In re: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company C-8 Personal Injury Litigation
Plaintiff: Anita Yerby, Roberta Sue Daugherty-Hall, Kathryn J. Post, Jack Eugene Morris, Violet Bush, Crystal Gale Prather, Janet Jeffers, Christine Sue Smith, Kenneth Workman, Mary Rose Talbott, Lawrence Paul Adams, Judy M. Sayre, Carol Sue Kapple, Clara Marie Young, Donald R. Smith, Melinda L. Tennant, Kimberly Allen, Janet Kay Dudley, Marilyn J Black, Wendy Riffe, Deloris Darlene Quick, Hall Sampson, David Williams, Steven Perry Eads, Richard Barry Rollyson, Lori Bailey, Helen Grate, Holly Hendrickson, Katetina Marie Sheets, Dorothy E. Whited, Teressa Mitchell, Marshall M. Logston, Michael Barrett, Sr., Robert Aubrey Sturm, Adam Eugene Gorham, Jeffrey Frank, David Floyd Wetzel, Julia A. Elliott, Katonda Sue Slone, Debra Lynn Pierce, Mary Grimm, Karen Mae West, Marilyn June Barker, Daphne J. McDonald, Polly Ann Smith, Faith M. Byers, Howard Jacobsen, III, Abigail Elizabeth Ruble, Lynnette R. Hull, Lewis G. Wheaton, Mary Ellen Forester, Scott DeWeese, H. Y., Russell Martin Moneypenny, Eric H. Carlsen, Sonja Hallman, Karen Jean Hughes, Tonia E. Stover, Stephen Michael Sowards, Sr., Christina Sue Burgess, Patricia Dale Pugh, Donna Rae Lowther, Flint Timothy Bush, Steve Tracy, Craig Allen Starcher, Robert Keith Kapple, Beth Weese, Richard S. Thomas, Erin F. Tolliver, Charlotte A. Price, Charlotte Lynn Dye, Barbara Jean Terrell, Laura Withrow, Sandra Lee Lucas, Lonnie Workman, Theadora Lynch, Roger Cummings, Kathy Lou Currie, Timothy D. Bibbee, Kathy Willis, Johnny Keith Haynes, Jr., Norma June Price, Cynthia F. Young, Kathryn Hoffman, Cindy Carlson Inman, Brandi N. McCoy, Clyde Eugene Padgitt, Pamela Jean Sadler, Larry Gene Bunger, Frances Camden, Jackie Lee Eads, David P. Cole, Russell Kenneth Griffith, John Lee Click, Rodney Brent Lemley, Sharon D. Cooper, Summer B. Elliott, Cheryl L. Richards, Martin Wayne Gibbs, Penny L. Alford, Norma J. Stephens, Virginia Lee Boggess, Ralph Arlen Spires, Susan Rae Carr, Betty I. Westfall, John F. Zimmerman, Nancy R. Kersey, Walter Lee Schnell, Linda E. Kanitz, Velma J. Seabolt, William E. Stivers, Maria Dawn Smith, Kellie Merriman, Dwight Bruce Metz, Letha Diane Cross, Darlene Faye Gum, Elizabeth Ann Diefenbach, Lula Mae Vensel, Robert Orville Williams, Richard L Brown, John Marshall Skinner, Rodney Eldon Stimpert, Barbara June Westmoreland, Larry Wayne Fields, Mina Mae Gorby, Tammy Fowler, Wanda Lou Wolf, Grace Allensworth, Nancy L. Goodnight, Atishia Reitmire, Tina Dowdy, Richard G. Williams, Sr., Erin Nicole Strcula, Charlie Ray Geary, Beth Starcher, Lisa Dawn Jett, June Harless, Michael W. Lambert, Ronnie Lee Lockhart, James Patrick Amos, Stephen Brian Ault, Kimberly Ann Pridemore, Pam Jacks, Stephen Gregory Blake, Sonya R. Cook, Robin L. Nichols, Cristina Ruth, Robin Gregory, Shirley M. Nutter, Tony M. Hutton, Marlin Price, Larry Turley, Andy Wayne Monk, Mary Putnam, Tracey Patricia Bock, Kimberly Irene Wilson, Richard W. Dunbar, Pamela Sue Arnott, Johnny Walker, Pamela J. Diddle, Rebecca June Jones, Terry Harold Ullum, Terry Brian Ball, Ruby J. Fowler, Darlene Joy Lynn, Alice J. Broderick, Christopher S. Viers, Douglas Eblin, Sr., Steven Reitmire, Luke Allen Hall, Rosetta Quaranta, Jeanene Frazier-Hyde, Teresa Kay Birchfield, Jack A. Martin, Jr., Susan Ann Miller, Emery Starling, Brenda June Holland, Kevin A. Klein, Mark Everett Modesitt, Larry G Jordan, Brian L. Bennett, Cathy Jean Compton, Teresa Lynn Diddle, David M. Barber, Deborah J. Dowler, James Lewis Frye, William Sim, Angela McConnell, Joseph Edward Powell, Patricia J. Brogan, Linda J. Jameson, Franklin D. Stewart, David Richard Cremeans, Arthur Lee King, James R. Allen, Cynthia Albright, Judy L. Meeks, Charles Morris, Joanna Lee Spencer, Paige N. Gerlach, Clarence Ronald Barnett, Robbin L. Nicola, Betty Louise Neff, Frank A. Haggy, Walter Wayne Gibbs, Jessica Louise Holbert, Jo Anna Huck, Rose E. Barnhouse, Crystal G Canfield, Helen I. Reed, Paul Dennis Townsend, Jill Sheppard, Bernard Walsh, Kathy Lynn Owens, Austin Bailey, Timothy J. Zdrale, Lisa Jacks, Tina Byers, Carole Virginia Davis, Frederick Cooper, Rodney W. Buck, Barbara Leigh Huffman, Captain Wamsley, Joey A. Roberts, Lloyd Oliver Jones, Roger D. Korte, Pamela S. Fell, Alina Colwell, Joyce E. Manuel, Thomas M. Jamison, Jr., Richard Williams, Thomas Michael Wilson, Sr., James A. Richmond, Teresa Kay Stark, Lisa S. Koehler, Kenny Goff, James Minshall, Dolores Ann Gessel, Donna Northup, Douglas M. Bissell, LaDonna Renee Mintz, Judith A. Corbin, Melissa Dawson, Barbara Hicks, Russell Kenneth Null, Clayton Richard Matheny, Jan Marie Johnson, Reginald Pickering, Charles Everett Mays, Susan D. Rogers, Jeri Roton, JoAuana Fetty, Timothy Wesley Miller, James W. Stewart, Brooke Ann Hunter, Barbara J Smith, Dorla L. Sayre, Sandra K. Buttrick, Mrs. Barbara D. McGee, Carl Mansfield Tucker, George Roy Schultz, Timothy D. Hathaway, Amy Beth Perry, Chris Sidote, Tammy Darlene Allman, Jane Annette Moon, Gene D. Hudson, Vikki Starr Nichols, Charles Stewart, Susan Bradley, Brenda Louise Eddy, Dorothy Click, CIndy Conley, Michael D. Goin, Sheila Karpesky, Lloyd E. McDonald, Jr., Rita Massie, James D. Bird, Earl G. McConnell, Charles Frederick Callihan, Dyana Marie Young, Melissa Stout, Doris Eleanor Tuttle, Larry W. Shepard, Jr., Jerry Lee Brown, Connie Lorene Rankin, Sarah Alice Townsend, Anthony Westjohn, Mark Modesitt, William Anderson, Jr., Diana Edwards, Joyce Morris, Tanya J. Gibbs, Max W. Wilson, Jr., Ernest Lee Whealdon, John D. Gorrell, Sterling Ross Neff, Candance Ulrich, Danny Ray Kearns, Mary Stephens, Luther Ehret, Jr., Debra Jean Cottle, Michael E. Dixon, Sheila Ann Lucas, Iris A. Payne, Lawrence Yoho, Ruth A. Sears, Roy D. Henry, Donna Dailey, Thomas E. Jones, Jr., Julie Abbott, Susan A. Ruth, Francis Russell Well, Scott Chapman, Mark Edwards Parsons, Patricia Humphrey, John B. Sang, Edward L. Sayger, Jr., Tina Marie Northup, Ester Hafer, Jeffrey A. Jarvis, Amanda Michae Davis, Timothy Collin O'Connor, Ernest E. Fleming, Nicole French, Shirley Ann Schultz, Tina Allen, Carl D. Morgan, Bryan J. Poole, Betty Nichols, Edna M. Weatherholt, Theresa Ann Meredith, Barbara Jo Cross, Martha E. Baird, Dorothy Lou Gains, Jeffrey A. Price, Jerry Lee Workman, Rudy Morris, Carol A. Harvey, Earl Kauff, Helen Turnbull, Mark Stephen Borich, Judy Bonecutter, Shelly D. Barrett, Lance Hickman, Virgil Leroy Beall, Lottie Marie Sheppard, Carolyn S. Buckley, Leo R. Roush, Jr., Richard Reymond, Diane Duckworth, John Edward Sink, Paul Van Horn, Mary Ellen Sheets, Lisa Ann Gardner, Ira Edward Toncray, Jr, Terri Diane Keiser, Sandra Kay Siple, Thomas Eugene Molden, Cleo A Bunner, Harriett Jane Laudermilt, Angela Michele Snodgrass, Marvin Allen Oiler, Harold E. Ford, David Robinson, Elizabeth Ann Cremeans, Jessie N. Workman, Ronald Dale McBride, Belinda J. Bennett, D. R. H., Pamela Kay Sellers, Judy Young, Linda L. Roman, Cynthia Louise Rhodes, Troy David Martin, Patricia Larrison, Michael Thompson, Paul Mitchell States, James Richard Peters, Melissa Beatty, Gerald Henry Weigand, Heather L. Summers, Clinton Purkey, Connie Rood, Pamela Lewis, John L. Tucker, Joe Brown, Erica Watson, Kenneth R. Fairbanks, Hazel Roberta Lewis, Amy Lynn Bumgarner, Marcella Harris, Howard Crawford, Donna Jean Laudermilt, Glen Robinson, Brian David Miracle, Peter H. Anderson, Peggy S. Webb, Gary Eugene Meyer, Jeffrey S. Fisher, Clair Mont McCoy, Raymond Ralph Coss, Patricia Annette Fore and James V. Kiser
Interested Party: National Geographic
Case Number: 2:2013md02433
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Notice of Correction: ECF No. 5224 was filed inadvertently in the wrong case. The Entry has been removed from this case and filed in the correct case 2:18-cv-136 as ECF No. 30. (daf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5223 RESPONSE to Motion re #5212 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Class Membership Status of Plaintiff Gregory Stover filed by Plaintiff Greg Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Conlin, Jon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5222 RESPONSE to Motion re #5211 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Class Membership Status of Plaintiff Buffy Riffle filed by Plaintiffs Buffy Riffle, Charles L. Riffle, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Conlin, Jon)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5221 ORDER finding as moot #5202 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #5220 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgement #5202 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/24/2019. (plb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5220 MOTION to Withdraw #5202 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Duty/Breach Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5219 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott re #5218 Reply to Response to Motion (London, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5218 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5204 MOTION for Order to Clarify the Inapplicability of the Ohio Tort Reform Act to Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5217 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 52. The next conference is scheduled for 7/1/2019 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/21/2019. (sln)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5216 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on 5-14-19, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (Coulter, Darla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5215 NOTICE of Hearing: In person Status Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (cmw)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5214 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51, Consolidation of Cases for Trial, and denying Plaintiffs' Moiton to Strike #5207 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/13/2019. (plb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5207 MOTION to Strike #5205 Reply (non motion) filed by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (Mace, Damond)
May 11, 2019 Filing 5212 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Class Membership Status of Plaintiff Gregory Stover by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Stover Ex. A, #2 Stover Ex. B, #3 Stover Ex. C) (Fazio, Stephen)
May 11, 2019 Filing 5211 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Class Membership Status of Plaintiff Buffy Riffle by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Riffle Ex. A, #2 Riffle Ex. B, #3 Riffle Ex. C) (Fazio, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Correction: ECF No. 5209 was filed inadvertently in the wrong case. The Entry has been removed from this case and filed in the correct case 2:18-cv-136. (daf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5204 MOTION for Order to Clarify the Inapplicability of the Ohio Tort Reform Act to Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (Mace, Damond)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5208 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5202 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Duty/Breach Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (Mace, Damond)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5207 MOTION to Strike #5205 Reply (non motion) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Bilott, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5206 NOTICE by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY : Notice of Appearance of Attorney Katherine A. Spicer. (Mace, Damond)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5205 Reply re #5200 Brief : Defendants' Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Response to Pretrial Order No. 50 by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5204 MOTION for Order to Clarify the Inapplicability of the Ohio Tort Reform Act to Plaintiffs' Claims by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5203 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 111). (daf)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5202 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Duty/Breach Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5201 BRIEF re #5197 Pretrial Order by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (Mace, Damond)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5200 BRIEF by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5199 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 110). (daf)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5197 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 50: The next in person status conference is scheduled for 5/14/2019 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/26/2019. (sln)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5196 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on 3-18-19, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 4/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2019. (Coulter, Darla)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5195 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (cmw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: In Person Status Conference held on 3/18/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5191 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 49. Status Conference set for 3/18/2019 01:30 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. The parties must confer prior to the status conference and send to the Court, no later than two business days prior to the conference, an agenda of issues to be addressed. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/4/2019. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: In Person Status Conference held on 1/29/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5189 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 109. (daf)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5188 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. on 1/4/2019 and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/7/2019. (sln)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5187 STIPULATION [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 28 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Richeson, Marques)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5186 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 27 Pretrial and Trial Schedule regarding Travis and Julie Abbott v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, et al., Case No. 2:17-cv-998: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Trial counsel shall meet in the chambers of Chief Judge Sargus at 8:30 a.m. on each day of the trial. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 FPTO Form) (cmw)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5185 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 26 Pretrial and Trial Schedule regarding Angela and Teddy Swartz v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, et al. Case No. 2:18-cv-136 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Trial counsel shall meet in the chambers of Chief Judge Sargus at 8:30 a.m. on each day of the trial. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 FPTO Form) (cmw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5184 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 01:30 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5183 ORDER granting #5181 Motion for Order to Approve Final Payment of Lien Resolution Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/15/2018. (plb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5182 ORDER granting #5180 Motion for Order to Approve Payment to Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/15/2018. (plb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5181 MOTION for Order to Approve Payment to Lien Resolution Administrator by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5180 MOTION for Order to Approve Payment to Special Master Stack by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5179 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on November 2, 2018, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth P. Deavers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 11/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2019. (Coulter, Darla)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5178 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 48 (Conference held 11/2/2018). Changed Directions for Selection of Trial Cases. The parties are DIRECTED to withdraw any West Virginia case they have chosen as a trial case and replace it with an Ohio case. The parties have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to submit their substitutions to the Court, which can be done via email. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/6/2018. (sln)
November 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 11/2/2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (sln)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5177 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4-A, Amended Case Management Order No. 4, Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Records Authorizations. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 10/31/2018. (plb)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5176 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3-A, Amended Case Management Order No. 3, Service of Plaintiffs' Complaints, Defendant's Abbreviated Answer and Affirmative Defenses, Initial Disclosures. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 10/31/2018. (plb)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5175 ORDER granting #5174 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/31/2018. (plb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5174 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Order, #31 Order, Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order No. 3 and Case Management Order No. 4 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended CMO 3, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Amended CMO 4) (Richeson, Marques)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5173 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing of Initial Form 10 Registration Statement (Attachments: #1 Corteva Form 10) (Van Wart, Kevin)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5172 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (8 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5171 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (7 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5170 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (6 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5169 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (5 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5168 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (4 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5167 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (3 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5166 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (2 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5165 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #5164 Notice (Other) Stipulated Dismissals (1 of 8) (Mace, Damond)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5164 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Stipulated Dismissals With Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - List for global dismissals) (Mace, Damond)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5163 Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on September 28, 2018, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison Kimmel, Telephone number 614.719.3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2019. (ak)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5162 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #5161 Special Master's Report and Recommendation Regarding the Allocation and Distribution of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/3/2018. (plb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5161 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding the Allocation and Distribution of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses filed by Special Master Daniel J. Stack. (plb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5160 NOTICE of Hearing:In Person Status Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
September 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: In Person Status Conference held on 9/28/2018. (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (cmw)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5159 ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 25 September 28, 2018 Conference Initial Scheduling of Post-Settlement Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/28/2018. (cmw)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5158 ORDER granting #5156 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/28/2018. (cmw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5157 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 01:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5156 Third MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/1/2018. for the Special Master to Issue His Report and Recommendation Relating to the Award of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5155 ORDER granting #5151 Second Unopposed Motion of Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for an Extension of Time for Special Master to Issue his Report and Recommendation Relating to the Award of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/23/2018. (cmw)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5153 Response re #5140 Order on Motion for Order to (DuPont's Response to Case Management Order No. 24) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Chart of Potential Non-Viable Cases by Dx Date, #2 Exhibit 2 (Aug. 14 PFS Deficiency Letters), #3 Exhibit 3 (Sept. 14 Updated PFS Deficiency Letters), #4 Exhibit 4 (To Be Filed Under Seal)) (Mace, Damond)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5152 ORDER granting #5150 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/20/2018. (plb)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5151 Second MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/27/2018. for the Special Master to Issue His Report and Recommendation Relating to the Award of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5150 MOTION to File Document Under Seal : Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Damond R. Mace, Esq. in Support of Its Response to Case Management Order No. 24 Under Seal by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mace, Damond)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5149 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing of Initial Form 10 Registration Statement (Attachments: #1 DowDuPont Form 10) (Van Wart, Kevin)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5148 ORDER for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #5146 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/29/2018. (plb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5146 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5145 ORDER granting #5144 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/21/2018. (plb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5144 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/20/2018. For the Special Master to Issue His Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5143 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott Plaintiffs' Notice of Request for DuPont Merger/Reorganization Status Report (Butler, David)
July 10, 2018 Filing 5142 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 128: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel. (er)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5141 Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on June 20, 2018, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 7/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2018. (Coulter, Darla)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. Case Management Order No. 23 (ECF No. 5136) grants Motion for Order to Appoint Fee Committee (ECF No. 5135). Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/6/2018. (plb)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5140 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 24, June 20, 2018 Conference, and ORDER DENYING #5139 Motion for Order Adopting Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/22/2018. (plb)
June 19, 2018 Filing 5139 MOTION for Order to :Defendants' Motion for Proposed Case Management Order No. 24. by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mace, Damond)
June 13, 2018 Filing 5138 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford F Kinney, Jr for Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Kinney, Clifford) Modified text on 6/14/2018 (kpt).
