Stillwagon v. The City of Delaware et al
Plaintiff: James R. Stillwagon
Defendant: The City of Delaware, Benjamin Segaard, Patrick Gerke, Adam Willauer, Jonathan Radabaugh and Richard O. Mattingly
Case Number: 2:2014cv00807
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: In light of the Court's Opinion and Order ( 293 in 2:14-cv-807 and 278 in 2:14-cv-1606) granting summary judgment to The City of Delaware on Plaintiff's municipal liability claim, the Court denies as moot Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Individual and Monell Claims ( 259 in 2:14-cv-807 and 244 in 2:14-cv-1606). Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/15/2017. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-CMV, 2:14-cv-01606-EAS-CMV (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 OPINION AND ORDER granting 241 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, setting aside 240 the Magistrate Judge's May 30, 2017 Order and granting 202 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Defendants may amend their answer to include an affirmative defense of absolute immunity. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/18/2017. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-CMV, 2:14-cv-01606-EAS-CMV (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part (88) Motion to Compel in case 2:14-cv-807-EAS-TPK (80 in case 2:14-cv-1606-EAS-TPK); denying (92) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-TPK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 10/26/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-TPK, 2:14-cv-01606-EAS-TPK (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff James R. Stillwagon's Motion to Consolidate Cases ( 81 in case 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-TPK and 74 in case 2:14-cv-1606-EAS-TPK. These cases are now consolidated for discovery, trial, and all other purposes. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/19/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-TPK, 2:14-cv-01606-EAS-TPK (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER overruling Defendants' Objections to the 02/25/16 Magistrate Judge's Order denying Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Doc. 62 in Case No. 2:14-cv-807 and Doc. 56 in Case No. 2:14-cv-1606). The Defendants' Motion to St ay (Doc. 61 in Case No. 2:14-cv-807 and Doc. 55 in Case No. 14-cv-1606) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/05/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00807-EAS-TPK, 2:14-cv-01606-EAS-TPK (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part 29 the Municipal Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff's due process claim (Claim 3) is dismissed with prejud ice, as are Plaintiff's state law claims (Claims 7, 8, and 12) to the extent that he brings them against the City of Delaware. Plaintiff's municipal liability claim (Claim 6) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may amend his municip al liability claim within 30 days of the issuance of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/31/2016. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwagon v. The City of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Stillwagon
Represented By: James Donald McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Segaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Willauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Radabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard O. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?