Rodgers v. State of Ohio et al
Plaintiff: |
Otis Lee Rodgers |
Defendant: |
State Of Ohio, Ohio Parole Board, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Sara Andrew and Stu Sherman |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00453 |
Filed: |
May 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Columbus Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory L Frost |
Presiding Judge: |
Norah McCann King |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/30/15. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
85
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 54 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Sara Andrew, Ohio Parole Board, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, State Of Ohio, 81 Motion for Leave to File filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 77 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 73 Report and Recommendations, 82 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 84 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Otis Lee Rodgers. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/15/15. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 54 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Habeas Petition. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and that this action be DISMISSED. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Requ est Documents, ECF 43 , Motion for an Order directing the seizure of necessary documents, ECF 48 , Motion for Ancillary Order and Renewed Motion for Ancillary Order, ECF 52 , 60 , Motion for Counsel and Discovery, ECF 57 , Motion for Appointmen t of Investigator, ECF 61 , Motion to Strike, ECF 71 , and Motion for Telephonic Hearing, ECF 72 , and Respondent's Motion to Strike Petitioner's Motion for the Appointment of an Investigator, ECF 66 , are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/10/2014. (pes1) (This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular and certified mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. 7009 2820 0003 5796 5250)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
38
ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 6/24/14. (kn)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing
27
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Amended Complaint filed by Otis Lee Rodgers. It is recommended that Plaintiff's claim for damages under 42:1983 be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim for relief. It is further recommended that if Plaintiff decides pursues a habeas corpus claim he must file a petition. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/21/14. (sem1)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?