NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots v. NetJets, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots
Defendant: NetJets, Inc., JOHN DOES 1-10, NetJets Aviation, Inc. and Steven Todd Weeber
Not Classified By Court: H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh
Case Number: 2:2014cv02487
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/3/17. (jk)
March 1, 2017 Filing 143 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DISCOVERY ORDER issued concerning the parties' remaining discovery disputes from Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/12/17. (sem)
December 14, 2016 Filing 141 BRIEF by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger; Exhibits A-B) (Kronenberger, Karl)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/17/2016. (pes)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/3/2016. (pes)
November 2, 2016 Filing 138 STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE STATUS OF REMAINING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 24, 2016 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Primary Expert due by 3/17/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/21/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2017. (mas)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #111 Defendant's Motion to Extend the Current Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/21/16. (jk)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #92 Motion to Compel; denying #99 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/12/2016. (pes)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/12/2016. (pes)
October 11, 2016 Filing 133 MOTION to File Document Under Seal re. Doc. No. 132, Supplemental Declaration of Pedro Leroux Regarding Authenticity of Prior Signature by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 11/4/2016 (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 11, 2016 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement - Supplemental Declaration of Pedro Leroux Regarding Authenticity of Prior Signature filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 11, 2016 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement - Supplemental Declaration of Paulette Gilbert Regarding Authenticity of Prior Signature filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/11/2016. (pes)
October 10, 2016 Filing 128 MOTION to File Document Under Seal re Doc. #127 by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jennifer)
October 10, 2016 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Colleen Nissl, #2 Affidavit of Jennifer Edwards (Redacted), #3 Affidavit of Michael Maratto, #4 Affidavit of Adam Johnson) (Edwards, Jennifer)
October 10, 2016 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Steven Todd Weeber. (Marshall, John)
October 6, 2016 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger In Support of Plaintiff NJASAP's Motion to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff NJASAP's Motion to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production) (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re #92 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to submit the amended response to Interrogatory 39 by 10/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/5/2016. (pes)
October 3, 2016 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 3, 2016 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [DEFENDANTS NETJETS AVIATION, INC. AND NETJETS INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #118 Plaintiff's Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/29/16. (jk)
September 26, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION for Reconsideration - REDACTED MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets Inc.'s Motion to File Motion to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement Under Seal by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 10/20/2016 (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 26, 2016 Filing 118 MOTION to File Document Under Seal re. Doc. No. 117, RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 10/20/2016 (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 23, 2016 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger; Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Pedro Leroux; Exhibits A-E, #3 Declaration of Mark Luthi; Attachments A-D, #4 Declaration of Paulette Gilbert) (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 23, 2016 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION to Compel A) Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Documents and Information Concerning Pilot Message Board Content in the Possession of Defendants' General Counsel Colleen Nissl; and B) Defendants' Production filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Captain Mark J. Hoffman; Exhibits A-C) (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and denying as moot #112 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/23/16. (sem)
September 22, 2016 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Strike 103 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets Inc.'s Motion to File Motion to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement Under Seal [Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc. an filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 21, 2016 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #99 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer E. Edwards, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 21, 2016 Filing 112 MOTION to Strike 103 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets Inc.'s Motion to File Motion to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement Under Seal [Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets Inc.'s Motion to Strike or Redact Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration] by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 21, 2016 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/28/2016. by Defendant Steven Todd Weeber. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Marshall, John)
September 15, 2016 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part #102 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/13/16. (jk)
September 13, 2016 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement New date requested 9/29/2016. filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Edwards Declaration ISO Memo in Opposition to EOT for Motion to Enforce, #2 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted Sept 7 2016 email chain) (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 12, 2016 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Compel A) Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Documents and Information Concerning Pilot Message Board Content in the Possession of Defendants' General Counsel Colleen Nissl; and B) Defendants' Production filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer E. Edwards, #2 Exhibit 2016.05.04 Email from Matthews Proposing Search Terms, #3 Exhibit 2 - NJASAP's 2016.05.03 Letter re 2nd Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Edwards Email 2016.05.19, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from NJA's Amended Responses to NJASAP's 1st RFPs, #6 Exhibit 5 - Privilege Logs) (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement - Response due date reset to 9/15/2016 (kk)
September 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #99 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production: Responses due by 9/21/2016 & Replies due by 10/6/2016 (kk)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER re #92 Motion to Compel, #95 Motion for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement, and #99 Motion to Compel: Responses to Doc. #92 due by 9/12/2016 & Replies due by 9/23/2016; Responses to #99 due by 9/21/2016 & Replies due by 10/6/2016. The response deadline for #95 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement is reset to 9/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/12/2016. (kk)
September 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement - Responses due by 9/21/2016 & Replies due by 10/6/2016 (kk)
September 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #92 MOTION to Compel - Responses due by 9/12/2016 & Replies due by 9/23/2016 (kk)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re #92 Motion to Compel & #95 Motion for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement: Responses to the Motion to Compel due by 9/12/2016 & Replies due by 9/23/2016; Responses to the Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement due by 9/21/2016 & Replies due by 10/6/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/12/2016. (kk)
September 9, 2016 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Expedited Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 8, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement New date requested 9/29/2016. by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 10/3/2016 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, #2 Exhibit A) (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 7, 2016 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Steven Todd Weeber. Responses due by 10/3/2016 (Marshall, John)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Parties are to submit a proposed expedited briefing schedule regarding the pending motions to compel by 9/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/6/2016. (pes)
September 2, 2016 Filing 99 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, #3 Exhibit A - L, #4 Declaration of Mark Luthi) (Kronenberger, Karl)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/30/2016. (pes)
August 29, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/6/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
August 22, 2016 Filing 95 REDACTED MOTION for Order to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Johnson, #2 Declaration of William Noe, #3 Declaration of Michael Maratto) (Edwards, Jennifer) Modified on 8/31/2016 (pes).
