stefano Peroni, Thomas Dowell and JPMorgan Chase & Co dba JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2013cv00236
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER vacating the telephone status conference scheduled for 07/07/14 and scheduling an in-person status conference for 07/14/14 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel and principals are directed to appear at this conference. There will be no continuances permitted. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/07/2014. (dh1)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Court held an in-person status conference on 6/2/14 and a telephone status conference on 6/16/14 re the parties' settlement, which the parties agree occurred, but dispute what the terms of that settlement included. The parties are d irected to telephone the Court by 6/27/14 to report the progress of the settlement. If the parties have not finalized an agreement, a mandatory in-person conference will all principals and counsel will be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/24/2014. (dh1)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER denying 21 Motion to Quash; denying 28 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/22/2014. (pes1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturtz v. JPMorgan Chase & Co dba JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefano Peroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co dba JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sturtz
Represented By: Laren E Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?