Haller v. Warden London Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Ronald Haller
Respondent: Warden London Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2014cv00373
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ALLEN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION and ORDER adopting and affirming 23 the Report and Recommendation; denying 24 Petitioner's Motion for Verification. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/8/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ronald Haller be denied and that this case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 1/10/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION and ORDER adopting and affirming 4 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 6/2/14. (jk1)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio atToledo. Petitioner's mot ion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that petitioner be allowed to prosecute his action without prepayment of fees or costs and that judicial officers who render services in this action shall do so as if the costs had been prepaid - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 14-373. (sr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haller v. Warden London Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden London Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?