Bartell et al v. LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laurence Bartell and Jerry Stauffer
Defendant: LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. and LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. doing business as Life Time Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00401
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 173 FINAL JUDGMENT. (jk)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION and ORDER granting #168 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/7/2020. (jk)P
July 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Fairness Hearing held on 7/30/2020. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTATION ORDER granting #170 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron D. Van Oort. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/24/2020. (ew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7569915) of Aaron D Van Oort by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Eckelberry, Rodger)
July 23, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE of Hearing - Fairness Hearing set for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE ONLY) before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit Final Judgment) (McCormick, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT of Claims Administrator, BrownGreer PLC by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (McCormick, Thomas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 166 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Service Award by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1; Exhibit A; Exhibit B) (McCormick, Thomas)
April 7, 2020 Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing reset for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 120 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Further Extend Deadlines in Light of COVID-19 Pandemic by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/7/2020. (jk) (Main Document 165 replaced on 4/7/2020) (jk).
April 6, 2020 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION to Further Extend Deadlines in Light of COVID-19 Pandemic filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
April 6, 2020 Filing 163 RESPONSE to Motion re #162 MOTION to Further Extend Deadlines in Light of COVID-19 Pandemic filed by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (McCormick, Thomas)
April 3, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION to Further Extend Deadlines in Light of COVID-19 Pandemic by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Stuart McFarland) (Eckelberry, Rodger)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #159 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/23/2020. (jk)
March 23, 2020 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #159 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Light of Covid-19 Pandemic filed by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (McCormick, Thomas)
March 22, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Light of Covid-19 Pandemic by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
February 24, 2020 Set Hearing - Fairness Hearing set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 120 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Preliminary Approval Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/24/2020. (jk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Declaration) (McCormick, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 156 USCA ORDER - The appeal is remanded to the District Court for further proceedings (pb)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE - Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. (jk)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Joint Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/5/2020. (jk)
January 31, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Settlement on Appeal; Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCormick, Thomas) Modified event on 1/29/2020 (ew).
May 8, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
June 6, 2018 USCA Appeal Fees $505.00, receipt no. 200COL052554 for Appeal in case no. 18-3469. (er)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER of USCA (18-301) granting the petition for permission to appeal. (sct)
May 18, 2018 Filing 151 USCA Case Number 18-3469. Case Manager - Amy E. Gigliotti. (sct)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER of USCA: Upon consideration of the respondent's motion for leave to file a sur-reply in support of the petition, the motion is GRANTED. (er)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of USCA, case number 18-301: Upon consideration of the petitioners motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition, the motion is GRANTED. (er)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 OPINION and ORDER denying #125 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part #126 Defendant's Motion to Certify. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/9/18. (jk)
November 30, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Hilsheimer for Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
November 21, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Rodger L Eckelberry substituting for Christopher C. Koehler, Gregory R. Farkas, and Lindsey Carr Siegler as to Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/31/17. (jk)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/17/17. (jk)
August 29, 2017 Filing 143 Response re #142 Notice (Other),, Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Cole, Timothy)
August 21, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. re #125 MOTION for Reconsideration - Oral Argument Requested, #126 MOTION to Certify Four Questions for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - Oral Argument Requested of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motions for Reconsideration and to Certify Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gerboc v. ContextLogic, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Laurence Bartell Deposition) (Farkas, Gregory)
May 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Settlement Conference held on 5/22/2017. The parties have reached impasse. (NMK)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: 4/27/17 Mediation Conference is VACATED; Mediation Conference reset for 5/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Room 322 before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/3/17. (sem)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying #137 MOTION for Status Conference. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge King to conduct a Mediation Hearing on 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers. Plaintiffs' settlement demand due by 4/3/2017; Defendant's settlement due by 4/13/2017. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/21/2017. (agm)
January 13, 2017 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Status Conference Amended filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
January 12, 2017 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
January 9, 2017 Filing 137 MOTION for Status Conference by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Farkas, Gregory)
January 6, 2017 Filing 136 USCA ORDER - The motion for leave to file a reply is GRANTED and the petition for permission to appeal is DENIED. (pb)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/15/16. (jk)
September 29, 2016 Filing 134 Exhibit A to #133 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (Farkas, Gregory) Modified text on 9/30/2016 (mas). Modified on 9/30/2016 (mas).