June 13, 2018 Filing 5137 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall A Paul for Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Paul, Niall) Modified text on 6/14/2018 (kpt).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5136 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 23 - Application of Fee Committee and Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/6/2018. (cmw)
June 5, 2018 Filing 5135 MOTION for Order to Appoint a Fee Committee by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (London, Michael)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5134 ORDER granting #5133 Unopposed Motion seeking a second interim distribution of funds. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/25/2018. (mas)
May 23, 2018 Filing 5133 Third MOTION for Order to Approve Reimbursement of Claims Administrator Costs by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
May 10, 2018 Filing 5132 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 127: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel. (er)
April 9, 2018 Filing 5131 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Conlin, Jon)
April 4, 2018 Filing 5130 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 126: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel. (er)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5129 ORDER granting #5128 Unopposed Motion Seeking a Second Interim Distribution of Funds to Claims Administrator. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/26/2018. (mas)
March 23, 2018 Filing 5128 Second MOTION for Order to Approve Reimbursement of Claims Administrator Costs by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5127 ORDER granting #5125 Unopposed Motion Seeking an Interim Distribution of Funds. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/9/2018. (mas)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5126 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Chief Judge has determined that this case and case number 2:17-cv-998 are related, and both cases nevertheless will remain assigned to him. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/8/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 30, 2018 Filing 5125 Unopposed MOTION Regarding Interim Reimbursement of Claims Administrator Costs by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
January 24, 2018 Filing 5123 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on November 1, 2017, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 2/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2018. (Evans, Shawna)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5122 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
January 5, 2018 Notice of Correction re #5121 Notice of Tag Along Actions: Counsel that filed this document contacted the Clerk's Office to inform us that the document was meant to be filed with the Judicial Panel and not in this MDL action. The document has been restricted to private entry only. (er)
January 5, 2018 Filing 5121 NOTICE by Plaintiff Linda Bragg of Tag-Along Actions (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Exhibit 1 Bragg Docket and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Riser Docket and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 Gregg Docket and Complaint, #5 Proof of Service) (Hill, R.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5119 ORDER granting #5118 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion seeking an Interim Distribution of Funds from the MDL No. 2433 Expense Fund account for services rendered by Providio, LLC. The Court approves the distribution of $945,000.00 from the MDL No. 2433 Expense Fund account to Providio for the items detailed in Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/15/2017. (dh1)
November 14, 2017 Filing 5118 Unopposed MOTION Regarding Interim Reimbursement of Lien Resolution Costs by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Conlin, Jon)
November 1, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Settlement Conference held on 11/1/2017. (Court Reporter: Shawna Evans) (mas)
October 26, 2017 Filing 5117 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on 10-25-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018. (Coulter, Darla)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5115 ORDER: If the Plaintiffs listed in this Order wish to proceed with their cases, they must appear before this Court on 11/01/17 at 12:30 p.m. The Plaintiffs need not appear if they do not wish to pursue their cases. If the Plaintiffs do not wish to proceed, they may file a voluntary dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/25/2017. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:14-cv-01177-EAS-EPD, 2:15-cv-01832-EAS-EPD, 2:15-cv-02256-EAS-EPD (dh1)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5114 ORDER: The Plaintiffs listed are ORDERED to appear before this Court on 11/01/17 at 12:30 p.m. Mr. Patterson may appear by telephone. The Court will forward call-in information to Mr. Patterson's counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/25/2017. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (dh1)
October 10, 2017 Filing 5113 NOTICE of Hearing: In-Person Status Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (mas)
September 25, 2017 Filing 5112 RESPONSE to Motion re #5111 MOTION for DuPont Merger/Reorganization Status Report filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 21, 2017 Filing 5111 Plaintiffs' Request for DuPont Merger/Reorganization Status Report. (sem)
September 18, 2017 Filing 5110 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
August 7, 2017 Filing 5109 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5108 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6-C granting #5102 Plaintiffs Motion to further Modify PTO No. 6. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/24/2017. (dh1)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5107 Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/21/2017. (dh1)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5106 ORDER granting #5105 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Protective Order. The Clerk is directed to file the Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/21/2017. (dh1)
July 20, 2017 Filing 5105 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Production of Certain Information Maintained by Third-Party Payors by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (London, Michael)
June 26, 2017 Filing 5104 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5103 OPINION AND ORDER granting #5101 the parties' Joint Motion for Stay of Time to Answer Complaints. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/26/2017. (dh1)
June 23, 2017 Filing 5102 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pretrial Order No. 6 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
June 20, 2017 Filing 5101 Joint MOTION to Stay the Time to Answer Complaints filed by Plaintiffs and by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Leber, Nathan)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5100 ORDER granting #5099 the Motion to Appoint a Lien Resolution Administrator, Establish a Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint a Qualified Settlement Fund Administrator. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/25/2017. (dh1)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5099 MOTION to Appoint a Lien Resolution Administrator, Establish a Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint a QSF Administrator by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (London, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Filing 5098 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Butler, David)
April 20, 2017 Filing 5097 Correspondence from Charles F. Prunty, Jr. dated 4/18/2017. (agm)
April 14, 2017 Filing 5096 Correspondence from from Charles F. Prunty, Jr., dated 04/12/2017. (dh1)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5095 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 22. Appointment of Claims Administrator and Special Master. The Court grants #5092 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Appoint a Claims Administrator and Special Master to Administer the C8 Personal Injury Litigation Master Settlement Agreement. The Court appoints Daniel J. Balhoff as the MSA Claims Administrator and Daniel J. Stack, Esq. as the MSA Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/12/2017. (dh1)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5094 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 125: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-103). (er)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5093 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 124: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-102). (er)
April 7, 2017 Filing 5092 MOTION for Order to Appoint a Claims Administrator and Special Master to Administer the C8 Personal Injury Litigation Master Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Filing 5091 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Violet Bush. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00618-EAS-EPD (Fisher, Ryan)
April 3, 2017 Filing 5090 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Francis Russell Well v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:17-cv-00260 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
March 31, 2017 Filing 5089 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Butler, David)
March 24, 2017 Filing 5088 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 123: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-101). (er)
March 23, 2017 Filing 5087 MOTION for Case Status Update filed by Charles Franklin Prunty, Jr. (agm)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5086 ORDER: The parties have informed the Court they have reached a global resolution of all the cases that make up this MDL. The Court VACATES all of the current scheduling orders. The parties are DIRECTED to file joint status reports every six weeks informing the Court of the progress toward finalization of the settlement and any potential problems. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 02/13/2017. (dh1)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5085 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Emery Haggy and Leila Haggy v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-02538 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5084 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Craig Frazier v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 14-cv-00691 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5083 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - William Slone v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 14-cv-00033 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5082 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Kenneth Rizer, Jr. and Trish Rizer v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-02559 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5081 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Terry Ramsey and Sharon Ramsey v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-01906 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5080 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Patricia Norris, Executrix of the Estate of Roy L. Norris, v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 14-cv-01778 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5079 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Jerry McClain v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 13-cv-00116 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5078 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Money Damages - Jason Huffman and Sheri Huffman v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-00120 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5077 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 24. Plaintiff's Motions Directed at Defense Experts Dr. Weed, Dr. Rickard, and Dr. Fedoruk. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) The Court grants in part, denies in part, and denies as moot in part #4781 Plaintiff's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Experts Dr. Weed, Dr. Rickard, and Dr. Fedoruk. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 02/07/2017. (dh1)
February 1, 2017 Filing 5076 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Dugan, Jeffrey L. Case No. 2:17-cv-00090 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond) Modified text to add plaintiff's name and case number on 2/1/2017 (agm).
