Ryan et al v. Romo et al
Plaintiff: James M. Ryan and Carolyn P. Ryan
Defendant: Pedro Romo, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Shaun Donovan, John and Jane Doe 1 through 5 and John Doe Corporation 1 through 5
Case Number: 2:2014cv00038
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/22/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Strike; granting 61 Motion to Strike; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/17/2015. (cw1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motions to Amend, Doc. 20 , 21 , are GRANTED. Defendant Roma's Motion to Dismiss, Doc. 7 , and Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss, Doc. 11 , are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/30/2014. (pes1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. Romo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn P. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Romo
Represented By: Scott Allen King
Represented By: John Bernard Kopf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Scott Allen King
Represented By: John Bernard Kopf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?