Lemmon v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Vicki L Lemmon
Case Number: 2:2013cv00410
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by Vicki L Lemmon. It is RECOMMENDED that the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED pursuant to Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and that this action be REMANDED for further administrative proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/13/2014. (pes1)
March 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court ADOPTS 24 the Report and Recommendation, the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED to the Commissioner under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/18/14. (jk1)
May 30, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs pursuant to the EAJA, ECF 27 , be GRANTED and that plaintiff be awarded an attorney fee and costs in the total amount of $6,591.75. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/30/14. (jr1)
July 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and affirming 28 the Report and Recommendation; granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/8/14. (jk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki L Lemmon
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.