February 1, 2017 Filing 5075 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Moore, Nancy Cathryn Case No. 2:17-cv-00091 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond) Modified text to add plaintiff's name and case number on 2/1/2017 (agm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5074 MOTION to Exclude (expert Dr. Eggener) ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Plaintiff Wendell G. Mayle. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01052-EAS (Cash, III, William)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5073 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dr. Craig Nichols ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Michael Todd Nutter. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00513-EAS (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5072 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Dr. Maier ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5071 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik D. Alexander, Ph.D. ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5070 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Samuel M. Cohen, M.D., Ph.D. ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Robert S White. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00807-EAS (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5069 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5068 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witnesses Ellen T. Chang, Sc.D., Elizabeth Delzell, Sc.D., and Gabor Mezei Relating to General Causation ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5067 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiffs Ryan Balsley, Ronald Cross, and Michael Todd Nutter's Claims of Intentional and Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS, 2:15-cv-00513-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5066 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witnesses Dr. Douglas Weed, Dr. Samuel Cohen and Dr. Robert Rickard relating to General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5065 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the High Cholesterol Claims of Trial Plaintiffs Carolyn Charles and Thomas Weekley ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5064 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Robert S. White Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00807-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5063 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiffs' Specific Causation Expert Dr. Robert Bahnson by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS, 2:15-cv-00807-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Robert S. White's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - R. White Response to Interrogatory No 2) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00807-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5061 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Susan White re (5026 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 18 in 2:15-cv-00210-EAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Negligence Claims Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5060 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Thomas Weekley's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weekley Response to Interrogatory No 2) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5059 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Susan White re (19 in 2:15-cv-00210-EAS, 5029 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS) MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Aymen Elfiky Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5058 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Michael Todd Nutter's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Nutter Response to Interrogatory No 2) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00513-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5057 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Wendell G. Mayle's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01052-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5056 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Negligence Claims Pursuant to The Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (London, Michael)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5055 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Michael T. Nutter Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00513-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5054 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Wendell G. Mayle Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01052-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5053 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Alfred Fauver's Specific Causation Expert on Kidney Cancer, Dr. Vitaly Margulis by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01853-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5052 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Wendell G. Mayle's Specific Causation Expert on Testicular Cancer, Dr. Michael O'Leary by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01052-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5051 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Alfred Fauver based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01853-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5050 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Stephen T. Washburn ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Plaintiff Ryan Balsley. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS (Hill, R.)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5049 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Aymen Elfiky, MD ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Ryan Balsley. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS (Hill, R.)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5048 MOTION to Exclude Opinions & Testimony of Ganesh Palapattu, MD ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Ronald Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS (Landers, Ashley)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5047 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Thomas Weekley Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5046 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4983 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Nelson Depo Transcript) (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5045 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott Filing Deposition Transcripts and Expert Reports of Samuel Cohen, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael) Modified text on 1/29/2017 (agm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5044 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Thomas Weekley's Specific Causation Expert for High Cholesterol, Dr. John F. Setaro, M.D. by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5043 MOTION for Summary Judgment :DuPont's Preservation Motion Regarding Damages Under Ohio Law for Alleged "Cancerphobia" and any Alleged Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5042 MOTION to Exclude Opinions & Testimony of Stephen T. Washburn ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Ronald Cross. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS (Landers, Ashley)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5041 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Thomas Weekley's Specific Causation Expert Dr. Cy Aaron Stein, M.D., PH.D. by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5040 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Carolyn Charles' Specific Causation Experts, Dr. John Setaro, M.D. and Dr. Cy Aaron Stein, M.D., PH.D. by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5039 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan White re (5029 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS) MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Aymen Elfiky Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrect Document Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5038 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Susan S. White Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5037 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Aymen Elfiky ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Plaintiff Susan White. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5036 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Loss of Consortium Claims of Plaintiffs (1) Greg White, the Spouse of Susan White and (2) Jennifer Weekley, the Spouse of Thomas Weekley ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5035 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Carolyn Charles's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5034 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan White re (5026 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Negligence Claims Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrect Document Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5033 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Aaron Callihan's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Callihan's Response to Interrogatory No 2) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01979-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5032 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Experts Dr. M. Dror Michaelson and Dr. Russell Luepker ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiffs Jennifer Weekley, Thomas Weekley. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01690-EAS (Conlin, Jon)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5031 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Carolyn Charles Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5030 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Aaron Callihan's Specific Causation Expert on Testicular Cancer, Dr. Michael O'Leary ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01979-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5029 ***WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO (5059 in 2:13-md-2433-EAS, 27 in 2:15-cv-210-EAS)*** MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik D. Alexander, Ph.D. ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Plaintiff Susan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rathke letter to Deitzler) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory) Modified text to correct name of defense expert named in document on 1/29/2017 (agm). Modified text on 1/30/2017 (agm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5028 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Aaron Callihan Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01979-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5027 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Ryan Balsley's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Balsley's Response to Interrogatory No 2) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5026 ***WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO (5061 in 2:13-md-2433-EAS, 28 in 2:15-cv-210-EAS)*** MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Negligence Claims Pursuant to the Doctrine of Issue Preclusion/Collateral Estoppel ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Plaintiff Susan White. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory) Modified text on 1/30/2017 (agm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5025 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. -Declaration and School Records) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01155-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5024 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims in Trial Plaintiff Ronald Cross's Complaint ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Faustino Aguilar, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mark A. Roberts) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5023 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Alfred Fauver's "Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud" Cause of Action ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01853-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5022 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Experts Dr. Adam Kibel and Dr. Daniel Edmundowicz ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Carolyn Charles. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00116-EAS (Conlin, Jon)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5021 MOTION to Exclude : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff Michael T. Nutter's Specific Causation Expert on Testicular Cancer, Dr. Vitaly Margulis by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00513-EAS (Fazio, Stephen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5020 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Emotional Distress of Claims of Trial Plaintiffs Wendell G. Mayle and Robert S. White ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01052-EAS, 2:15-cv-00807-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5019 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Experts Dr. Douglas Dahl and Dr. Douglas Ross ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Alfred Fauver. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01853-EAS (Conlin, Jon)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5018 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Trial Plaintiff Ronald Cross Based on Specific Causation ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:14-cv-00187-EAS (Niehaus, Stephanie)
January 27, 2017 Notice of Correction re:(21 in 2:15-cv-01690-EAS, 17 in 2:15-cv-00513-EAS, 49 in 2:14-cv-00187-EAS, 5015 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 16 in 2:15-cv-00210-EAS, 71 in 2:13-cv-01052-EAS, 17 in 2:15-cv-00807-EAS, 21 in 2:15-cv-01853-EAS, 60 in 2:13-cv-01155-EAS, 21 in 2:15-cv-00116-EAS, 24 in 2:15-cv-01979-EAS) MOTION to Exclude :DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel. The wrong document was uploaded by counsel. The incorrect document was removed, and the corrected document added in its place. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (agm)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5017 MOTION to Exclude :DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Mace, Damond)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5016 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Phillip Pierorazio, MD ( Responses due by 2/27/2017) by Plaintiff Aaron Callihan. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-01979-EAS (Conlin, Jon)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5015 MOTION to Exclude :DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Mace, Damond) (agm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5014 MOTION to Exclude :DuPont's Preservation Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carrie Redlich Based on Extra-Legal Standards of Care, her Improper Legal Conclusions, and DuPont's State of Mind by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Mace, Damond)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5013 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan White re (5012 in 2:13-md-02433-EAS) Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Aymen Elfiky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - DuPont's Objections, #3 Exhibit 3 - Report of Elfiky, #4 Exhibit 4 - Corrected Expert Report of Dr. Bahnson, #5 Exhibit 5 - Clinical and Systematic Review, #6 Exhibit 6 - Oncotarget Vol.6, No. 35, #7 Exhibit 7 - Eaden, Abrams, Mayberry Article, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cancer Research Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - Journal of Urology Article) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5012 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of Aymen Elfiky by Plaintiff Susan White. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory) Modified text on 1/27/2017 (mas).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5011 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan White Declaration of Joseph Allen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Joseph Allen) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5010 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan White Declaration of Dr. Bahnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Dr. Bahnson) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00210-EAS (Collins, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5009 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 17-A. This order supplements Case Management Order No. 17, and is directed at the Group 1 Cases. This is a new procedure that departs from the parties' prior practice of filing motions only in the broader MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/27/2017. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (dh1)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5008 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DuPont's Preservation Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Group 1 Trial Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages ( Responses due by 2/17/2017) by Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS et al. (Mace, Damond)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5007 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 29. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Application of the Ohio Tort Reform Act. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons the Court set forth in Dispositive Motions Order No. 10 #4215 and DMO 12 #4306 , the Court denies Defendant's Motion #4972 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/26/2017. (dh1) Modified text to add link on 1/29/2017 (agm).
January 26, 2017 Filing 5006 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Filing Expert Report of Douglas L. Weed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weed Supplemental Report and Declaration) (Mace, Damond)
January 24, 2017 Filing 5005 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4978 MOTION to Bifurcate : DuPont's Motion to: (1) Bifurcate the Compensatory Liability and Damages Phase of Trial (Phase I) from the Punitive Liability and Damages Phase (Phase II) and Exclude Post-Diagnosis Evidence from Phase I; or (2) in the filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5004 ORDER granting #5002 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension of Time to File Group 1 Daubert/Summary Judgment Motions. Case Management Order No. 17 is hereby modified so parties have until 01/27/17 to file their Daubert/Summary Judgment Motions; 02/27/17 to file Oppositions; and 03/13/17 to file Reply Briefs. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/24/2017. (dh1)
January 24, 2017 Filing 5003 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 122: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-100). (er)
January 17, 2017 Filing 5002 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/27/2017. to File Group 1 Daubert/Summary Judgment Motions by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
January 14, 2017 Filing 5001 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 23. Motions Directed at Defendant's Expert Dr. Maier. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) The Court grants in part and denies in part #4797 Plaintiff's Motion for Exclusion of Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Michael Andrew Maier. (plb) Modified on 1/19/2017 (dh1).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5000 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 28. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Specific Causation. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) The Court denies #4786 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Specific Causation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/12/2017. (dh1)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4999 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 22. Motions Directed at Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Bahnson and Defense Expert Dr. Luongo. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) The Court grants in part and denies in part #4785 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Specific Causation Expert Robert Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S. and grants #4779 Plaintiff's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Specific Causation Rebuttal Expert Tony Luongo, M.D., F.R.C.S.C., F.A.C.S. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/11/2017. (dh1)
January 11, 2017 Filing 4998 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Thomas C. Jennings, III and Lorene L. Hall-Jennings, his wife, v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 17-cv-00021 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
January 11, 2017 Filing 4997 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Roy J. Smith and Christine Sue Smith, his wife, v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 17-cv-00022 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4996 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 21. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion of Carrie Redlich, M.D., M.P.H. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons set forth in Evidentiary Motions Order No. 6 #4551 , the Court grants in part and denies in part #4784 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion of Carrie Redlich, M.D., M.P.H. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4995 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 20. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related to Corporate Conduct. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons set forth in Evidentiary Motions Order No. 2 #4129 and Dispositive Motions Order No. 12 #4841 , the Court grants in part and denies in part #4783 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Corporate Conduct Experts. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4994 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 19. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related to Narrative Corporate Conduct. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons the Court set forth in Evidentiary Motions Order No. 3 #4178 and DMO 12 #4306 , the Court denies #4782 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Narrative Corporate Conduct Experts. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4993 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 18. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons set forth in Evidentiary Motions Order No. 11 #4835 , and the evidentiary rulings made before and during the trial in Case No. 2:13-cv-136, the Court grants in part and denies in part #4780 Plaintiff's Motion for the Exclusion of Opinions and Testimony of Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4992 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 17. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Expert Marianne L. Horinko. (This document relates to Moody v. E.I. du Pont Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:15-cv-803.) For the reasons set forth in Evidentiary Motions Order No. 10 #4808 , the Court grants #4778 Plaintiff's Motion for the Exclusion of Opinions and testimony of Expert Marianne L. Horinko. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4990 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 27. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Cancerphobia Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Diseases. The Court grants in part and denies in part #4788 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Cancerphobia Portion of Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases. Specifically, DuPont's Motion is granted with regard to its request to exclude alleged mental anxiety damages related to fear of developing undiagnosed Probable Link diseases, and the motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4989 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 26. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages. For the reasons the Court set forth in DMO No. 7 #4185 , DMO No. 12 #4306 , and DMO No. 16 #4520 , the Court denies #4787 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/10/2017. (dh1)
January 9, 2017 Filing 4985 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 121: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-99). (er)
January 7, 2017 Filing 4984 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4972 MOTION for Order to Apply the Ohio Tort Reform Act to Plaintiff Larry O. Moody's Claims (Preservation) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (London, Michael)
January 6, 2017 Filing 4983 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena by Plaintiff June Eileen Epple. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hayden, Mark)
January 6, 2017 Filing 4982 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing (1) Joint Proposed Jury Instructions for Punitive Damages Phase and (2) DuPont's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instruction Punitive Damages Phase (Attachments: #1 Proposed Jury Instructions for Punitive Damages Phase, #2 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instruction Punitive Damages Phase) (Long, D.)
January 5, 2017 Filing 4981 JURY VERDICT. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
January 4, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Continuation of punitive damages portion of trial set for 1/5/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (lvw)
January 4, 2017 Filing 4980 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Punitive damages phase of trial held on 1/4/2017. Evidence entered. (Court Reporter: Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4979 MOTION to Strike #4976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Overly Broad Testimony and Evidence Regarding DuPont's Financial Health from the Second Phase of Trial, #4974 Trial Brief, #4977 MOTION in Limine to Permit Introduction of Statements from the Hill Peterson Website in the Punitive Damages Phase of Trial, #4975 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to DuPont's Facility in Dordrecht, Netherlands from the Second Phase of Trial by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4978 MOTION to Bifurcate : DuPont's Motion to: (1) Bifurcate the Compensatory Liability and Damages Phase of Trial (Phase I) from the Punitive Liability and Damages Phase (Phase II) and Exclude Post-Diagnosis Evidence from Phase I; or (2) in the Alternative, Issue Limiting Instructions and Allow the Introduction of all Relevant "Malice" Evidence in Phase I by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4977 MOTION in Limine to Permit Introduction of Statements from the Hill Peterson Website in the Punitive Damages Phase of Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Overly Broad Testimony and Evidence Regarding DuPont's Financial Health from the Second Phase of Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4975 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to DuPont's Facility in Dordrecht, Netherlands from the Second Phase of Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. 14, 2016 Report) (Long, D.)
December 30, 2016 Filing 4974 TRIAL BRIEF : DuPont's Bench Brief Regarding the Scope of Reprehensibility Evidence in the Punitive Damages Phase of Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4972 MOTION for Order to Apply the Ohio Tort Reform Act to Plaintiff Larry O. Moody's Claims (Preservation) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4971 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4887 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Plaintiffs Exhibit P1.612 (Motion in Limine No. 3) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4970 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4889 MOTION in Limine Preservation Motion In Limine To Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel From Commenting On Or Discussing Certain Matters And/Or Taking Certain Actions In The Presence Of The Jury Or Potential Jurors, With Additional Requests (Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4969 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4888 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Improper Testimony, Arguments, Or Opinions Regarding The Purported Bias And/Or Reputation Of The CAT Team And TERA Center (Motion in Limine No. 4) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4968 Response re #4896 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to DuPont's Notice of Preservation of Arguments and Positions Set Forth in Previously-Addressed Motions In Limine by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4967 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4895 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Any Evidence, Argument, Or Reference To Alleged Future Damages (Motion in Limine No. 11) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4966 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4893 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Any Argument, Statement, Evidence Or Testimony Regarding The Number Of Times Larry O. Moody Purportedly Satisfies The Class Membership Threshold (Motion in Limine No. 9) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4965 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4891 MOTION in Limine In Limine To Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel From Eliciting No Opinion Type Testimony From DuPonts Specific Causation Expert Or Otherwise Implying Or Arguing To The Jury That DuPont Has The Burden Of Proof On Causation (Motion in Limin filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4964 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4892 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Reference To Trial Plaintiff Larry O. Moodys Financial State (Motion in Limine No. 8) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4963 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4894 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Any Testimony, Statements, Arguments Or Questions Regarding C8-Related Health Issues In Individuals Other Than Trial Plaintiff Larry O. Moody (Motion in Limine No. 10) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4962 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4890 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Any Reference To Plaintiffs Post-Injury C8 Blood Level As Measured In 2005 By The C8 Health Project (Motion in Limine No. 6) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4961 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4886 MOTION in Limine To Limit Argument During Plaintiffs Opening Statement (Motion in Limine No. 2) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4960 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4885 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Unreliable Testimony Of Plaintiffs Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson (Motion in Limine No. 1) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4959 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4917 MOTION in Limine No. 20 To Preclude DuPont From Referring To Prior Excluded Testimony filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4958 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4916 MOTION in Limine No. 19 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiffs Irrelevant Social History and/or Conduct filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4957 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4915 MOTION in Limine No. 18 to Exclude DuPonts Counsel From Referring To Themselves As Part Of DuPont filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4956 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4913 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Preclude DuPont from Introducing Any Evidence Relating To Mr. Moody and High Cholesterol filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4955 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4912 MOTION in Limine No. 15 To Preclude DuPont From Introducing Evidence Of Cigarette Smoking And Cancerphobia filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4954 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4911 MOTION in Limine No. 14 To Exclude Speculative Testimony Of Defendants Expert Andrew Maier filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to DP Oppo to Moody MIL No. 14 (Maier Depo. Excerpts)) (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4953 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4910 MOTION in Limine No. 13 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiffs Alleged Family History Of Testicular Cancer And Plaintiffs Actual Family History Of Cancer filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4952 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4909 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Dr. David Mendoza from Testifying That Smoking Is a Risk Factor for Testicular Cancer filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4951 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4908 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude DuPont's Use Of or Reference To Purported FRE 1006 Summaries Based on DuPont's Internal Employee Health Data filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4950 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4907 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Preclude C8 Cancer Drug Trial Evidence filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - DP Opp to Vigneron MIL 14, #2 Ex. B - DP Bench Brief re clinical trial) (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4949 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4906 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Evidence of DuPont's Leach Class Action Settlement Payments/Funding Commitments filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4948 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4905 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or The United States filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4947 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4904 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to DP Oppo to Moody MIL No. 7 (Bahnson AUA Rebuke)) (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4945 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4903 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C8 filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - DP Opp to Vigneron MIL 6, #2 Ex. B - DP Opp to Freeman MIL 11) (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4944 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4902 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert,, Stephen T. Washburn filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/17 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00803-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4943 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4901 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S.on General Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4942 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4900 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Evidence of Dr. Michael B. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings, and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4941 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4899 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All "Expert" Opinions From Individuals Disclosed as Experts for DuPont in Other C8 Cases But Not In This Case filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - DP Opp to Bartlett MIL 5, #2 Ex. B - DP Opp to Freeman MIL 4, #3 Ex. C - DP Opp to Vigneron MIL 2) (Long, D.)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4940 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4898 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - DP Opp to Vigneorn MIL 1) (Long, D.)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4939 ORDER granting #4927 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4938 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 16, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion of Carrie Redlich, M.D., M.P.H., (4654) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4937 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 15, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion of Expert Robert W. Rickard, Ph.D., D.A.B.T. (4647). Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4936 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 14, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related to Corporate Conduct(4646) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4935 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 13, Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related to Narrative Corporate Conduct in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4934 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 12, Denying Defendant's Motion to Prohibit Use of Prior Deposition Testimony of Live Witness Bernard Reilly (4734) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4933 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 25, Granting Defendant's Motion for Time Limits in accordance with the parameters established by the Court and agreement of the parties at the Second Final Pretrial Conference held on November 7, 2016 (ECF No. 4832) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4932 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 24, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate or Alternatively to Issue Limiting Instruction and Allow Introduction of All Evidence of Malice in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4931 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 23, Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Application of the Ohio Tort Reform Act (4701) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4930 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 22, Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages (4655) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.). (plb)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4929 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER NO. 12 in case 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD; Granting, Denying, Granting in part and Denying in Part, and Finding as Moot in accordance with the conclusions of the Court and agreements of parties made on the record at the October 27, 2016 and November 7, 2016 hearings (ECF No. 4796, 4832). (4730) Motions in Limine in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD. (plb)
December 27, 2016 Filing 4928 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #4927 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/20/2017. Unopposed Motion to Extend Group I Daubert & Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines (Mace, Damond)
December 27, 2016 Filing 4927 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/20/2017. Unopposed Motion to Extend Group I Daubert & Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #4533 Motion to Strike ; denying #4534 Motion to Strike ; denying #4553 Motion to Strike. (plb)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4195 Motion for Leave to File (plb)
December 21, 2016 Filing 4926 JURY VERDICT. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 21, 2016 Filing 4925 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial completed on 12/21/2016. (Court Reporter: Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 21, 2016 Filing 4924 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions) (Long, D.)