September 29, 2016 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION for Reconsideration - Oral Argument Requested / Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 8, 2016 Orders filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Farkas, Gregory)
September 29, 2016 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #126 MOTION to Certify Four Questions for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - Oral Argument Requested filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rule 23(f) Reply) (Farkas, Gregory)
September 29, 2016 Filing 131 Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 09/14/2016, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2016. (DuFour, Lahana)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER regarding status conference held on September 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/19/16. (jk)
September 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Status Conference held on 9/14/2016. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
September 12, 2016 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 MOTION to Certify Four Questions for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - Oral Argument Requested filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McCormick, Thomas)
September 12, 2016 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION for Reconsideration - Oral Argument Requested filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McCormick, Thomas)
September 12, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Cole for Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer (Cole, Timothy)
August 22, 2016 Filing 126 MOTION to Certify Four Questions for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - Oral Argument Requested by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Farkas, Gregory)
August 22, 2016 Filing 125 MOTION for Reconsideration - Oral Argument Requested by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Farkas, Gregory)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER - Status Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/16/16. (jk)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/11/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #67 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/8/16. (jk)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #90 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying as moot in part #94 and #95 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/8/16. (jk)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #76 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/8/16. (jk)
July 1, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell re #117 Notice (Other) Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (McCormick, Thomas)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Joint Motion to Vacate Trial Date. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 6/27/16. (jk)
June 24, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Rule 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith v. Ohio State University) (Koehler, Christopher)
June 9, 2016 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Vacate Trial Date and for a Status Conference by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Farkas, Gregory)
May 20, 2016 Filing 115 Response to Notices of Supplemental Authority re #114 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion), #113 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (McCormick, Thomas) Modified text on 5/20/2016 (mas).
May 17, 2016 Filing 114 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting / Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of it Rule 12(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spokeo Decision) (Koehler, Christopher)
May 16, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Fifth Circuit Decision) (Farkas, Gregory)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION and ORDER denying #60 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/31/16. (jk)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION AND ORDER denying #61 Defendant's Motion to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/22/16. (jk) Modified text on 3/22/2016 (mas).
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 2:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/10/16. (jk)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER - The Court VACATES the current case schedule. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/9/16. (jk)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Converting Settlement Conference to Status Conference. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/4/16. (jk)
February 3, 2016 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Convert Settlement Conference to Status Conference by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Farkas, Gregory)
January 8, 2016 Filing 106 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
January 5, 2016 Filing 105 Response re #104 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class,for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (agm)
December 30, 2015 Filing 104 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (pes)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and to be Appointed as Class Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/30/2015. (pes)
December 28, 2015 Filing 102 REPLY to #100 Response to #98 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and to be Appointed as Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas) Modified text and added link on 12/29/2015 (er).
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Edmund A Sargus recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/22/2015. (dh1)
December 10, 2015 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and to be Appointed as Class Counsel filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Bartell Def LTF Resp to P Suppl Memo in Supp of Class Cert) (Farkas, Gregory)
November 16, 2015 Filing 99 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (McCormick, Thomas)
November 16, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and to be Appointed as Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. Responses due by 12/10/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McCormick, Thomas)
October 23, 2015 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zwiefel Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Bartell Depo Excerpts) (Koehler, Christopher)
October 9, 2015 Filing 96 REPLY to #94 Response to Motion re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14) (McCormick, Thomas) Modified text to add link on 10/13/2015 (agm).
