Hess v. Turner

Respondent: Neil Turner
Petitioner: John W. Hess
Case Number: 2:2013cv00343
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution be granted & that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed. Objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 7/31/2013. (kk2)
September 20, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; adopting Report and Recommendations re 15 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 9/20/13. (ds)
September 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Respondent's Motion 11 is GRANTED and the action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 9/25/2013. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Neil Turner
Represented By: William H Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John W. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.