December 21, 2016 Filing 4923 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Limiting Instructions (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Limiting Instructions) (Long, D.)
December 20, 2016 Filing 4920 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/20/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 19, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 12/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 19, 2016 Filing 4919 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/19/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4918 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott Index to Motions In Limine Filed by Plaintiff Larry Moody (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4917 MOTION in Limine No. 20 To Preclude DuPont From Referring To Prior Excluded Testimony by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4916 MOTION in Limine No. 19 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiffs Irrelevant Social History and/or Conduct by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4915 MOTION in Limine No. 18 to Exclude DuPonts Counsel From Referring To Themselves As Part Of DuPont by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4914 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Preclude DuPont From Questioning Plaintiff's Treating Physicians, David Mendoza, M.D. and Eric Klein, M.D. on General or Specific Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4913 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Preclude DuPont from Introducing Any Evidence Relating To Mr. Moody and High Cholesterol by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4912 MOTION in Limine No. 15 To Preclude DuPont From Introducing Evidence Of Cigarette Smoking And Cancerphobia by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4911 MOTION in Limine No. 14 To Exclude Speculative Testimony Of Defendants Expert Andrew Maier by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4910 MOTION in Limine No. 13 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiffs Alleged Family History Of Testicular Cancer And Plaintiffs Actual Family History Of Cancer by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4909 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Dr. David Mendoza from Testifying That Smoking Is a Risk Factor for Testicular Cancer by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4908 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude DuPont's Use Of or Reference To Purported FRE 1006 Summaries Based on DuPont's Internal Employee Health Data by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4907 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Preclude C8 Cancer Drug Trial Evidence by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4906 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Evidence of DuPont's Leach Class Action Settlement Payments/Funding Commitments by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4905 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or The United States by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4904 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4903 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C8 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4902 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert,, Stephen T. Washburn by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4901 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S.on General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4900 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Evidence of Dr. Michael B. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings, and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4899 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All "Expert" Opinions From Individuals Disclosed as Experts for DuPont in Other C8 Cases But Not In This Case by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4898 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4897 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Index to Motions in Limine (Mood) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4896 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Preservation of Arguments and Positions Set Forth in Previously-Addressed Motions in Limine (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4895 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Any Evidence, Argument, Or Reference To Alleged Future Damages (Motion in Limine No. 11) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moody Response to DuPont Discovery Requests) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4894 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Any Testimony, Statements, Arguments Or Questions Regarding C8-Related Health Issues In Individuals Other Than Trial Plaintiff Larry O. Moody (Motion in Limine No. 10) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Moody, Justin 2016 1201 transcript) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4893 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Any Argument, Statement, Evidence Or Testimony Regarding The Number Of Times Larry O. Moody Purportedly Satisfies The Class Membership Threshold (Motion in Limine No. 9) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vigneron Chart) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4892 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Reference To Trial Plaintiff Larry O. Moodys Financial State (Motion in Limine No. 8) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4891 MOTION in Limine In Limine To Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel From Eliciting No Opinion Type Testimony From DuPonts Specific Causation Expert Or Otherwise Implying Or Arguing To The Jury That DuPont Has The Burden Of Proof On Causation (Motion in Limine No. 7) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DuPont's Freeman MIL 14, #2 Exhibit B - DuPont's Vigneron MIL 6) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4890 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Any Reference To Plaintiffs Post-Injury C8 Blood Level As Measured In 2005 By The C8 Health Project (Motion in Limine No. 6) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4889 MOTION in Limine Preservation Motion In Limine To Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel From Commenting On Or Discussing Certain Matters And/Or Taking Certain Actions In The Presence Of The Jury Or Potential Jurors, With Additional Requests (Motion in Limine No. 5) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DuPont's Bartlett MIL 19, #2 Exhibit B - DuPont's Freeman MIL 18, #3 Exhibit C - DuPont's Vigneron MIL 8) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4888 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Improper Testimony, Arguments, Or Opinions Regarding The Purported Bias And/Or Reputation Of The CAT Team And TERA Center (Motion in Limine No. 4) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4887 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Plaintiffs Exhibit P1.612 (Motion in Limine No. 3) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P1.612 - As Redacted in Freeman, #2 Exhibit B - P1.612 Unredacted) (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4886 MOTION in Limine To Limit Argument During Plaintiffs Opening Statement (Motion in Limine No. 2) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4885 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Unreliable Testimony Of Plaintiffs Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson (Motion in Limine No. 1) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 4884 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/16/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Lahana DuFour, Denise Errett and Shawna Evans) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (jk)
December 15, 2016 Filing 4883 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/15/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 14, 2016 Filing 4882 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/14/2016. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour, Shauna Evans, Denise Errett) (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 13, 2016 Filing 4881 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/13/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Lahana DuFour, Denise Errett, Darla Coulter, Shauna Evans) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 13, 2016 Filing 4880 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/12/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Lahana DuFour, Darla Coulter, Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2016: #1 Exhibit list) (lvw). Modified texgt on 12/13/2016 (agm).
December 12, 2016 Filing 4879 Response re #4873 Brief on Plaintiffs' Position on One Judge/Two Juries Trial Structure by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
December 12, 2016 Filing 4878 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4800 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Craig Charles Frazier. (Hayden, Mark)
December 12, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 12/12/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 12, 2016 Filing 4877 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/12/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Denise Errett, Lahana DuFour, Shauna Evans) (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 11, 2016 Filing 4876 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Korte Deposition Transcript) (Mace, Damond)
December 8, 2016 Filing 4875 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/8/2016, ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus.). (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Darla Coulter, Denise Errett) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 6, 2016 Filing 4874 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/6/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Denise Errett, Darla Coulter and Shauna Evans) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 5, 2016 Filing 4873 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Position on a One Judge/Two Juries Trial Structure by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael) Modified text on 12/6/2016 (agm).
December 2, 2016 Filing 4872 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Filing Expert Declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alexander Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Cooper Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Fedoruk Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Luongo Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Maier Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Washburn Declaration) (Long, D.)
December 1, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 12/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 1, 2016 Filing 4871 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 12/1/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
December 1, 2016 Filing 4870 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4794 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
December 1, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial contiued 12/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4869 ORDER granting #4863 Plaintiff's Steering Committee's Motion to Extend. The PSC may have until 12/05/16 to submit its brief regarding the Court's proposal for multi-plaintiff trial structures. Defendant may, but is not required to, file a response by 12/12/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/30/2016. (dh1)
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 11/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 29, 2016 Filing 4868 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Bench Trial continued on 11/29/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 29, 2016 Filing 4867 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ronald Everett Barker OF APPEARANCE OF MARK T. HAYDEN, ROBERT A. BILOTT AND DAVID J. BUTLER Associated Cases 2:13-md-2433, 2:15-cv-00461 (Hayden, Mark)
November 29, 2016 Filing 4866 NOTICE by Plaintiff June Eileen Epple OF APPEARANCE OF MARK T. HAYDEN, ROBERT A. BILOTT AND DAVID J. BUTLER Associated Cases 2:13-md-02433, 2:14-cv-02034 (Hayden, Mark)
November 29, 2016 Filing 4865 Letter to Chief Judge Sargus and Judge Smith from Jacqueline A. Davis (lvw)
November 28, 2016 Filing 4864 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4800 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aaron T. Brogdon) (Mace, Damond)
November 28, 2016 Filing 4863 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/5/2016. by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
November 28, 2016 Filing 4862 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/28/2016. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour, Laura Samuels, Darla Coulter and Denise Errett) (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 28, 2016 Filing 4861 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company ; DuPont's Position on a One Judge/ Two Juries Trial Structure (Mace, Damond)
November 22, 2016 Filing 4859 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/22/2016. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour, Denise Errett, Laura Samuels, Shauna Evans) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 21, 2016 Filing 4858 RESPONSE to Motion re #4794 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mace, Damond)
November 21, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 21, 2016 Filing 4857 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/21/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Denise Errett and Darla Coulter) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4856 ORDER granting ( #154 in 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD) the Joint Motion to Extend Time for Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Determination and Entry of Award of Attorneys' Fees. Plaintiff shall be permitted to file his Reply until 11/29/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/21/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 18, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/21/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 18, 2016 Filing 4855 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/18/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Darla Coulter and Denise Errett) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 18, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 18, 2016 Filing 4854 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/17/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Lahana DuFour, Daral Coulter, Shauna Evans and Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2016: #1 Exhibit list) (lvw). Modified text on 11/21/2016 (agm).
November 16, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 16, 2016 Filing 4853 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Witness/Exhibits)(Court Reporter: Denise Errett and Darla Coulter) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 15, 2016 Filing 4852 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : DuPont's Notice of Filing Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions and DuPont's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - DuPont's Objections and Proposed Preliminary Instructions (Vigneron)) (Long, D.)
November 15, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 15, 2016 Filing 4851 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Trial held on 11/15/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Denise Errett, Darla Coulter (AM) Shauna Evans (PM)) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 15, 2016 Filing 4850 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hardin Report May 5 2016) (Mace, Damond)
November 15, 2016 Filing 4849 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand : Atishia Reitmire and Steven Reitmire v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01072 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4848 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Jury Selection held on 11/14/2016, Jury Trial held on 11/14/2016, Voir Dire held on 11/14/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels, Shauna Evans and Darla Coulter) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2016: #1 Letter re: Juror) (lvw).
November 14, 2016 Filing 4847 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4782 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.) Modified text and corrected link on 11/15/2016 (agm).
November 14, 2016 Filing 4846 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4784 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carrie Redlich (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4845 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4787 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4844 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4786 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims Based on Specific Causation (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4843 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4785 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Stevenson) (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4842 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4788 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Damages Based on Alleged "Cancerphobia" and any Alleged Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases in the Future (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4841 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4783 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4840 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4797 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Michael Andrew Maier, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4839 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4779 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Tony Luongo filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4838 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4781 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witnesses Dr. Douglas Weed, Dr. Robert Rickard, and Dr. Marion Fedoruk relating to General Causation filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4837 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4778 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4836 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4780 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik D. Alexander, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial continued to 11/15/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4835 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER 11 in case 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD; granting in part and denying in part #4652 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik D. Alexander, Ph.D., M.P.H.,Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion #4680 , and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of his Motion #4694 in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/10/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 10, 2016 Filing 4834 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4702 MOTION to Bifurcate : DuPont's Motion to: (1) Bifurcate the Compensatory Liability and Damages Phase of Trial (Phase I) from the Punitive Liability and Damages Phase (Phase II) and Exclude Post-Diagnosis Evidence from Phase I; or (2) in the Alternative, Issue Limiting Instructions and Allow the Introduction of All Relevant "Malice" Evidence in Phase I filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4833 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 21-A. Nunc Pro Tunc Order. On 11/07/16, this Court issued a Dispositive Motions Order 21 #4810 . DMO 21 contains a scrivener's error on page 2. The Court has replaced that page in DMO No. 21 so that it now reflects the proper paragraph. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/09/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 9, 2016 Filing 4832 Transcript of Proceedings of Second Final Pretrial Conference held on 11-07-2016, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Errett, Official, Telephone number (614) 719-3029. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2017. (Errett, Denise)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4831 STIPULATION for Vigneron Case Regarding Certain Previously Addressed Evidentiary Issues. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/08/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4830 ORDER denying #4804 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike DuPont's Supplemental Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/08/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4829 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand DeShawna Stewart, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.R.S., Jr. and Arden Randall Stewart as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.R.S., Jr. v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01049 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4828 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Shannon DeWeese and Scott DeWeese v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01048 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4827 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand David Alan Carr v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01047 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4826 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Thomas Callihan and Ruth Callihan v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01046 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4825 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4701 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Apply the Ohio Tort Reform Act at the Trial of Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.'s Claims filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4824 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/7/2016. List of attendees attached (Court Reporter: Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4823 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4797 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Michael Andrew Maier, Ph.D. (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4822 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4781 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witnesses Dr. Douglas Weed, Dr. Robert Rickard, and Dr. Marion Fedoruk relating to General Causation (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Expert Disclosures) (Mace, Damond)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4821 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4778 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4820 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4779 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Tony Luongo (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4819 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4780 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. (Moody) filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond) Modified on 11/8/2016 to link to correct motion. (pes).