September 18, 2015 Filing 95 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2015 (Farkas, Gregory)
September 18, 2015 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability / Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and in Support of Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Senate Bill, #2 Exhibit B - Fiscal Note, #3 Exhibit C - Brown Testimony, #4 Exhibit D - Bartell GTA, #5 Exhibit E - Stauffer GTA, #6 Exhibit F - Zwiefel Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - Smith Depo Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Lijewski Depo Excerpts, #9 Exhibit I - Hill Depo Excerpts, #10 Exhibit J - Bartell Depo Excerpts, #11 Exhibit K - Bartell Termination Agreement, #12 Exhibit L - Stauffer Depo Excerpts, #13 Exhibit M - Brennen Depo Excerpts, #14 Exhibit N-1 - Brennen Depo Ex. 46, #15 Exhibit N-2 - Brennen Depo Ex 46, #16 Exhibit O - Kevin Hill Declaration) (Koehler, Christopher)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. Defendant's response to #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability due by 9/18/2015. Plaintiff's reply due by 10/9/2015. Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment due by 9/18/2015. Plaintiff's response due by 10/9/2015; Replies due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/9/2015. (pes)
August 28, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Farkas, Gregory)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER as to #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability. Responses due by 9/11/2015, Replies due by 9/21/2015. Primary expert report due thirty (30) days following resolution of the amended motion to certify a class, ECF #67 , and of the motion to dismiss, ECF #76 . Rebuttal expert reports due thirty (30) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/17/2015. (pes)
August 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Status Conference held on 8/17/2015. (NMK)
August 4, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. Responses due by 8/28/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8) (McCormick, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Surreply in Opposition to #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class, for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas) Modified text and links on 8/3/2015 (agm).
July 22, 2015 Filing 88 Surreply in Opposition to #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class, for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (pes) Modified text on 7/23/2015 (er).
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/22/2015. (pes)
July 21, 2015 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply in Opp to Pltfs' Motion for Class Certification) (Koehler, Christopher)
July 21, 2015 Filing 85 REPLY to #83 Response to Motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing / Reply in Support of Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Farkas, Gregory) Modified text to add link on 7/22/2015 (agm).
July 7, 2015 Filing 84 REPLY to #78 Response to Motion re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (McCormick, Thomas) Modified text to add link on 7/8/2015 (agm).
July 7, 2015 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (McCormick, Thomas)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #81 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing and Discovery Schedule Discovery due by 12/7/2015. Dispositive motions due by 10/11/2015. Primary Expert due by 9/14/2015. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/5/2015. Plaintiff's response to #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing due by 7/7/2015; Defendant's reply due by 7/21/2015. Plaintiff's reply to #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class due by 7/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/24/2015. (pes)
June 23, 2015 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing and Discovery Schedule by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCormick, Thomas)
June 10, 2015 Filing 80 DEPOSITION of Jerry Stauffer taken on May 27, 2015 by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jerry Stauffer Deposition - Part 2, #2 Exhibit 7 - Stauffer Reacted Financial Records, #3 Exhibit 8 - Urban Active Documentation, #4 Exhibit 9 - Legal Notice, #5 Exhibit 10 - Urban Active Settlement Claim Form, #6 Exhibit 11 - Stauffer General Terms, #7 Exhibit 12 - Stauffer Member Usage Detail, #8 Exhibit 13 - Stauffer Member Usage Agreement, #9 Exhibit 14 - MyLT.com Use Agreement, #10 Exhibit 15 - First Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit 16 - Stauffer Responses to First Set of Discovery, #12 Exhibit 17 - Stauffer Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit 18 - Stauffer Responses to Second Set of Discovery) (Koehler, Christopher)
June 9, 2015 Filing 79 DEPOSITION of Laurence Alan Bartell taken on May 21, 2015 by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bartell Membership Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bartell Termination Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bartell General Terms Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint - Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint - Part 2, #6 Exhibit 5 - Bartell Responses to Second Set of Discovery, #7 Exhibit 6 - Bartell General Terms Agreement - Part 1, #8 Exhibit 6 - Bartell General Terms Agreement - Part 2) (Koehler, Christopher)
June 8, 2015 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel / Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Revised Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jerry Stauffer Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Laurence Bartell GTA, #3 Exhibit C - Jerry Stauffer GTA, #4 Exhibit D - Laurence Bartell Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - Laurence Bartell Termination, #6 Exhibit F Kevin Hill Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - John Brennan Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Kristine Lutzo Declaration, #9 Exhibit I - Margaret Bertone Declaration, #10 Exhibit J - Shafieka McRae Declaration, #11 Exhibit K - Kelly Santarelli Declaration, #12 Exhibit L - Mike Burkons Declaration, #13 Exhibit M - Amber Jenkins Declaration) (Koehler, Christopher)
June 8, 2015 Filing 77 REPLY to #73 Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legislative Budget Office Fiscal Note, #2 Exhibit B - Brown Testimony, #3 Exhibit C - Sub. S.B. No. 157, #4 Exhibit D - Am. Sub. H.B. 198) (Koehler, Christopher) Modified to add link on 6/9/2015 (agm).
