Hughes et al v. Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tom Hughes and Desmond McDonald
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00432
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER - The parties are DIRECTED to file a status report within the next fourteen (14) days. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/31/2018. (cmw)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion to Stay Case. The parties shall file a brief Status Report every thirty (30) days to inform the Court of the status of settlement negotiations. If settlement is not achieved, the parties shall file a request to reopen the case in ninety (90)days from the date of this decision. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/07/2018. (mas)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OPINION AND ORDER granting 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Sever Claims of Thomas Hughes and Desmond McDonald and Stay All Proceedings in the Current Case. All further proceedings are STAYED pending a final ruling from the Sixth Circuit on the Plai ntiffs' appeal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to administratively close this case until that time, and ORDERS the parties to notify the Court upon issue of the Sixth Circuit's decision so that the case may be reopened. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/04/2017. (dh1)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER finding as moot 90 Motion to Certify Class ; granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/3/16. (lvw)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Memoranda in opposition to the pending Motion for Decertification 90 , Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Tom Hughes and Desmond McDonald 91 , and Renewed Motion for Class Certification 93 are due WITHIN TWENTY-ONE DAYS, with any reply memoranda to be filed WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS of the memoranda in opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/26/2016. (mas)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; claims of opt-in Plaintiffs Mark Cameron and Herman Liggett are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/14/16. (aq)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 75 Order to Show Cause: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS the claims of opt-in Plaintiffs Mark Cameron and Herman Liggett with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/9/2015. (mas) Modified event on 12/9/2015 (mas).
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional and Class Certification. Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification of their FLSA Claim is granted subject to the conditions outlined in this Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification of their OMFWSA Claims are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/07/2015. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Hughes
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond McDonald
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eve Melinda Ellinger
Represented By: Kailee Marie Goold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?