Bennett v. Mohr et al
Plaintiff: John Bennett
Defendant: Gary Mohr, Ed Voorhies, David Bobby, Denise L. Justice, Gary Croft, Jason Bunting, Robert D. Smith, Terry Chatman, K. Faine, James Rinehart, Major Grisham, First Shift Captain Blake, First Shift Captain Morgan, Second Shift Captain Straker, Second Shift Sims and Thomas King
Case Number: 2:2014cv01450
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 89 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 8/7/2017. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas King, Jason Bunting and Recommends that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 19, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Compel. Defendants are ORDERED to supplement their discovery responses consistent with the foregoing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/20/2016. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/27/15. (lvw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason Bunting in that it is RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismisss be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/24/15. (sem1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that plaintiff John Bennetts 10/24/2014 motion for declaratory/injunctive relief (doc. 12) and his motion for a civil protection order/injunctions relief (doc. 13) be DENIED - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/16/2014. (sr1)(This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 11/20/14. (lvw1)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by John Bennett. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that defendants Gary Mohr, Director of ODRC, Ed Voorhies, Operations Director of ODRC, David Bobby, Regional Director of ODRC, Denise L. Justice, Superint endent of OCSS, Gary Croft, Chief Inspector for ODRC, Robert D. Smith, Inst. Inspector for MaCI, Terry Chatman, DWSS for MaCI, K. Paine, DWOfor MaCI, James Rinehart, School Principle for MaCI, Major Grisham, Chief of Security for MaCI, First Shift Ca ptain Blake for MaCI, First Shift Cartain Morgan for MaCI. Second Shift Captain Straker for MaCI, Second Shift Captain Sims for MaCI be DISMISSED because the complaint fails to state a claim for relief against them under 42 U.S.C. §1983. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this suit continue against defendants Jason Bunting and Thomas King - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/07/2014. (sr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Mohr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Voorhies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Faine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Shift Captain Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Shift Captain Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Shift Captain Straker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Shift Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?