Peters v. Mausser et al
Petitioner: |
William Peters |
Respondent: |
Cynthia Mausser and The Ohio Adult Parole Board |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02314 |
Filed: |
November 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Columbus Office |
County: |
ROSS |
Presiding Judge: |
Norah McCann King |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund A Sargus |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 21, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER adopting and affirming 10 the Magistrate Judge's 12/28/15 Report and Recommendation. This action is hereby dismissed. The Clerk is directed to enter Final Judgment in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/21/2016. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 28, 2015 |
Filing
10
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Peters. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the Petition be DISMISSED. Petitioner's requests for the appointment of counsel and for an evidentiary hearing are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/28/2015. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER adopting and affirming 8 the United States Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Motion for the Court to Proceed to Judgment 7 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/16/2015. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
8
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION for the Court to Proceed to Judgment filed by William Peters. It is RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's Motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/12/2015. (pes) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?