Lott v. The District Court of Southern District of Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Harry William Lott
Defendant: The District Court of Southern District of Ohio, Judge Frost, U.S. Attorney's Office and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2013cv00562
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 27 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/7/2014. (cw)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION filed by Harry William Lott. It is RECOMMENDED that Motion 27 be DENIED - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/06/2013. (sr)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, overruling Plaintiff's Objections. This action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/8/2013. (cw)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL SCREENNG REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Harry William Lott. The Magistrate Juge RECOMMENDS that the complaint be DISMISSED because it fails to state a claim under 42 U.S.C. Sec. 1983. Defendants do not have to respond to the complaint unless the Court rejects the Report and Recommendation - objections due w/in fourteen (14). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 09/10/2013. (sr1)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Plf to execute the Non-Prisoner Declaration w/in 28 from the date of this order, failure to do so may result in dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/22/13. (sh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. The District Court of Southern District of Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry William Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The District Court of Southern District of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?