November 7, 2016 Filing 4818 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4786 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims Based on Specific Causation filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4817 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4785 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4816 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4788 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Damages Based on Alleged "Cancerphobia" and any Alleged Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases in the Future filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4815 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4782 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4814 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4784 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carrie Redlich filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4813 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4783 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4812 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4787 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (London, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4811 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Deposition Transcript of Marion J. Fedoruk, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Fedoruk Marion 2016-10-25) (Mace, Damond)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4810 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 21. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Specific Causation. The Court denies (4653) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Specific Causation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/07/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4809 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 20. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Cancerphobia Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases. The Court grants in part and denies in part (4656) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Cancerphobia Portion of Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/07/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4808 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 10. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion of Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko. The Court grants #4648 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/07/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
November 6, 2016 Filing 4807 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4734 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Notice of Availability and Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Using the Prior Deposition Testimony of Bernard J. Reilly, Esq. at Trial filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Long, D.)
November 4, 2016 Filing 4806 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4804 MOTION to Strike #4803 Supplemental - Opposing, filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aneca E. Lasley) (Lasley, Aneca)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4805 Proposed Pretrial Order for the Stipulation for Vigneron Case Regarding Certain Previously Addressed Evidentiary Issues by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4804 MOTION to Strike #4803 Supplemental - Opposing, by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4803 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #4722 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude DuPont From Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Mr. Vigneron's Psychological History filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4802 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #4722 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude DuPont From Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Mr. Vigneron's Psychological History filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4801 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4734 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Notice of Availability and Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Using the Prior Deposition Testimony of Bernard J. Reilly, Esq. at Trial filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4800 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Craig Charles Frazier. Responses due by 11/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Hayden, Mark)
October 31, 2016 Filing 4799 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4702 MOTION to Bifurcate : DuPont's Motion to: (1) Bifurcate the Compensatory Liability and Damages Phase of Trial (Phase I) from the Punitive Liability and Damages Phase (Phase II) and Exclude Post-Diagnosis Evidence from Phase I; or (2) in the Alternative, Issue Limiting Instructions and Allow the Introduction of all Relevant "Malice" Evidence in Phase I filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (London, Michael) Modified text on 11/1/2016 (agm).
October 31, 2016 Filing 4798 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4701 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Apply the Ohio Tort Reform Act at the Trial of Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.'s Claims filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (London, Michael)
October 31, 2016 Filing 4797 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Michael Andrew Maier, Ph.D. by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
October 31, 2016 Filing 4796 Transcript of Proceedings of First Final Pretrial Conference (Vigneron), held on 10-27-2016, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber, Denise Errett, Official, Telephone number (614) 719-3029. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2017. (Errett, Denise) Modified text on 10/31/2016 (agm).
October 31, 2016 Filing 4795 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
October 28, 2016 Filing 4794 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S) (London, Michael)
October 28, 2016 Filing 4793 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Kevin Michael Keaton v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01027 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 28, 2016 Filing 4792 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Marilyn L. Wozniak v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-01028 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/27/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (jk)
October 27, 2016 Filing 4791 Witness List by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 26, 2016 Filing 4790 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 120: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-98). (er)
October 25, 2016 Filing 4789 RESPONSE to Motion re #4735 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/19/2016. & Response to Notice of Supplemental Production [ECF No. 4743] filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4788 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Damages Based on Alleged "Cancerphobia" and any Alleged Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases in the Future by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moody Medical Records) (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4787 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MOODY (Amended) PFS (5.18.2016)) (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4786 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims Based on Specific Causation by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4785 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4784 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carrie Redlich by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF No 4315, #2 Exhibit B - ECF No 4346) (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4783 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF No 2819, #2 Exhibit B - ECF No 3556) (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4782 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moody Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit B - Mot to Exclude Testimony of Smith and Johnson, #3 Exhibit C - Reply ISO Mot Exclude Testimony of Smith and Johnson) (Mace, Damond)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4781 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witnesses Dr. Douglas Weed, Dr. Robert Rickard, and Dr. Marion Fedoruk relating to General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael) Modified to correct filing party on 10/25/2016 (agm).
October 24, 2016 Filing 4780 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik D. Alexander, Ph.D. by Plaintiff Larry Ogle Moody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael) Modified to correct filing party on 10/25/2016 (agm).
October 24, 2016 Filing 4779 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Tony Luongo by Plaintiff Larry Ogle Moody. (London, Michael) Modified to correct filing party on 10/25/2016 (agm).
October 24, 2016 Filing 4778 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko by Plaintiff Larry Ogle Moody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael) Modified text to correct filing party on 10/25/2016 (agm).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4777 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 9. Motions Directed at Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Bahnson and Defense Expert Dr. Luongo. The Court grants in part and denies in part #4657 Defendant's Motion Regarding Dr. Robert Bahnson and grants in part and denies as moot in part #4649 Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Dr. Luongo. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. on 10/24/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw) Modified text on 10/25/2016 (agm). Modified on 10/28/2016 (dh1).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4776 ORDER granting (4771) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Parties have until 11/7/16 to file Response briefs and 11/14/16 to file Reply briefs, in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/24/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:15-cv-00803-EAS-EPD (lvw)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4775 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Motion for Time Limits on the Parties' Presentation of Evidence at Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4774 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Plaintiff's Expert Reports (Moody) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Bahnson, Robert, #2 Ex. B - MacIntosh, David) (Mace, Damond)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4773 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing DuPont Expert Reports (Moody) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Washburn, #2 Ex. B - Edmundowicz, #3 Ex. C - Luongo, #4 Ex. D - Moore, #5 Ex. E - Fedoruk, #6 Ex. F - Maier, #7 Ex. G - Alexander, #8 Ex. H - Cooper) (Mace, Damond)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4772 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Deposition Transcripts (Moody) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Moody, #2 Ex. B - Klein, #3 Ex. C - Mendoza, #4 Ex. D - Bahnson, #5 Ex. E - Luongo) (Mace, Damond)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4771 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 11/7/2016. Joint Motion for Brief Extension of Time to File Response Briefs (11/07/2016) and Reply Briefs (11/14/2016) to the Daubert/Summary Judgment Motions by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4770 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4719 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiff's Irrelevant Prior Conduct filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4769 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4721 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Preclude DuPont from Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Speculative Alternative Causes for Mr. Vigneron's Testicular Cancer filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Vigneron MIL 11 Ex. A, #2 Vigneron MIL 11 Ex. B, #3 Vigneron MIL 11 Ex. C) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4768 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4723 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Preclude Evidence of DuPont's Leach Class Action Settlement Payments/Funding Commitments filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4767 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4711 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4766 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4725 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude DuPont's Use of or Reference to Purported FRE 1006 Summaries Based on DuPont's Internal Employee Health Data, #4431 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Preclude DuPont's References to Communications Authored by Government Agencies Unless Such Communications are Shown to be Authentic and Actually Received by DuPont During the Time Period in Question filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters to Bilott) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4765 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4724 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Preclude C-8 Cancer Drug Trial Evidence filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D.2664, #2 Exhibit B - D.2885(S), #3 Exhibit C - D.2176, #4 Exhibit D - Patent app) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4764 ORDER granting (4742) Motion for Extension of Time to File 702/Daubert Motion in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/20/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:15-cv-00803-EAS-EPD (lvw)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4763 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4718 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as one of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or The United States filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4762 Response re #4703 Notice (Other) of Preservation of Arguments and Positions Set Forth In Previously-Addressed Motions In Limine by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4761 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4704 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Standards of Ethics, Morality, Social Responsibility, or Other Extra-Legal Standards of Conduct, and Request for Application of Prior Rulings (Motion in Limine No. 10) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4760 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4705 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude the Personal E-mails of Bernard J. Reilly and Request for Clarification on the Scope of Redactions (Motion in Limine No. 9) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4759 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4727 MOTION in Limine to Preclude P's Counsel from Commenting on or Discussing Matters &/or Taking Actions in the Presence of the Jury or Potential Jurors, with Add. Requests (Mot. in Limine No. 8) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4758 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4706 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Comments Concerning Alleged Violations of the Toxic Substances Control Act and Resource Conservation and Recovery Act (Motion in Limine No. 7) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4757 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4707 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Renewed Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Counsel from Eliciting "No Opinion Given" Type Testimony from DuPont's Specific Causation Expert or Otherwise Implying to the Jury that DuPont has t filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4756 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4708 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding Alleged "Future Damages" (Motion in Limine No. 5) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4755 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4722 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude DuPont From Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Mr. Vigneron's Psychological History filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4754 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4709 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Reference to Trial Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.'s Financial State (Motion in Limine No. 4) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4753 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4710 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning the Discharge of C8 into the Ohio River and Disposal of C8 in Landfills (Motion in Limine No. 3) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4752 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4720 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude All Evidence and References to Plaintiff's Irrelevant First Divorce, The Divorce Decree Resulting Threfrom, as well as his Bankruptcy Filing filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4751 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4729 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to the Science Panel and its Findings (Motion in Limine No. 1), #4730 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Improper Use of DuPont's Agreement Not to Contest General Causation (Motion in Limine No. 11), #4728 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bolstering of the Science Panel's 2012 Findings (Motion in Limine No. 2) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4750 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4717 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bahnson Deposition Excerpt (pg. 22-33), #2 Exhibit B - Bahnson Deposition Excerpt (pg. 50-53)) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4749 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4716 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C-8 filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Freeman DP MIL Opp 11) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4748 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4715 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert, Stephen T. Washburn filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4747 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4714 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S., on General Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4746 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4713 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Dr. Michael B. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings, and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4745 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4712 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and ALL "Expert" Opinions From Individuals Disclosed As Experts for DuPont In Other C-8 Cases But Not In this Case filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bartlett Opp to MIL 5, #2 Exhibit B - Freeman DP MIL Opp 4) (Mace, Damond)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4744 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Denise A. Vigneron by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Denise Vigneron) (Mace, Damond)
October 19, 2016 Filing 4743 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #4739 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #4689 Order on Motion to Compel, DuPont's Notice of Supplemental Production (Mace, Damond)
October 19, 2016 Filing 4742 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/31/2016. Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Rule 702/Daubert Motion by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (London, Michael)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4741 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 21. Initial Trial Schedules for the First Group of Non-Bellwether Trials. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/18/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD et al. (dh1)
October 17, 2016 Filing 4740 Witness List by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4739 ORDER granting #4735 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall have until 10/19/16 to complete the supplemental production required by #4689 Discovery Order No. 12. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/13/2016. (dh1) Modified link on 10/14/2016 (agm).
October 13, 2016 Filing 4738 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Expert Declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Glenn, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Hardin, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Horinko, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Luongo, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Rickard, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Washburn) (Mace, Damond)
October 13, 2016 Notice of Correction re: #4733 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number 0648-5690007) of Michael A. London, Gary J. Douglas, Rebecca G. Newman, Virginia E. Anello, Alicia P. Ellsayed. Pursuant to #4628 Pretrial Order No. 20-A: Additional Pro Hac Vice Instructions, Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are to be filed in each trial case, not the MDL action. This motion has been refiled by the Court in the proper case, 2:13-cv-136 Vigneron v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (agm) Modified text on 10/13/2016 (agm).
October 13, 2016 Filing 4737 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Michael A. Lemon v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00982 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 13, 2016 Filing 4736 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Carol Jane Lathey v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00981 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4735 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/19/2016. by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Brogdon Decl.) (Mace, Damond)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4734 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Notice of Availability and Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Using the Prior Deposition Testimony of Bernard J. Reilly, Esq. at Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: DuPont's Objections to Plaintiff's Affirmative Deposition Designations for Bernard J. Reilly, #2 Exhibit B: DuPont's General Objections) (Mace, Damond)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4733 ***See 10/13/2016 Notice of Correction*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number 0648-5690007) of Michael A. London, Gary J. Douglas, Rebecca G. Newman, Virginia E. Anello, Alicia P. Ellsayed by Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr. (Butler, David) Modified text on 10/13/2016 (agm).