August 22, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Motion to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement Under Seal) (Edwards, Jennifer)
August 22, 2016 Filing 93 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Edwards, Jennifer)
August 17, 2016 Filing 92 MOTION to Compel A) Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Documents and Information Concerning Pilot Message Board Content in the Possession of Defendants' General Counsel Colleen Nissl; and B) Defendants' Production of a Privilege Log for All Other Discovery Responses Where Privilege Was Invoked by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, #3 Exhibit A - J) (Kronenberger, Karl)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/11/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Steven Todd Weeber answer due 9/8/2016. (mas)
August 12, 2016 Filing 90 STIPULATION by Defendant Steven Todd Weeber. (Marshall, John)
August 8, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by John Spenceley Marshall for Defendant Steven Todd Weeber (Marshall, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 88 Summons Issued as to Steven Todd Weeber. (mas)
August 4, 2016 Filing 87 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Kronenberger, Karl)
August 3, 2016 Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc., Steven Todd Weeber, filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #77 Motion to Amend filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots; Plaintiff is directed to file a properly-executed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/3/16. (sem)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/3/2016. (er)
May 17, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
May 6, 2016 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint [Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Revised Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint] filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER VACATING #79 Order granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/11/2016. (pes)
April 11, 2016 Filing 80 REMOVED PURSUANT TO #81 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc., Steven Todd Weeber, filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (pes) Modified on 4/11/2016 (pes).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/11/2016. (pes)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal #24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/24/16. (jk)
March 15, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 4/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Revised Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Second Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Karl Kronenberger in support of Plaintiff's Revised Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 11, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots re #58 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Remove Redactions and to Overrule Privilege Objections Made at the Deposition of Steven Todd Weeber (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. Dispositive motions due by 4/15/2017. Final Pretrial Conference 10/2017., Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2016. Primary Expert due by 1/15/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/15/2017. Status Report on Motion to compel, ECFNo. #58 due by 3/18/2016. Plaintiff WITHDRAWS its motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, ECF No. #74 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/9/2016. (pes)
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (NMK)
March 7, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 3/31/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Karl Kronenberger in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RESCHEDULING Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 3/9/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/1/2016. (pes)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2016 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/1/2016. (pes)
February 29, 2016 Filing 71 JOINT STATUS REPORT of the Parties Regarding Mediation by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl) Modified text on 3/1/2016 (mas).
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED ORDER. Status Report on settlement discussions due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/2/2016. (pes)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. Status Report on settlement discussions due by 2/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/2/2016. (pes)
February 1, 2016 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT of the Parties Regarding Mediation by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Status Report on mediation due by 2/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/6/2015. (pes)
October 30, 2015 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT of the Parties following the October 21, 2015 Mediation by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 23, 2015 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Remove Redactions and to Overrule Privilege Objections Made at the Deposition of Steven Todd Weeber filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re #63 Notice of Withdrawal of Document. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the supplemental motion to compel, ECF #46 , as well as the original motion to compel, ECF #41 , from the Court's pending motions list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/18/2015. (pes)
September 17, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots re #46 Supplemental MOTION to Compel Further Responses to First Set of Requests for Production (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 15, 2015 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Remove Redactions and to Overrule Privilege Objections Made at the Deposition of Steven Todd Weeber filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Jennifer Edwards Declaration) (Edwards, Jennifer)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. The Court DIRECTS the parties to proceed to mediation on 10/21/2015 and to report on the status of that mediation no later than 10/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/15/2015. (pes)
September 14, 2015 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT re. Second Mediation by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
September 14, 2015 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT regarding Mediation by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
August 25, 2015 Filing 58 **WITHDRAWN as per Notice #76 ** MOTION to Compel Defendants to Remove Redactions and to Overrule Privilege Objections Made at the Deposition of Steven Todd Weeber by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit of Karl S. Kronenberger, #3 Exhibit A - C) (Kronenberger, Karl) Modified text on 3/14/2016 (mas).
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/17/2015. (pes)
August 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Discovery Conference held on 8/17/2015. (NMK)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Responses due by 9/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/17/2015. (pes)
August 17, 2015 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/18/2015. To Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jennifer)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the deponent to immediately return all documents reflected in the privilege log to defendant NetJets. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/27/2015. (pes)
July 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Discovery Conference held on 7/27/2015. (NMK)
July 27, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #46 Supplemental MOTION to Compel . Responses due by 8/17/2015 (pes)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/27/2015. (pes)
July 24, 2015 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #41 Motion to Compel. New date requested 8/17/2015. by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/27/2015 (mas).