June 8, 2015 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Jerry Stauffer, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Laurence Alan Bartell) (Koehler, Christopher)
June 4, 2015 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and to Clarify Dismissal of Unjust Enrichment Claim filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
May 21, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Filing Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
May 21, 2015 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
May 18, 2015 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Farkas, Gregory)
May 15, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel. Responses due by 6/8/2015 Replies due by 6/25/2015. (jr)
May 12, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer of Filing Exhibits in Support of Amended Motion to Certify Class, for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Member Relations Front Desk, #2 Exhibit 4 Smith Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 8 Puppe Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 9 Facilitator Guide) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
May 11, 2015 Filing 70 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint filed by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER. LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. answer due 5/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/8/2015. (pes)
May 8, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Discovery Conference held on 5/8/2015. (NMK)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING #66 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal; FINDING AS MOOT #45 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits under Seal and #46 Motion to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/5/2015. (pes)
May 4, 2015 Filing 67 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (McCormick, Thomas)
May 4, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Revised Motion for Class Certification Under Seal by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 and #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Goss and Benjamin W. Hulse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/1/2015. (pes)
May 1, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin W. Hulse (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5036898) by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Koehler, Christopher)
May 1, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Goss (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5036888) by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Koehler, Christopher)
April 28, 2015 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT / Joint Status Report by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Farkas, Gregory)
April 28, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
April 24, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (McCormick, Thomas)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Status Report due by 4/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/14/2015. (pes1)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER granting #51 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Life Time's Surreply; Life Time's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Denying Life Time's Motion to Transfer Venue #43 are overruled, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #39 is adopted and Life Time's Motion to Transfer Venue #26 is denied. Life Time's Motion to Dismiss #32 is granted in part and denied in part with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/14/2015. (dh1)
April 12, 2015 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Reply (non motion) in Support of Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #46 MOTION to Certify Class. Responses due by 5/29/2015. Replies due by 6/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/7/2015. (pes1)
April 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Status Conference held on 4/7/2015. (nmk0)
April 3, 2015 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Reply (non motion) in Support of Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
April 3, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. / Proposed Schedule for Briefing Class Certification (Farkas, Gregory)
April 3, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer of Submitting Proposed Case Schedule Related to Motion for Class Certification (Lisinski, Angelyne)
March 31, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2015 1:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (sr1)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: A Scheduling Conference will be held before the undersigned on 04/07/2015 at 1:30 p.m. No later than 04/03/2015, the parties shall file their proposed case schedules for briefing related to the pending motion for class certification (ECF #46 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 03/30/2015. (sr1) Modified to add link on 3/31/2015 (agm1).
March 30, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION to Strike #50 Reply (non motion) in Support of Objection to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
March 27, 2015 Filing 50 Reply re #43 Objection to Report and Recommendations / Reply in Support of Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
March 27, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Order to / Motion for Scheduling Conference by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/9/2016 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2016 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 3/21/2016 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/25/2015. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1)
March 24, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory Farkas (Farkas, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Certify Class for Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTF Locations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Form 10-K, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bartell GTA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stauffer GTA, #5 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 8 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Bartell Summary, #10 Exhibit 10 - Stauffer Account History, #11 Exhibit 11 - Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - GTA, #13 Exhibit 13 - GTA, #14 Exhibit 14 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 15 - McCormick Declaration) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
March 20, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion for Class Certification, For Appointment of Class Representatives, and for Appointment of Class Counsel Under Seal by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
March 20, 2015 Filing 44 Response re #43 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
March 6, 2015 Filing 43 OBJECTION to #39 Report and Recommendations by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/3/2015. (sln1)
March 2, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss / Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A Sargus on 3/2/15. (sem1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 23, 2015 Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc's 12/11/2014 motion to transfer venue (doc. 26) be DENIED - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 02/23/2015. (sr1)
February 17, 2015 Filing 38 **SEALED** Exhibit E To Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E) (sr1)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 02/17/2015. (sr1)
February 13, 2015 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
February 13, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION To File Exhibit To Memorandum In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Laurence Bartell. (sr1)
January 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2015. (Rubey, Rachel)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to make a status report within 14 days of any decision denying defendants motions to dismiss (doc. 32) and to change venue (doc. 26). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 01/28/2015. (sr1)
January 26, 2015 Filing 33 REPLY to #31 Response to #26 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Lijewski) (Koehler, Christopher) Modified text and added link on 1/26/2015 (er1).
