In re Everyware Global Inc. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan and IBEW Local No. 58
Defendant: Everyware Global, Inc., John K Sheppard, Bernard F Peters, Samie A Solomon, Daniel Collin, Stephen W. Presser, Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, CJS Securities, Inc., Telsey Advisory Group, LLC, Imperial Capital, LLC, BTIG, LLC, Thomas J. Baldwin, Michael Jurbala, Barry L. Kasoff, Ronald D. McCray, William J. Krueger, Joseph A. De Perio, Ron Wainshal, Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P. and MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01838
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FAIRFIELD
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MANDATE of USCA as to #127 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 USCA OPINION AND JUDGMENT as to #127 Notice of Appeal filed by IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan affirming the judgment of the district court. Note: Mandate to issue. (sct)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beth A. Kaswan (Kaswan, Beth)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0648-5479288. Appeal Record due by 5/13/2016. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/30/2016. (cw)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Dismiss; granting #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #112 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #114 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #115 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Amended Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment for Defendants. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 03/30/2016. (cw)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant John K Sheppard. (Organ, Shawn)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Daniel Collin, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P., Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31) (Green, Christopher)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Michael Jurbala. (Organ, Shawn)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Thomas J. Baldwin, Joseph A. De Perio, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, Ronald D. McCray, Ron Wainshal. (Organ, Shawn)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Bernard F Peters. (Organ, Shawn)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. (DiCicco, Susan)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 MOTION to Dismiss , #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 10/5/2015. UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ONE-WEEK EXTENSION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS which were filed 8/14/15 Brief in Opposition due by 10/5/2015 Replies due by 11/12/2015. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/12/2015. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/28/2015. (cw)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 10/5/2015. UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ONE-WEEK EXTENSION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS which were filed 8/14/15 by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58. Responses due by 10/19/2015 (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Michael Jurbala. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Organ, Shawn)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Thomas J. Baldwin, Joseph A. De Perio, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, Ronald D. McCray, Ron Wainshal. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Organ, Shawn)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bernard F Peters. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Organ, Shawn)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant John K Sheppard. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Organ, Shawn)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Daniel Collin, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P., Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser. Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26) (Green, Christopher)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/8/2015 (DiCicco, Susan)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #106 & #107 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jay K. Musoff and Jacobus J. Schutte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/27/2015. (er)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #104 & #105 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Swartz and Christopher H. Giampapa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/27/2015. (er)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacobus J. Schutte (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5142279) by Defendant Michael Jurbala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Organ, Shawn)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jay K. Musoff (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5142258) by Defendant Michael Jurbala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Organ, Shawn)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher H. Giampapa (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5142242) by Defendants Thomas J. Baldwin, Joseph A. De Perio, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, Ronald D. McCray, Ron Wainshal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Organ, Shawn)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Swartz (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5142190) by Defendants Thomas J. Baldwin, Joseph A. De Perio, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, Ronald D. McCray, Ron Wainshal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Organ, Shawn)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P. on 7/20/2015, answer due 9/18/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P. on 7/20/2015, answer due 9/18/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy General Partner, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy General Partner II, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy Capital Partners LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P.. (Organ, Shawn)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Summons Issued as to Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P. (pes)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Summons Issued as to MCP Supplemental Fund L.P. (pes)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of summons. (pes) (pes).
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Summons Issued as to MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P. (pes)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. Thomas Brown and #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John N. McClain, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/8/2015. (agm)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - Defendants shall file answers, motions to dismiss, or other responsive pleadings on or before 8/14/2015. If one or more Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file opposition(s) to the motion(s) to dismiss on or before 9/28/2015, and the moving Defendant(s) shall reply on or before 10/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/8/2015. (agm)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Minerva ; granting #71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan F DiCicco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/8/2015. (agm)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John N. McClain, III (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5120390) by Defendants Daniel Collin, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. Thomas Brown (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5120307) by Defendants Daniel Collin, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Oppenheimer Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Oppenheimer Holdings, Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co Inc.. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Imperial Capital, LLC. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CJS Securities, Inc.. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants BTIG, LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for BTIG, LLC.. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/6/2015. (agm)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Livezey Laughlin IV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/6/2015. (agm)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan F. DiCicco (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5119095) by Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Susan F. DiCicco) (Sugarman, Roger)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Minerva (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5119075) by Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Matthew Minerva) (Sugarman, Roger)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Philip Sugarman for Defendants BTIG, LLC, CJS Securities, Inc., Imperial Capital, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC (Sugarman, Roger)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order PHV Filing fee re: #68 - $ 200, receipt number COL38032 (pes)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G. Green (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number Chk#467718invault) by Defendants Daniel Collin, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Christopher Green Cert. of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn J Organ for Defendants Thomas J. Baldwin, Daniel Collin, Joseph A. De Perio, Michael Jurbala, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Ronald D. McCray, Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Stephen W. Presser, Ron Wainshal (Organ, Shawn)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant William J. Krueger. William J. Krueger served on 5/28/2015, answer due 6/18/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ronald D. McCray. Ronald D. McCray served on 5/28/2015, answer due 6/18/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Livezey Laughlin IV (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5076278) by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Michael Jurbala. Michael Jurbala served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Joseph A. De Perio. Joseph A. De Perio served on 5/22/2015, answer due 6/12/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant CJS Securities, Inc.. CJS Securities, Inc. served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC. Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ron Wainshal. Ron Wainshal served on 5/19/2015, answer due 6/9/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Telsey Advisory Group, LLC. Telsey Advisory Group, LLC served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Stephen W. Presser. Stephen W. Presser served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Oppenheimer & Co Inc. Oppenheimer & Co Inc served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy General Partner, L.P.. Monomoy General Partner, L.P. served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy General Partner II, L.P.. Monomoy General Partner II, L.P. served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P.. Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P. served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy Capital Partners LLC. Monomoy Capital Partners LLC served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P.. Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P. served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P.. MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P. served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Barry L. Kasoff. Barry L. Kasoff served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Daniel Collin. Daniel Collin served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Thomas J. Baldwin. Thomas J. Baldwin served on 5/22/2015, answer due 6/12/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Imperial Capital, LLC. Imperial Capital, LLC served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant BTIG, LLC. BTIG, LLC served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Daniel Collin. (pes)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Summons Issued as to BTIG, LLC, Thomas J. Baldwin, CJS Securities, Inc., Joseph A. De Perio, Imperial Capital, LLC, Michael Jurbala, Barry L. Kasoff, William J. Krueger, MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Ronald D. McCray, Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Stephen W. Presser, Telsey Advisory Group, LLC, Ron Wainshal. (pes)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Monomoy Cap Partners LLC, #2 Monomoy Exec Co-Inv, #3 Monomoy Cap Partners II, #4 MCP Suppl Fund, #5 Monomoy Gen Partner, #6 Monomoy Gen Partner II, #7 Monomoy Ultimate, #8 Oppenheimer, #9 CJS Securities, #10 Telsey Advisory Group, #11 Imperial Capital, #12 BTIG LLC, #13 Thomas Baldwin, #14 Michael Jurbala, #15 Barry Kasoff, #16 Ronald McCray, #17 William Krueger, #18 Joseph De Perio, #19 Ron Wainshal) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of non-issuance of summons. (pes)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Bernard F Peters, John K Sheppard, Samie A Solomon, Daniel Collin, Stephen W. Presser, Monomoy Capital Partners LLC, Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P., Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P., MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P., Monomoy General Partner, L.P., Monomoy General Partner II, L.P., Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, CJS Securities, Inc., Telsey Advisory Group, LLC, Imperial Capital, LLC, BTIG, LLC, Thomas J. Baldwin, Michael Jurbala, Barry L. Kasoff, Ronald D. McCray, William J. Krueger, Joseph A. De Perio, Ron Wainshal, filed by IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER regarding Court's Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual with regard to Attorney Stephen J. Teti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/28/2015. (agm)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File consolidated amended complaint by 5/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/28/2015. (agm)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 5/26/2015. MOTION FOR THREE-WEEK EXTENSION TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 3/3/2015. (agm1)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund re #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (NOTICE OF PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF IBEW LOCAL NO. 58 ANNUITY FUND, AND ELECTRICAL WORKERS PENSION TRUST FUND OF IBEW LOCAL NO. 58, DETROIT, MICHIGAN, FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Johnson, Geoffrey)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J Teti; granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Beth A Kaswan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/31/2014. (agm1)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Beth A. Kaswan (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4861930) by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J. Teti (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4861911) by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Defendant Bernard Peters' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Rosenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/11/14. (sem1)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Rosenberg (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4844384) by Defendant Bernard F Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Organ, Shawn)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Johnson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David F Graham; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel B Niewoehner ; granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M Skakun III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/25/2014. (agm1)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Skakun III (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4822851) by Defendant John K Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel B. Niewoehner (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4822848) by Defendant John K Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David F. Graham (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4822830) by Defendant John K Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND CASE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/18/14. (sem1)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc Kasowitz; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sheron Korpus; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward McNally. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/18/14. (sem1)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendant Samie A Solomon (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jay Jones for Defendant Samie A Solomon (Jones, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Defendants Everyware Global, Inc., Bernard F Peters, John K Sheppard. (Organ, Shawn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward McNally (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4812154) by Defendant Everyware Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sheron Korpus (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4812142) by Defendant Everyware Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc Kasowitz (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4812120) by Defendant Everyware Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Organ, Shawn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn J Organ for Defendants Everyware Global, Inc., Bernard F Peters, John K Sheppard (Organ, Shawn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John K Sheppard on 10/31/2014, answer due 12/30/2014. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Samie A Solomon. Samie A Solomon served on 10/27/2014, answer due 11/17/2014. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Everyware Global, Inc.. Everyware Global, Inc. served on 10/27/2014, answer due 11/17/2014. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald A Broggi ; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph P Guglielmo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 10/20/2014. (agm1)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph P. Guglielmo (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4776695) by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald A. Broggi (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-4776682) by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Everyware Global, Inc., Bernard F Peters, John K Sheppard, Samie A Solomon. (pes1)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Bernard F Peters on 10/14/2014, answer due 12/15/2014. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan, IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund Summons to be issued by the clerk (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. (pes1)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4762681), filed by IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Johnson, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Everyware Global Inc. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local No. 58 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Donald A Broggi
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Stephen J Teti
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund of IBEW Local No. 58, Detroit, Michigan
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Donald A Broggi
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Stephen J Teti
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local No. 58
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Donald A Broggi
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Stephen J Teti
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everyware Global, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Sheron Korpus
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Edward E. McNally
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K Sheppard
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David F Graham
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John M Skakun, III
Represented By: Rachel B Niewoehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard F Peters
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Steven J Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samie A Solomon
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Jones
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Collin
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Presser
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy Executive Co-Investment Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy Capital Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCP Supplemental Fund II, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy General Partner, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy General Partner II, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy Ultimate GP, LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co Inc
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew Minerva
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJS Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew Minerva
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telsey Advisory Group, LLC
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew Minerva
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Capital, LLC
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew Minerva
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTIG, LLC
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew Minerva
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Baldwin
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jurbala
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Jacobus J. Schutte
Represented By: Jay K. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry L. Kasoff
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. McCray
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Krueger
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. De Perio
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wainshal
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Christopher E. Giampapa
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monomoy Capital Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCP Supplemental Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Christopher G. Green
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: John N. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?