October 12, 2016 Filing 4732 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 119: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-97). (er)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4731 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Index to Defendant's Motions in Limine (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4730 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Improper Use of DuPont's Agreement Not to Contest General Causation (Motion in Limine No. 11) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4729 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to the Science Panel and its Findings (Motion in Limine No. 1) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4728 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bolstering of the Science Panel's 2012 Findings (Motion in Limine No. 2) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF No. 4446, #2 Exhibit B - ECF No. 4442) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4727 MOTION in Limine to Preclude P's Counsel from Commenting on or Discussing Matters &/or Taking Actions in the Presence of the Jury or Potential Jurors, with Add. Requests (Mot. in Limine No. 8) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bartlett MIL No. 19, #2 Exhibit B - Freeman MIL No. 18) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4726 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott of Filing Plaintiff's Index to Motions in Limine Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr. (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4725 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude DuPont's Use of or Reference to Purported FRE 1006 Summaries Based on DuPont's Internal Employee Health Data by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4724 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Preclude C-8 Cancer Drug Trial Evidence by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4723 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Preclude Evidence of DuPont's Leach Class Action Settlement Payments/Funding Commitments by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4722 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude DuPont From Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Mr. Vigneron's Psychological History by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4721 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Preclude DuPont from Introducing Any Evidence Relating to Speculative Alternative Causes for Mr. Vigneron's Testicular Cancer by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4720 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude All Evidence and References to Plaintiff's Irrelevant First Divorce, The Divorce Decree Resulting Threfrom, as well as his Bankruptcy Filing by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4719 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiff's Irrelevant Prior Conduct by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4718 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as one of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or The United States by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4717 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4716 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C-8 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4715 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert, Stephen T. Washburn by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4714 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S., on General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4713 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Dr. Michael B. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings, and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4712 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and ALL "Expert" Opinions From Individuals Disclosed As Experts for DuPont In Other C-8 Cases But Not In this Case by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4711 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4710 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning the Discharge of C8 into the Ohio River and Disposal of C8 in Landfills (Motion in Limine No. 3) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vigneron Discovery Response 18) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4709 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Reference to Trial Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.'s Financial State (Motion in Limine No. 4) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Unsecured Debt List) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4708 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding Alleged "Future Damages" (Motion in Limine No. 5) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Response to ROG 3) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4707 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Renewed Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Counsel from Eliciting "No Opinion Given" Type Testimony from DuPont's Specific Causation Expert or Otherwise Implying to the Jury that DuPont has the Burden of Proof on Causation (Motion in Limine No. 6) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Freeman MIL 14) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4706 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Comments Concerning Alleged Violations of the Toxic Substances Control Act and Resource Conservation and Recovery Act (Motion in Limine No. 7) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4705 MOTION in Limine DuPont's Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude the Personal E-mails of Bernard J. Reilly and Request for Clarification on the Scope of Redactions (Motion in Limine No. 9) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Transcript Pages from 9-11 Hrg) (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4704 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Standards of Ethics, Morality, Social Responsibility, or Other Extra-Legal Standards of Conduct, and Request for Application of Prior Rulings (Motion in Limine No. 10) by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4703 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Preservation of Arguments and Positions Set Forth in Previously-Addressed Motions in Limine (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4702 MOTION to Bifurcate : DuPont's Motion to: (1) Bifurcate the Compensatory Liability and Damages Phase of Trial (Phase I) from the Punitive Liability and Damages Phase (Phase II) and Exclude Post-Diagnosis Evidence from Phase I; or (2) in the Alternative, Issue Limiting Instructions and Allow the Introduction of all Relevant "Malice" Evidence in Phase I by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4701 MOTION for Order to : DuPont's Preservation Motion to Apply the Ohio Tort Reform Act at the Trial of Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.'s Claims by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4700 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4657 MOTION to Exclude THE TESTIMONY OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S SPECIFIC CAUSATION EXPERT, DR. ROBERT BAHNSON filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4699 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4653 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR. BASED ON SPECIFIC CAUSATION filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4698 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON SR.S CLAIM FOR DAMAGES BASED ON ALLEGED CANCERPHOBIA AND ANY ALLEGED FEAR OF DEVELOPING OTHER PROBABLE LINK DISEASES IN THE FUTURE filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4697 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4647 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Robert W. Rickard, Ph.D., D.A.B.T., Relating to General Causation filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4696 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4649 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Tony Luongo, M.D. filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4695 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4648 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4694 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4652 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4693 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4655 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4692 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4654 MOTION to Exclude THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF CARRIE REDLICH BASED ON EXTRA-LEGAL STANDARDS OF CARE, HER IMPROPER LEGAL CONCLUSIONS, AND DUPONTS STATE OF MIND filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4691 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4645 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4690 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4646 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4689 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 12. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel DuPont to Supplement its Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions. The Court grants in part and denies in part #4637 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. The Court grants plaintiffs' request for an order compelling DuPont to supplement its discovery requests and denies the plaintiffs' request for sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/07/2016. (dh1)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4688 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 11. Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions Regarding Expert Witness Discovery. The Court denies in part and denies as moot in part #4627 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order and Sanctions Relating to DuPont's Attempt to Circumvent the Discovery Process. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/07/16. (dh1)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4687 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON SR.S CLAIM FOR DAMAGES BASED ON ALLEGED CANCERPHOBIA AND ANY ALLEGED FEAR OF DEVELOPING OTHER PROBABLE LINK DISEASES IN THE FUTURE filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4686 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4653 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR. BASED ON SPECIFIC CAUSATION filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4685 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4657 MOTION to Exclude THE TESTIMONY OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S SPECIFIC CAUSATION EXPERT, DR. ROBERT BAHNSON filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4684 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4648 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B) (Mace, Damond)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4683 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4649 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Tony Luongo, M.D. filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4682 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4650 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.'s Claims Based on Diagnosed High Cholesterol filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4681 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4655 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4680 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4652 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4679 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4647 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Robert W. Rickard, Ph.D., D.A.B.T., Relating to General Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4678 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4654 MOTION to Exclude THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF CARRIE REDLICH BASED ON EXTRA-LEGAL STANDARDS OF CARE, HER IMPROPER LEGAL CONCLUSIONS, AND DUPONTS STATE OF MIND filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4677 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4646 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4676 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4645 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
September 29, 2016 Filing 4675 Transcript of the Continued Proceedings of the Final Pretrial Conference on Various Motions held on 5/27/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2016. (er)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4674 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #4668 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5669404) of D. Patrick Long (Mace, Damond)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4673 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re #4663 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5667000) of Marques P.D. Richeson (Mace, Damond)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4672 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott of Filing Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4671 NOTICE of Appearance by Damond R Mace for Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company (Mace, Damond)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4670 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Henry L. Taylor, II v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00924 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4669 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Craig S. Sevy v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00923 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4668 ***Withdrawn pursuant to #4674 NOTICE of Withdrawal*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5669404) of D. Patrick Long by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mace, Damond) Modified on 9/29/2016 (agm).
September 26, 2016 Filing 4667 Response re #4658 Reply (non motion) by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4666 Reply re #4659 Response (non motion) of Plaintiffs to Pretrial Order No. 47 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4665 REPLY to #4661 Response to Motion re #4637 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael) Modified on 9/27/2016 to add link (agm).
September 26, 2016 Filing 4664 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 118: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-96). (er)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4663 ***Withdrawn pursuant to #4673 NOTICE of Withdrawal*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5667000) of Marques P.D. Richeson by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mace, Damond) Modified on 9/29/2016 (agm).
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4662 ORDER - re #4637 Motion to Compel filed by Connie Jo Abbott. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support on or before 9/26/16 at 12:00 pm. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/21/16. (lvw) Modified on 9/22/2016 to correct time reply is due (agm).
September 20, 2016 Filing 4661 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4637 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mace, Damond)
September 20, 2016 Filing 4660 REPLY to #4634 Response to Motion re #4627 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael) Modified text to add additional link on 9/21/2016 (agm).
September 20, 2016 Filing 4659 Response re #4633 Order by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 20, 2016 Filing 4658 Reply re #4633 Order by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4657 MOTION to Exclude THE TESTIMONY OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S SPECIFIC CAUSATION EXPERT, DR. ROBERT BAHNSON by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A SEER Bahnson, #2 Ex. B NYS DOH fact sheet, #3 Ex. C Times Union) (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON SR.S CLAIM FOR DAMAGES BASED ON ALLEGED CANCERPHOBIA AND ANY ALLEGED FEAR OF DEVELOPING OTHER PROBABLE LINK DISEASES IN THE FUTURE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4655 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR.S CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4654 MOTION to Exclude THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF CARRIE REDLICH BASED ON EXTRA-LEGAL STANDARDS OF CARE, HER IMPROPER LEGAL CONCLUSIONS, AND DUPONTS STATE OF MIND by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Notice of Adoption Vigneron, #2 Ex. B - Motion to Exclude Redlich (Freeman), #3 Ex. C - Reply Mtn. to Exclude Redlich) (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4653 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF TRIAL PLAINTIFF KENNETH VIGNERON, SR. BASED ON SPECIFIC CAUSATION by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4652 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Dominik Alexander, Ph.D. by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4651 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Dominik Alexander, Ph.D., M.S.P.H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4650 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.'s Claims Based on Diagnosed High Cholesterol by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4649 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Tony Luongo, M.D. by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4648 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Marianne L. Horinko by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4647 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert Witness Robert W. Rickard, Ph.D., D.A.B.T., Relating to General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4646 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Corporate Conduct Experts: Stephen Petty, Steven Amter, Barry Levy, and Michael Siegel by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Adoption Vigneron, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Exclude Corporate Conduct Experts, #3 Exhibit C - Reply re Exclude Corporate Conduct Experts) (Mace, Damond)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4645 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of James Smith and Robert Johnson by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Adoption Vigneron, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Exclude Testimony of Smith and Johnson, #3 Exhibit C - Reply re Exclude Testimony of Smith and Johnson) (Mace, Damond)
September 15, 2016 Filing 4644 REPLY to #4626 Response to Motion re #4613 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael) Modified text to add link on 9/16/2016 (agm).
September 15, 2016 Filing 4643 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Tina Hickman and Lance Hickman, Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of C.M.H. and D.R.H. v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00885 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 14, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4637 MOTION to Compel . Responses due by 9/20/2016 (agm)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4642 ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Motion to Compel DuPont to Supplement its Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions #4637 . Defendant may file a memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion on or before 09/20/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/14/2016. (dh1)
September 14, 2016 Filing 4641 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Deposition Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vigneron, Sr., Kenneth 2016-06-28, #2 Exhibit B - Henry, John, MD -Vigneron 2016-07-12, #3 Exhibit C - Hunkele, Eric, MD 2016-07-08, #4 Exhibit D - Shah, Mukund, MD 2016-07-15, #5 Exhibit E - Bahnson, M.D., Robert R 2016-08-26, #6 Exhibit F - Luongo, Tony 2016-08-30, #7 Exhibit G - Hardin, Bryan, #8 Exhibit H - Horinko, Marianne) (Mace, Damond)
September 14, 2016 Filing 4640 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Plaintiff's Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MacIntosh Report, #2 Exhibit B - Bahnson Report, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Adoption of Experts) (Mace, Damond)
September 14, 2016 Filing 4639 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Defendant's Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ALEXANDER, Dominik - Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - EDMUNDOWICZ, Daniel - Expert Report, #3 Exhibit C - GLENN, Bob - Expert Report, #4 Exhibit D - HARDIN, Bryan - Supplemental Letter Report, #5 Exhibit E - HORINKO, Marianne - Expert Report, #6 Exhibit F - LUONGO, Tony - Expert Report, #7 Exhibit G - RICKARD, Bobby - MDL Expert Report, #8 Exhibit H - RICKARD, Bobby - Supplemental Expert Report, #9 Exhibit I - WASHBURN, Stephen - Expert Report, #10 Exhibit J - DuPont Notice of Adoption of Prior Expert Disclosures) (Mace, Damond)
September 14, 2016 Filing 4638 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 117: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-95). (er)
September 13, 2016 Filing 4637 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
September 13, 2016 Filing 4636 Witness List by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4635 ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions Relating to DuPont's Attempt to Circumvent the Discovery Process #4627 , and DuPont has filed its memorandum in opposition #4634 . Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their motion on or before 09/20/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/13/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
September 12, 2016 Filing 4634 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4627 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A.pdf, #2 Ex. B.pdf, #3 Ex. C.pdf, #4 Ex. D.pdf, #5 Ex. E.pdf, #6 Ex. F.pdf) (Mace, Damond)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4633 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 47. Transfer of Venue; Suggestion of Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/08/2016. (dh1)
September 7, 2016 Filing 4632 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 18-B. Extension of Dispositive and Daubert Motions Deadlines. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend CMO 18 Relating to Kenneth Vigneron Pretrial Schedule is granted. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
September 7, 2016 Filing 4631 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order No. 18 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 10/3/2016 (London, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 4630 Witness List by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4627 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (agm)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4629 ORDER re #4627 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions Relating to DuPont's Attempt to Circumvent the Discovery Process. The Court modifies the traditional briefing schedule set forth in S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.2(a)(2), and directs DuPont to file its memorandum in opposition on or before 09/12/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/06/2016. (dh1)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4628 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 20-A. Additional Pro Hac Vice Instructions. This Pretrial Order supplements #273 Pretrial Order No. 20. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 09/06/2016. (dh1)
September 2, 2016 Filing 4627 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (London, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Filing 4626 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4613 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Stephen Fazio in Sup. of Def.'s Opp. to Pl.'s Mot. to Alter or Amend Judg.) (Mace, Damond)
September 1, 2016 Notation Nunc Pro Tunc Order: The document at ECF #4624 was replaced on 09/01/16 to correct the title, changing it from "Dispositive Motions Order No. 20" to "Case Management Order No. 20." (dh1)
August 31, 2016 Filing 4625 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Appearance of Kevin T. Van Wart, P.C. (filed by Damond Mace on behalf of Kevin T. Van Wart, P.C.) (Mace, Damond)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4624 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 20. Defendant's Objection to the November 2016 and January 2017 Trial Schedules. The Court concludes that scheduling Mr. Vigneron for trial in November 2016, and scheduling Mr. Moody for trial in January 2017 does not violate due process, nor is it an abuse of discretion. The Court therefore denies DuPont's request to vacate those trial dates and overrules its Objection. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/30/2016. (dh1). (dah1).