January 20, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Terms Agreement - Bartell, #2 Exhibit B - General Terms Agreement - Stauffer, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Agreement - Bartell) (Koehler, Christopher)
January 9, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
January 5, 2015 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer against LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (sr1)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 01/05/2015. (sr1)
January 2, 2015 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Complaint by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCormick, Thomas)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: On agreement of the parties, Plaintiff shall have until 01/02/2015 to file an Unopposed Revised Motion to Amend Complaint that will attach a revised proposed First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/22/2014. (sr1)
December 11, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Paul Lijewski) (Koehler, Christopher)
December 1, 2014 Filing 25 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
November 25, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 11/25/2014. (Rubey, Rachel)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING the 12/11/14 Settlement Week Mediation; Counsel are DIRECTED to contact chambers on or before 1/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/25/14. (sem1)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE: Motions or Stipulations addressing the Parties or Pleadings now due 12/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/21/14. (sem1)
November 4, 2014 Filing 22 Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Joseph Ryan to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 12/11/2014 at 10:30 AM. (sh1)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE: Motions or Stipulations addressing the parties or pleadings now due by 11/21/2014. Class Certification Motion now due by 12/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/27/14. (sem1)
October 24, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 10/24/2014. (Rubey, Rachel)
October 17, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pattie v. Coach, Inc.) (Farkas, Gregory)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER in re: confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/7/14. (sh1)
August 6, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for Order to / Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
July 17, 2014 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/30/2015. Dispositive motions due by 8/30/2015. (sr1)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Stay without prejudice to renewing int. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 7/30/2015. Any case-dispositive motions due 8/30/15. Status report due within 14 days of any decision denying defendant's 6/4/2014 motion to dismiss [doc. 8]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/17/2014. (Abel, Mark) Modified text to correct discovery date on 7/18/2014 (agm1).
July 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2014. (Rubey, Rachel)
July 14, 2014 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
July 11, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the 12/2014 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 7/11/2014. Defendant contends that discovery should not begin until after a ruling on its pending Motion to Dismiss. To that end, Defendant will file a MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by 7/25/2014. Motions or stipulations addressing the parties or pleadings, if any, due by 10/31/2014. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class must be filed by 11/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/3/2014. (sln1)
July 2, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/2/2014. (sln1)
July 2, 2014 Filing 13 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. (sr1)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/2/2014. (sln1)
June 30, 2014 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 24, 2014 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiffs Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 5, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2014 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln1)
June 4, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Terms Agreement - Bartell, #2 Exhibit B - General Terms Agreement - Stauffer, #3 Exhibit C - Testimony of William J. Brown, #4 Exhibit D - Costello v. Great Expectations, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - Brown v. Nautilus of Columbus, #6 Exhibit F - Brown v. Silzar, Inc. dba Fred Astaire) (Koehler, Christopher)
May 22, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. Answer/Response due 06/04/2014. (epd)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Additional 7 Days to Respond to Complaint. Answer/Response due by 06/04/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 05/22/2014. (epd)
May 21, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to / Unopposed Motion for Additional 7 Days to Respond to Complaint by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Koehler, Christopher)
May 9, 2014 Remark: State Court Record received from Franklin County CPC. (sem1)
May 5, 2014 Reset Deadlines: LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. answer due 5/28/2014. (pes1)
May 2, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Carr Siegler for Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (Siegler, Lindsey)
May 2, 2014 Filing 4 STIPULATION for additional 21 days to respond to Complaint by Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
April 30, 2014 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND, filed by Laurence Bartell, Jerry Stauffer in Franklin County Common Pleas Court against LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. (pes1)
April 30, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Life Time Fitness, Inc. for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc... (Koehler, Christopher)
April 30, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 14CV003206 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4544943), filed by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Travis Puppe, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Farkas, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartell et al v. LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Bartell
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Timothy James Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Stauffer
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Timothy James Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Farkas
Represented By: Christopher C Koehler
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Represented By: Rodger L Eckelberry
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Christopher C. Koehler
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. doing business as Life Time Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Farkas
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Represented By: Rodger L Eckelberry
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Christopher C. Koehler
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Represented By: Aaron D. Van Oort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?