Hanrahan et al v Mohr et al
Plaintiff: Noelle Hanrahan, Christopher Hedges, Derrick Jones, James Ridgeway, Siddique Abdullah Hasan, Gregory Curry, Keith LaMar, Jason Robb and George Skatzes
Defendant: Gary C. Mohr and JoEllen Smith
Case Number: 2:2013cv01212
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER granting 55 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Defendants and close this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/28/2017. (dh1)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration [40-1] and denying 51 Motion to Compel. The Motion to Strike 46 is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/21/2017. (dh1)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant's Gary C. Mohr and JoEllen Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/24/2017. (dh1)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/31/2015. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanrahan et al v Mohr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Hanrahan
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hedges
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jones
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ridgeway
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siddique Abdullah Hasan
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Curry
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith LaMar
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Represented By: Jonathan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Robb
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Skatzes
Represented By: Drew S. Dennis
Represented By: James L Hardiman
Represented By: Jennifer Martinez Atzberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoEllen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?