August 26, 2016 Filing 4623 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Appearance of Mark D. Anstoetter (filed by Damond Mace on behalf of Mark D. Anstoetter) (Mace, Damond)
August 17, 2016 Filing 4622 Reply re #4619 Response to Order to Show Cause, #4608 Order, by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
August 17, 2016 Filing 4621 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
August 12, 2016 Filing 4620 Reply re #4604 Redacted Document, in Support of DuPont's Objection to the Acceleration and Selection of Trial Cases for November 2016 and January 2017 and Case Management Order Nos. 18 and 19 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
August 12, 2016 Filing 4619 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
August 12, 2016 Filing 4618 Objection to Transfer of Venue by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4617 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 8. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related Narrative. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Corporate Conduct Experts #4319 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/09/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
August 9, 2016 Filing 4616 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T Hayden for Plaintiff Craig Charles Frazier (Hayden, Mark)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4615 ORDER: DuPont has filed an Objection to the Acceleration and Selection of Trial Cases for November 2016 and January 2017 and Case Management Orders Nos. 18 and 19 ( 4603 , #4604 ) and Plaintiffs have filed their response to this Objection #4614 . DuPont may file a reply in support of its Objection on or before 08/12/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/09/16. (dh1)
August 8, 2016 Filing 4614 Response re #4604 Redacted Document, DuPont's Objection to the Acceleration and Selection of Trial Cases for November 2016 and January 2017 and Case Management Order Nos 18 and 19 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
August 8, 2016 Filing 4613 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 9/1/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4612 ORDER granting (4594) Motion to Clairfy in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/8/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (lvw)
August 5, 2016 Filing 4611 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing and Proffer of Affirmative Deposition Designations, Counter-Counter Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affirmative Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Counter-counter designations, #3 Exhibit C - Objections, #4 Exhibit D - Affirmative, Counter and Objections, #5 Exhibit E - Submission Regarding Unresolved Deposition Designations) (Mace, Damond)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4610 ORDER granting #4609 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/2016. (agm)
August 3, 2016 Filing 4609 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth E. Chambers (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5601597) by Plaintiff Kenneth H. Rizer, Jr. Responses due by 8/29/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Conlin, Jon)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4608 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 46 - Notice and Opportunity to be Heard on Transfer of Venue. The parties are directed to file simultaneous briefs by 11:00 a.m., 08/12/16, to show cause why several cases should not be transferred for trial in the Western Division of this district. The parties may file a response to their opposing counsels' brief by 08/17/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/02/2016. (dh1)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4606 ORDER: DuPont has filed an Objection to the Acceleration and Selection of Trial Cases for November 2016 and January 2017 and Case Management Orders Nos. 18 and 19 ( 4603 and #4604 ). Plaintiffs shall file their response to this Objection on or before 08/08/16. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/02/2016. (dh1)
August 2, 2016 Filing 4605 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Wayne D. Hendershot v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 16-cv-00752 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
August 1, 2016 Filing 4604 REDACTION DOCUMENT: DUPONTS OBJECTION TO THE ACCELERATION AND SELECTION OF TRIAL CASES FOR NOVEMBER 2016 AND JANUARY 2017 AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NOS. 18 AND 19 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A. Dowdy Baker Agreement, #2 Ex. B placeholder, #3 Ex. C placeholder, #4 Ex. D placeholder, #5 Ex. E placeholder, #6 Ex. F email, #7 Ex. G. Discovery Requests Propounded on Vigneron) (Mace, Damond)
August 1, 2016 Filing 4602 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 116: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-94). (sct)
July 28, 2016 Filing 4599 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Mediation Conference held on 7/28/2016. (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) (lvw)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4598 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 19 - DuPont's Rule 50 Motions. The Court denies #4569 DuPont's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Trial Plaintiff David Freeman's Claims and #4578 DuPont's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Trial Plaintiff David Freeman's Claims and Motion to Strike Cancerphobia Evidence. The Court took oral argument on these motions during trial on 06/17/16 and 07/01/16, respectively. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/26/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4597 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 18 - DuPont's Motion for an Order to Apply Ohio Tort Reform Act. The Court denies #4401 DuPont's Motion for an Order to Apply Ohio Tort Reform Act. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/26/16. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4596 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 7 - Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Related Corporate Conduct. The Court grants in part and denies in part #4319 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Corporate Conduct Experts. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/26/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4595 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 13-A - Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 26, 2016 Filing 4594 MOTION to Clarify and Preserve the Record for Appeal by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Mtn to Clarify) (Mace, Damond)
July 25, 2016 Filing 4593 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr of Service of Subpoena upon City of Belpre Water Dept. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Hayden, Mark)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4592 ORDER granting #4589 DuPont's Motion to File Document Under Seal. DuPont is permitted to file the document under seal and is directed to contemporaneously file a public version with any confidential, sensitive medical information redacted. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/22/16. (dh1)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4591 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19 - Pretrial Schedule for Moody Trial. Jury Trial set for 1/17/2017 at 9:00 AM, First Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 9:00 AM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2017 at 9:00 AM and 01/10/17 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/19/2016. Attachment: Final Pretrial Order. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:15-cv-00803-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 21, 2016 Filing 4590 Transcript of Proceedings of the Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/20/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L. Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 8/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2016. (Samuels, Laura)
July 20, 2016 Filing 4589 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4588 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 18 - Pretrial Schedule for Vigneron Trial. This document relates to Case No. 2:13-cv-136. Final Pretrial Conferences set for 10/27/2016 at 9:00 AM; 11/07/16 at 9:00 a.m. and 11/08/16 at 9:00 a.m. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/19/2016. Attachment: Final Pretrial Order. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4587 ORDER granting (4517) DuPont's Motion for Leave to Substitute Correct Version of Motion in Limine No. 9 and (4523) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Version of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/19/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4586 ORDER: Because a resolution was reached in Ms. Dowdy's and Ms. Baker's cases, the dates scheduled in CMO 14 and CMO 15 are VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/19/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:14-cv-00094-EAS-EPD, 2:14-cv-00185-EAS-EPD (dh1)
July 18, 2016 Filing 4585 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr of Subpoena Served upon Little Hocking Water Association (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Hayden, Mark)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4584 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 45 - April 18, 2016 Conference Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/15/2016. (dh1)
July 13, 2016 Filing 4583 NOTICE of IN-PERSON COURT-ORDERED MEDIATION set for Wednesday, 7/27/2016, 9:00 AM and Thursday, 7/28/2016, 9:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (aq)
July 12, 2016 Filing 4582 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions) (Mace, Damond)
July 6, 2016 Filing 4581 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing of Proposed Instruction Regarding Remaining Bases for Plaintiff's Claimed Cancerphobia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Proposed Instructions re Cancerphobia) (Mace, Damond)
July 6, 2016 Filing 4580 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Proposed Limiting Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Joint Proposed Limiting Instructions - Freeman - 5-16-16, #2 Exhibit B - 5-28-16 Joint Proposed Additional Limiting Instructions - with Both Parties, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Proposed Instruction re Video Depositions) (Mace, Damond)
July 4, 2016 Filing 4579 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4578 Supplemental MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
July 1, 2016 Filing 4578 Supplemental MOTION for Directed Verdict by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 7/25/2016 (Mace, Damond)
June 30, 2016 Filing 4577 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4553 MOTION to Strike #4535 Objection (non motion), filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
June 28, 2016 Filing 4576 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Michael L. Baldwin v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 2:16-cv-00568 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 21, 2016 Filing 4575 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 115: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-93). (er)
June 20, 2016 Filing 4574 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4569 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4573 ORDER regarding Juror Number 60. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/20/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)
June 20, 2016 Filing 4572 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4553 MOTION to Strike #4535 Objection (non motion), filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 20, 2016 Filing 4571 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Susan White and Greg White v E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company; Case No. 2.15-cv-00210 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 19, 2016 Filing 4570 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4569 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
June 17, 2016 Filing 4569 MOTION for Directed Verdict by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4568 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Robert White v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-00807 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4567 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Thomas Weekley and Jennifer Weekley v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-01690 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4566 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Michael Nutter v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-00513 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4565 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Alfred Fauver v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-01853 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4564 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Ronald Cross v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 14-cv-00187 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4563 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Carolyn Charles v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-00116 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4562 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Aaron Callihan v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 15-cv-01917 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 16, 2016 Filing 4561 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Ryan Balsley v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Case No. 13-cv-01155 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
June 8, 2016 Filing 4560 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr OF APPEARANCE OF ROBERT A. BILOTT, DAVID J. BUTLER AND MARK T. HAYDEN Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Hayden, Mark)
June 2, 2016 Filing 4559 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company : Notice of Filing Proposed Preliminary Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Preliminary Instructions) (Mace, Damond)
May 31, 2016 Filing 4558 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Tompson, William H Case No. 2.16-cv-00471 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 31, 2016 Filing 4557 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Parton, Alana R. Case No. 2.16-cv-00470 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 31, 2016 Filing 4556 Abbreviated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Fleming, Gary L Case No. 2.16-cv-00469 filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4555 Motions in Limine Order No. 11, References to the Pollution of the Ohio River. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 14, to Preclude Defendant's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or the United States, #4430 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/30/2016. (plb)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4554 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER NO. 10, Evidence Related to Mr. Freeman's Prior Conduct ; granting in part and denying in part #4434 Mr. Freeman's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/27/16. (aq)
May 27, 2016 Filing 4553 MOTION to Strike #4535 Objection (non motion), by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4552 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER NO. 9, Evidence Related to the Emmett Studies; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Mr. Freeman's Motion in Limine Regarding the Emmett Study. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/26/16. (aq)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4551 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 6, Defendant's Motion to Exclude Opinion of Carrie Redlich Related Corporate Conduct; granting in part and denying in part #4315 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carrie Redlich Based on Extra-Legal Standards of Care, Her Improper Legal Conclusion, and DuPont's State of Mind. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/26/16. (aq)
May 26, 2016 Filing 4550 TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION ORDER NO. 114: TRANSFER ORDER from the MDL Panel (CTO-92). (er)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4549 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 17. Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Decision on Bifurcation. Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision on Bifurcation #4400 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/25/16. (aq)
May 25, 2016 Filing 4548 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4401 MOTION for Order to Apply Ohio Tort Reform Act at the David Freeman Trial filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 25, 2016 Filing 4547 Transcript of Continued Proceedings of the Final Pretrial Conference on the Motions on Deposition Designations and Admissibility of Exhibits held on 05/18/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L. Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2016. (Samuels, Laura)
May 23, 2016 Filing 4546 TRIAL BRIEF : BENCH BRIEF REGARDING THE 2010/2011 PHASE 1 CLINICAL TRIAL TO INVESTIGATE THE POTENTIAL USE OF C8 AS A BENEFICIAL DRUG TO TREAT CANCER IN HUMANS by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (D 2885 (S)), #2 Ex B (D 2664), #3 Ex C (D 2541), #4 Ex D (D 2176)) (Mace, Damond)
May 23, 2016 Filing 4545 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Objections to du Pont's Use of or Reference to Trial Exhibit D.1854 and All Similiar Purported FRE 1006 Summaries Based on du Pont's Internal Employee Health Data by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael) Modified text on 5/24/2016 (agm).
May 23, 2016 Filing 4544 TRIAL BRIEF : Bench Brief Regarding the Admissibility of Rule 1006 Summaries of Voluminous Worker Surveillance Business Record Information by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Summaries, #2 Ex. B - O'Brien Email, #3 Ex. C - Kreckmann Declaration-Signed) (Mace, Damond)
May 23, 2016 Filing 4543 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Objections to du Pont's Use of or Reference to Trial Exhibits D.334 abd D.614 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael) Modified text on 5/24/2016 (agm).
May 23, 2016 Filing 4542 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Objections to du Pont's Use of or Reference to Trial Exhibit D.2885 and the CXR1002 Study by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael) Modified text on 5/24/2016 (agm).
May 23, 2016 Filing 4541 TRIAL BRIEF : Bench Brief Regarding Ohio EPA Records by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A (D 614).PDF, #2 Ex B (D 334).PDF, #3 Ex C (D 2744).PDF, #4 Ex D (D 2751).PDF) (Mace, Damond)
May 22, 2016 Filing 4540 Transcript of the Continued Proceedings of the Final Pretrial Conference on the Motions on Deposition Designations and Admissibility of Exhibits held on 5/17/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L. Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2016. (Samuels, Laura)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4539 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER NO. 8. Questioning of Plaintiff's Treating Physician on Causation. The Court grants #4433 Mr. Freeman's Motion in Limine No. 17, to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Treating Physician Kelli Anne Cawley, M.D., Regarding Causation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/19/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4538 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER NO. 7. May 6, 2016 Hearing on Motions in Limine. The Motions in limine found at ECF Nos. 4402-29, 4431-32, 4435-39, 4440-56 were granted, denied, granted in part and denied in part, and found moot in accordance with the conclusions made by the Court on the record at the hearing. The Court will issue separate decisions on the issues addressed in Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 14, 17 and 18 (ECF Nos. 4430, 4433, 4434). Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/18/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 16, 2016 Filing 4537 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #4430 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or the United States filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I) (Mace, Damond)
May 16, 2016 Filing 4536 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4400 MOTION to Bifurcate THE COMPENSATORY LIABILITY AND DAMAGES PHASE OF TRIAL (PHASE I) FROM THE PUNITIVE LIABILITY AND DAMAGES PHASE (PHASE II) AND TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE FROM PHASE I filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bartlett Reply ECF No 4181) (Mace, Damond)
May 16, 2016 Filing 4535 Objection : Preservation Objections to the Court's Trial Selection Procedures by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Mace, Damond)
May 13, 2016 Filing 4534 MOTION to Strike #4531 Trial Brief by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
May 13, 2016 Filing 4533 MOTION to Strike #4530 Trial Brief by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4532 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 5. Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Exclusion of Defendant's Causation Experts. The Court grants in part and denies in part Mr. Freeman's Motion Regarding General Causation #4322 and his Motion Regarding Specific Causation #4323 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/12/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 12, 2016 Filing 4531 TRIAL BRIEF : DuPont's Bench Brief Regarding Plaintiff's Objection to DuPont's Offering Deposition Testimony of Unavailable Expert Witnesses. by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 12, 2016 Filing 4530 TRIAL BRIEF : DuPont's Bench Brief to Exclude Plaintiff's Irrelevant and Unnecessary Counter-Designations. by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 11, 2016 Filing 4529 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #4106 Third MOTION to Compel (Reply Memorandum) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
May 11, 2016 Filing 4528 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John M. Flaherty dated 11/27/2015) (Mace, Damond)
May 10, 2016 Filing 4527 Transcript of Proceedings of the Final Pretrial Conference on the Motions in Limine held on 5/6/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L. Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Samuels, Laura)
May 9, 2016 Filing 4526 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4401 MOTION for Order to Apply Ohio Tort Reform Act at the David Freeman Trial filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 4525 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4400 MOTION to Bifurcate THE COMPENSATORY LIABILITY AND DAMAGES PHASE OF TRIAL (PHASE I) FROM THE PUNITIVE LIABILITY AND DAMAGES PHASE (PHASE II) AND TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE FROM PHASE I filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Filing 4524 Final Pretrial Conference held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on Friday, 5/6/2016, 9:00am (Court Reporter: Laura Samuels) (aq)
May 4, 2016 Filing 4523 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 10 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
May 4, 2016 Filing 4522 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #4106 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
May 2, 2016 Filing 4521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4517 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File CORRECT VERSION OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4520 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 16. Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment Related to Punitive Damages. The Court denies #4320 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on David Freeman's Claim for Punitive Damages. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/29/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4519 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 15. Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment Related to Specific Causation. The Court concludes that Mr. Freeman has set forth specific facts showing that there is a genuine issue for trial. The Court, therefore, denies #4316 DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Specific Causation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/29/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4518 EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS ORDER NO. 4 - Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Related to Specific Causation. The Court denies #4314 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Trial Plaintiff David Freeman's Specific Causation Expert, Dr. Robert Bahnson. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/28/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD, 2:13-cv-01103-EAS-EPD (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 27, 2016 Filing 4517 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File CORRECT VERSION OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1) (Mace, Damond)