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Status Report on second mediation due by 9/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/17/2015. (pes)
July 16, 2015 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT of the Parties on Subsequent Mediation Session by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The parties are DIRECTED to advise the Court once a second mediation, if any, has been scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/16/2015. (pes)
July 15, 2015 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT of Initial Mediation by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
July 15, 2015 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT regarding Initial Mediation Session Held June 24, 2015 by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
July 13, 2015 Filing 46 Supplemental MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Karl Kronenberger with Exhibits A-P in support of Supplemental Motion to Compel) (Kronenberger, Karl)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/10/2015. (pes)
July 10, 2015 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/18/2015. (pes)
June 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Status Conference held on 6/18/2015. (NMK)
June 12, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr)
June 9, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Further Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Karl Kronenberger in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) (Kronenberger, Karl)
June 5, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
June 1, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Samuels, Andrew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kincaid, Robert)
May 27, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due on the status of mediation by 7/15/2015. (sem)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Continued Preliminary Pretrial Order: The Court grants #33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; The parties shall report by 7/15/15 on the status of mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/27/15. (sem)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Subscriber Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/27/15. (sem)
May 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/27/2015. (NMK)
May 20, 2015 Filing 35 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
May 15, 2015 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Kronenberger, Karl)
May 15, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limits) (Taylor, Trent)
May 12, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Order to Authorize Disclosure of Subscriber Information Under U.S.C. 551(c)(2)(B) by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl Kronenberger in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Subscriber Information, #2 Declaration of Garner Miller in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Subscriber Information, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Subscriber Information) (Kronenberger, Karl)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER setting matter for mediation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/12/15. (jk)
May 5, 2015 NOTICE - Status Conference scheduled for 5/7/15 at 11:00 a.m. has been VACATED. (jk)
April 28, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing - Status Conference set for 5/7/2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/23/2015. (pes)
April 21, 2015 Filing 29 Joint MOTION For Entry of Agreed Order Establishing Protocol For Production of Electronically Stored Information by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jennifer)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 5/15/2015; Replies due by 6/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/13/2015. (pes1)
April 10, 2015 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 5/15/2015. New reply date requested 6/5/2015. by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 31, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Jennifer E Edwards substituting for Robert M. Kincaid as to Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Edwards, Jennifer)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 03/30/2015. (sr1)
March 27, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshots of Blogs and Twitter Accounts) (Kincaid, Robert)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/3/2015. (pes1)
March 3, 2015 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 3/27/2015. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kincaid, Robert)
February 27, 2015 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets, Inc, filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Petroff, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (pes1).
February 25, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE: Parties are notified the proceedings in this case are eligible for video recording. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/25/2015. (pes1)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/31/2015. Continued Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2015 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/25/2015. (pes1)
February 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/25/2015. (nmk0)
February 18, 2015 Filing 18 RULE 26(f) REPORT of all parties by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Kincaid, Robert)
February 17, 2015 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 2/27/2015 (pes1)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/13/2015. (pes1)
February 13, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend New date requested 2/27/2015. by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A) (Petroff, James)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/3/2015. (pes1)
February 3, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Discovery Conference held on 2/3/2015. (nmk0)
January 26, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Evan Samuels for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Samuels, Andrew)
January 26, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John B Lewis for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Lewis, John)
January 26, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E Edwards for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Edwards, Jennifer)
January 26, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Kathleen Matthews for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Matthews, Jacqueline)
January 26, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Linville for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Kincaid, Robert) Modified text on 1/26/2015 (mas1).
January 23, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Kincaid, Robert)
January 8, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2015 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr1)
December 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: NetJets Aviation, Inc. answer due 1/23/2015; NetJets, Inc. answer due 1/23/2015. (pes1)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/30/2014. (pes1)
December 30, 2014 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Kincaid, Robert)
December 30, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/23/2015. Stipulated Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Kincaid, Robert)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. NetJets Aviation, Inc. served on 12/11/2014, answer due 1/2/2015; NetJets, Inc. served on 12/11/2014, answer due 1/2/2015. (pes1)
December 9, 2014 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Clerk - Certified mailing of summons and complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1)
December 2, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (mas1)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JOHN DOES 1-10, NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4832574), filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form NetJets Aviation, #2 Summons Form NetJets Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Petroff, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JOHN DOES 1-10, NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4832574), filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Form NetJets Aviation, # 2 Summons Form NetJets Inc., # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Petroff, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots v. NetJets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh
Represented By: H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E Edwards
Represented By: Ronald Gordon Linville
Represented By: Robert Myron Kincaid, Jr.
Represented By: Jacqueline Kathleen Matthews
Represented By: John B Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Evan Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E Edwards
Represented By: Ronald Gordon Linville
Represented By: Robert Myron Kincaid, Jr.
Represented By: Jacqueline Kathleen Matthews
Represented By: John B Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Evan Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Todd Weeber
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots
Represented By: James Petroff
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Trent R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?