Wilmington Trust Company et al v. AEP Generating Company et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Defendant: AEP Generating Company and Indiana Michigan Power Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv01213
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/11/2021. (cmw)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION AND ORDER granting 88 Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and 131 Second Motion to Dismiss; denying 123 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 197 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; and denying as moot 127 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and 106 Defendants' Omnibus Motion for an Extension, for a Stay and to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/28/2016. (dh1)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents. Defendants are directed to comply with the Court's directives concerning post-complaint documents and to produce any additional documents within thirty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/7/2016. (agm)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 OPINION AND ORDER overruling Defendants' Objections 137 to the Magistrate Judge's 10/23/15 Opinion and Order 132 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/04/2016. (dh1)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION AND ORDER reinstating 79 OPINION AND ORDER granting 58 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents No. 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 10/23/2015. (agm)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER overruling 80 Defendants AEP Generating Company and Indiana Michigan Power Company's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order that compelled production of certain documents. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/06/2015. (dh1)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion Concerning the Procedural Rules and Briefing Schedule Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that: 1) the remaining briefing related to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall comp ort with the Southern District of New York's Local Rules and 2) Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time to oppose the Motion to Dismiss until 01/21/14 and Defendants may file a reply by 2/24/14. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 12/18/2013. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust Company et al v. AEP Generating Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Drew C. Ensign
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP Generating Company
Represented By: Rollo Clyde Baker, IV
Represented By: Peter E Calamari
Represented By: David L Elsberg
Represented By: James B Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Michigan Power Company
Represented By: Rollo Clyde Baker, IV
Represented By: Peter E Calamari
Represented By: David L Elsberg
Represented By: James B Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?