April 27, 2016 Filing 4516 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #4106 Third MOTION to Compel (SECOND SUPPLEMENT) filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4515 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4430 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or the United States filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A to Opp to MIL No 14, #2 Ex B to Opp to MIL No 14, #3 Ex C to Opp to MIL No 14) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4514 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4402 MOTION in Limine No. 33 Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to Lobbying Efforts or to Social Discussions Between Craig Skaggs and a West Virginia Supreme Court Justice filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4513 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4403 MOTION in Limine No 32 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Other Evidence Regarding DuPonts State of Mind filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4512 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4404 MOTION in Limine No. 31 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument During the Compensatory Phase Trial Regarding the 2005 Department of Justice Subpoena and Related Investigation Concerning PFOA filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4511 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4405 MOTION in Limine No. 30 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Statement or Suggestion That C8 Causes Greater Disease or Harmful Effects in Children filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4510 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4406 MOTION in Limine No. 29 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Statement or Suggestion that Cattle Diseases or Cattle Deaths Have Been or Are Caused by C8 filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4509 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4407 MOTION in Limine No. 28 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Statement or Suggestion that Birth Defects Have Been or Are Caused by C8 filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4508 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4408 MOTION in Limine No. 27 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Argument, Statement, or Suggestion that a Violation of DuPonts Internal Exposure Guidelines Equates to Negligence, Violation of a Legal Duty, or Means that Harm Was Expected filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4507 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4409 MOTION in Limine No. 26 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude the Personal E-mails of Bernard J. Reilly and, in the Alternative, Request for Redactions filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4506 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4410 MOTION in Limine No. 25 - Motion in Limine For Reconsideration and to Preclude Admission of and Reference to Three Attorney-Created Documents and Related Information or, in the Alternative, Request for Additional Redactions filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4505 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4411 MOTION in Limine No. 24 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to or Introduction of Activist Group Materials, Articles, and Other Hearsay Documents filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4504 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4412 MOTION in Limine No. 23 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Preclude Comparisons and Analogies to Other Industries filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4503 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4413 MOTION in Limine No. 22 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to Alleged Wrongful Other Acts or Character Evidence of DuPont filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4502 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4414 MOTION in Limine No. 21 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to Other Lawsuits or Claims filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4501 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4424 MOTION in Limine No. 20 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Orders from Prior Lawsuits or Evidence or Comments By Counsel Regarding Alleged Destruction of Documents filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4), #5 Exhibit A (Part 5), #6 Exhibit A (Part 6), #7 Exhibit A (Part 7), #8 Exhibit A (Part 8), #9 Exhibit A (Part 9), #10 Exhibit A (Part 10), #11 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4500 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4425 MOTION in Limine No. 19 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to the Spin Off of Performance Chemicals, Any Indemnification Agreement Between DuPont and Chemours, or Any Proposed Merger Between DuPont and Dow Chemical Co. filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4499 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4449 MOTION in Limine No. 18 - PRESERVATION MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM COMMENTING ON OR DISCUSSING CERTAIN MATTERS AND/OR TAKING CERTAIN ACTIONS IN THE PRESENCE OF THE JURY OR POTENTIAL JURORS filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4498 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4439 MOTION in Limine No. 17 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Statement or Suggestion That an Enlarged Prostate or Prostate Cancer Is Caused by C8 Exposure, or That Testicular Cancer and Prostate Cancer are the Same filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4497 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4453 MOTION in Limine No. 16 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCES TO THE WEINBERG GROUP, AND TO ITS WORK INVOLVING EPHEDRA, FEN-PHEN, TOBACCO, OR AGENT ORANGE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST TO GIVE LIMITING INSTRUCT filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4496 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4456 MOTION in Limine No. 15 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED AND TESTIMONY ELICITED THROUGH IMPROPER QUESTIONING OF WITNESSES WITH NO PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4495 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4440 MOTION in Limine No. 14 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel from Eliciting No Opinion Given Type Testimony from DuPonts Specific Causation Experts filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4494 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4441 MOTION in Limine No. 13 - Motion in Limine to Permit Attribution of the Science Panels 2010 Publication filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4493 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4442 MOTION in Limine No. 12 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Statement, Opinion, or Argument that Bolsters the Science Panels Work filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4492 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4443 MOTION in Limine No. 11 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Unauthenticated Handwritten Notes Identified As P1.2543 and P1.7188, and Fayerweather Exhibit 39, and Any Reference to Hearsay Statements Contained Therein filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4491 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4450 MOTION in Limine No. 10 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT INTRODUCTION OF STATEMENTS FROM THE HILL PETERSON WEBSITE filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4490 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4451 MOTION in Limine No. 9 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO STANDARDS OF ETHICS, MORALITY, SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, OR OTHER EXTRA-LEGAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4489 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4444 MOTION in Limine No. 8 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding Alleged Future Damages filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4488 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4445 MOTION in Limine No. 7 - Motion in Limine to Preclude David Freeman and Veronica Freeman from Giving Scientific Opinions at Trial filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4487 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4446 MOTION in Limine No. 6 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Opinions of David L. MacIntosh filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4486 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4447 MOTION in Limine No. 5 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel from Offering Unsworn Testimony at Trial filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4485 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4454 MOTION in Limine No. 4 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR COMMENTS REGARDING ALLEGED VIOLATIONS OF THE TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL ACT AND RESOURCE CONSERVATION AND RECOVERY ACT filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4484 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4448 MOTION in Limine No. 3 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Speculative Statements or Suggestions Regarding Earlier or Different Agency Action filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4483 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4437 MOTION for Reconsideration of this Court's Prior Ruling on DuPont's Bartlett Trial Motion In Limine No. 2 Regarding DuPont's Violations of the Toxic Substances Control Act and Resource Conservation and Recovery Act filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4482 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4455 MOTION in Limine No. 2 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFF DAVID FREEMANS TOTAL MEDICAL EXPENSES filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4481 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4452 MOTION in Limine No. 1 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY STATEMENT OR QUESTIONS DIRECTED AT ALLEGED C8 RELATED HEALTH ISSUES IN PEOPLE OTHER THAN TRIAL PLAINTIFF DAVID FREEMAN filed by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4480 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4435 MOTION in Limine No. 19 to Exclude Duplicative Evidence and/or Testimony Relating to Specific-Causation and/or the Growth Rate of Mr. Freeman's Testicular Tumor filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4479 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4433 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Treating Physician, Kelli Anne Cawley, M.D., on General or Specific Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 17) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4478 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4432 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Testimony That a Draft Letter to Area Physicians Was, In fact, Sent by DuPont to Area Physicians filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4477 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4434 MOTION in Limine No. 18 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiff's Irrelevant Prior Conduct filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 18) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4476 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4431 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Preclude DuPont's References to Communications Authored by Government Agencies Unless Such Communications are Shown to be Authentic and Actually Received by DuPont During the Time Period in Question filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 15, #2 Exhibit B to Opp to MIL No 15, #3 Exhibit C to Opp to MIL No 15) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4475 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4429 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4474 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4428 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Family History of Cancer filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4473 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4426 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence Relating to Plaintiff's Community Liaison Role in the Emmett Studies filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4472 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4418 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All "Expert" Opinions from Individuals Disclosed as Experts for DuPont In Other C-8 Cases But Not In this Case filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4471 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4436 MOTION in Limine No. 20 to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Legal Representation of Plaintiff David Freeman filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4470 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4427 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C-8 filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4469 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4421 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude DuPont's Already Waived Privilege Claims filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4468 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4420 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S. on General Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4467 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4416 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence that C-8 Is Not Bioavailable in Human Blood filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4466 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4423 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert, Stephen T. Washburn filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 9) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4465 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4422 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Mr. Thomas Voltaggio filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 8) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4464 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4419 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Dr. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 5) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4463 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4417 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opp to MIL No 3) (Mace, Damond)
April 25, 2016 Filing 4462 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4415 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Preclude DuPont's Use of Third Party C-8 Guidance Levels to Contest General Causation filed by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 21, 2016 Filing 4461 Transcript of Proceedings of the In-Person Status Conference held on 4/18/2016, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L. Samuels, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2016. (Samuels, Laura)
April 21, 2016 Filing 4460 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney James B. Lees, Jr. and Hunt & Lees, L.C. (agm)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4459 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 17. Initial PreTrial Schedule for the 40 Cancer Trials to Begin in May 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/18/2016. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4458 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 14. Defendant's Motions on Mr. Freeman's Fraud and Emotional Distress Claims. The Court denies as moot Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trial Plaintiff David Freeman's Claim for Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Fraud #4317 , denies as moot the part of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on David Freeman's Emotional Distress Claims directed to the intentional infliction of emotional distress claim and grants in part and denies in part the portion of the Motion related to the NIED claim #4318 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/15/2016. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4457 NOTICE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company of Filing Index to DuPont's Motions in Limine (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4456 MOTION in Limine No. 15 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED AND TESTIMONY ELICITED THROUGH IMPROPER QUESTIONING OF WITNESSES WITH NO PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4455 MOTION in Limine No. 2 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFF DAVID FREEMANS TOTAL MEDICAL EXPENSES by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4454 MOTION in Limine No. 4 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR COMMENTS REGARDING ALLEGED VIOLATIONS OF THE TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL ACT AND RESOURCE CONSERVATION AND RECOVERY ACT by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4453 MOTION in Limine No. 16 - MOTION IN LIMINE SEEKING RECONSIDERATION AND TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCES TO THE WEINBERG GROUP, AND TO ITS WORK INVOLVING EPHEDRA, FEN-PHEN, TOBACCO, OR AGENT ORANGE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST TO GIVE LIMITING INSTRUCTION by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1.pdf, #2 Ex. 2.pdf, #3 Ex. 3.pdf) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4452 MOTION in Limine No. 1 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY STATEMENT OR QUESTIONS DIRECTED AT ALLEGED C8 RELATED HEALTH ISSUES IN PEOPLE OTHER THAN TRIAL PLAINTIFF DAVID FREEMAN by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4451 MOTION in Limine No. 9 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO STANDARDS OF ETHICS, MORALITY, SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, OR OTHER EXTRA-LEGAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4450 MOTION in Limine No. 10 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT INTRODUCTION OF STATEMENTS FROM THE HILL PETERSON WEBSITE by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4449 MOTION in Limine No. 18 - PRESERVATION MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM COMMENTING ON OR DISCUSSING CERTAIN MATTERS AND/OR TAKING CERTAIN ACTIONS IN THE PRESENCE OF THE JURY OR POTENTIAL JURORS by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4448 MOTION in Limine No. 3 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Speculative Statements or Suggestions Regarding Earlier or Different Agency Action by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4447 MOTION in Limine No. 5 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel from Offering Unsworn Testimony at Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4446 MOTION in Limine No. 6 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Opinions of David L. MacIntosh by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4445 MOTION in Limine No. 7 - Motion in Limine to Preclude David Freeman and Veronica Freeman from Giving Scientific Opinions at Trial by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4444 MOTION in Limine No. 8 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding Alleged Future Damages by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4443 MOTION in Limine No. 11 - Motion in Limine to Exclude Unauthenticated Handwritten Notes Identified As P1.2543 and P1.7188, and Fayerweather Exhibit 39, and Any Reference to Hearsay Statements Contained Therein by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - C8 Dep Designation - Fayerweather, #3 Exhibit C - Objections to Plaintiff Bartlett's Trial Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit D - 2015-09-24 List of Exhibits Offered by Plaintiffs - Bartlett, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F - Fayerweather Excerpt) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4442 MOTION in Limine No. 12 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Statement, Opinion, or Argument that Bolsters the Science Panels Work by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4441 MOTION in Limine No. 13 - Motion in Limine to Permit Attribution of the Science Panels 2010 Publication by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4440 MOTION in Limine No. 14 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs Counsel from Eliciting No Opinion Given Type Testimony from DuPonts Specific Causation Experts by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4439 MOTION in Limine No. 17 - Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Statement or Suggestion That an Enlarged Prostate or Prostate Cancer Is Caused by C8 Exposure, or That Testicular Cancer and Prostate Cancer are the Same by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4438 NOTICE by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott of Filing of Index to Motions In Limine Filed by Plaintiff David Freeman (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4437 MOTION for Reconsideration of this Court's Prior Ruling on DuPont's Bartlett Trial Motion In Limine No. 2 Regarding DuPont's Violations of the Toxic Substances Control Act and Resource Conservation and Recovery Act by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4436 MOTION in Limine No. 20 to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Legal Representation of Plaintiff David Freeman by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4435 MOTION in Limine No. 19 to Exclude Duplicative Evidence and/or Testimony Relating to Specific-Causation and/or the Growth Rate of Mr. Freeman's Testicular Tumor by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4434 MOTION in Limine No. 18 to Exclude All Evidence Related to Plaintiff's Irrelevant Prior Conduct by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4433 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Treating Physician, Kelli Anne Cawley, M.D., on General or Specific Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4432 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Testimony That a Draft Letter to Area Physicians Was, In fact, Sent by DuPont to Area Physicians by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4431 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Preclude DuPont's References to Communications Authored by Government Agencies Unless Such Communications are Shown to be Authentic and Actually Received by DuPont During the Time Period in Question by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4430 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Preclude DuPont's References to the Ohio River as One of the Most Polluted Rivers in Ohio and/or the United States by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4429 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Evidence of an Unrelated Lawsuit and Settlement by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4428 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Family History of Cancer by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4427 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Evidence of DuPont's Employees' or Other Individuals' Personal Use of C-8 by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4426 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence Relating to Plaintiff's Community Liaison Role in the Emmett Studies by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4425 MOTION in Limine No. 19 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to the Spin Off of Performance Chemicals, Any Indemnification Agreement Between DuPont and Chemours, or Any Proposed Merger Between DuPont and Dow Chemical Co. by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4424 MOTION in Limine No. 20 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Orders from Prior Lawsuits or Evidence or Comments By Counsel Regarding Alleged Destruction of Documents by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4423 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Irrelevant Opinions of DuPont's Expert, Stephen T. Washburn by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4422 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Mr. Thomas Voltaggio by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4421 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude DuPont's Already Waived Privilege Claims by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4420 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude DuPont from Questioning Plaintiff's Expert Robert R. Bahnson, M.D., F.A.C.S. on General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4419 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Dr. Siegel's Unrelated Opinions, Writings and/or Views on Gun Control and/or Legislation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4418 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All "Expert" Opinions from Individuals Disclosed as Experts for DuPont In Other C-8 Cases But Not In this Case by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4417 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Irrelevant General Causation Evidence by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4416 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence that C-8 Is Not Bioavailable in Human Blood by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4415 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Preclude DuPont's Use of Third Party C-8 Guidance Levels to Contest General Causation by Plaintiff Connie Jo Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (London, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4414 MOTION in Limine No. 21 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to Other Lawsuits or Claims by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4413 MOTION in Limine No. 22 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to Alleged Wrongful Other Acts or Character Evidence of DuPont by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4412 MOTION in Limine No. 23 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Preclude Comparisons and Analogies to Other Industries by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4411 MOTION in Limine No. 24 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to or Introduction of Activist Group Materials, Articles, and Other Hearsay Documents by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4410 MOTION in Limine No. 25 - Motion in Limine For Reconsideration and to Preclude Admission of and Reference to Three Attorney-Created Documents and Related Information or, in the Alternative, Request for Additional Redactions by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4409 MOTION in Limine No. 26 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude the Personal E-mails of Bernard J. Reilly and, in the Alternative, Request for Redactions by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4408 MOTION in Limine No. 27 - Preservation Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Argument, Statement, or Suggestion that a Violation of DuPonts Internal Exposure Guidelines Equates to Negligence, Violation of a Legal Duty, or Means that Harm Was Expected by Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mace, Damond)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4407