Texas Eastern Transmission, LP v. 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO et al
Plaintiff: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Defendant: BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD, Linda K. Kessler Living Trust, Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc., Todd Charles Yoder, Gregory Clark, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.9 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Steve Hasko, Charles F Bell, Yancey J Clark, Hilda Pearl Briceland Revocable Trust, Bonnie J Proger, Michael Peter French, RCVV Inc., THE EDWARD BARR CORP., John J Wargo, Josephine L Brinker, Daneen M Clark, Donald B Bishop, Bernard L Ravasio, Montserrat D Friedrich, 1.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC, Mary Ann Boyd, 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.33 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Marquette Orri Holdings, LLC, 4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Allen K Jaworski, Charles J Kolb, Diana L Barack, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Deborah J Picetti, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Estate of David M Wargo, Executrix, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Daniel J Barnes, Robert E Keenan, ALL OR PART OF 2.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Rick J Barone, The Claylick Farms Family Limited Partnership, 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND COLERAIN TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY AND JEFFERSON COUNTY,OHIO, Karen Louise French, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Ohio Power Company, Rice Drilling D LLC, Michael Lynn, ALL OR PART OF 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Mary K Robinson, Kriechbaum LLC, June M Schlernitzauer, ALL OR PART OF 2.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, GREAT RIVER ENERGY, LLC, Nancy Jane Clark, Gerald G Ciofani, 2.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, John David Sutherland, ALL OR PART OF 0.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 13 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MEAD TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, John Spencer Yoder, II, XTO Energy, Inc., The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Richard E. Martinkoski, ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, Timothy A Mapel, Carl J Parks, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY, 0.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation, Rodney Charles Polen Trust, Jon Craig Polen Trust, Linda J Taylor, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Martin M Miller, Roger Barack, ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, Meghann Kolb, Emma J Miller, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Eleanor Yoder, 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, CARDINAL GAS SERVICES, LLC, James Deen Polen Trust, Lana J. Barack, ALL OR PART OF 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Darrell Lee Burkey, ALL OR PART OF 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, American Electric Power Company, 4.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 6.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, James E Schlernitzauer, 5.83 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 8.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Frank W Grywalski, Jr., Lucas Cameron Waller, Charles E Anderson, Mary J Burgett, 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF .03 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, W&P McKarns Land LTD, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Lloyd Boyd, Carol A Dolak, 3.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, James Herbert Mehlman, Doris Starckey, Clarence R. Cronin, ALL OR PART OF 0.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA, Ohio Edison Company, ALL OR PART OF 1.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN EAST AND FRANKLIN TOWNSHIPS, CARROLL AND COLUMBIANA COUNTIES, OHIO, Bruce Grywalski, Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District #3, Thomas W Householder, Karen Sue Saladin, 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 7.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Wesley W Burgett, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND MEAD TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, Alex J Proger, Rhonda S. Yoder, ALL OR PART OF 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, Barbara Lynn, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 10.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND, PEASE AND COLERAIN TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Hess Ohio Resources, LLC, Carol L. Whetzel, Trustee of the Carol L. Whetzel Revocable Trust, ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Reserve Energy Exploration Company, David H. Barnes, Phyllis A. Martinkoski, Ohio Resources Company, Michael J Robinson, Julie A Anderson, ALL OR PART OF 1.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Kenneth O. Whetzel, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, NORTH AMERICAN COAL CORPORATION, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Guianne LLC, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 14.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN HANOVER TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Randall Imhoff, ALL OR PART OF 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 7.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, John M Dolak, Ohio River System LLC, Karen K Yoder, Keith A Taylor, Cindy Sutherland, ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND YORK TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, CSX Transportation, ALL OF PART 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Susan L Burkey, Barbara Parks, Donald P Barnes, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Judith C Hasko, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Janet L Householder, Dale R Barnes, 3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN AND RICHLAND TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF .04 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS AND SALEM TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 2.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OF PART 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Lisa A Clark, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 4.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Doris E. Ciofani, 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Blaine Wildlife Sanctuary, LLC, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Patricia L. Barone, John E Saladin, ALL OR PART OF 1.52 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.24 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, Robert E Brown, Michelle L Jaworski, CSX Transportation, Inc., 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Beth Renee Waller, Dale Property Services Penn, LP, Peggy J Mehlman, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Donna A Current, Thomas Eugene Sutherland, Kriechbaum Management, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN PEASE TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Mary Jane Brown, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Northern Ohio Oil and Gas Co. Inc., Cynthia M Carpico, Nina Sutherland, PERCHERON, LLC, Brian Powley Revocable Trust, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT AND SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, Gary A Clark, Tracy Bell, ALL OR PART OF 4.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Mason Dixon Energy, Inc. and Ohio Resources Company doing business as Craval Coal Co.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02650
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-3885 ARE related. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 9/27/2019. (er)
October 17, 2016 Filing 326 Transcript of Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on 01/06/2015, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (DuFour, Lahana)
April 26, 2016 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ohio River System LLC, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC, and PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
September 24, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP re #3 MOTION for Order to APPOINT COMMISSION (Shimeall, S.)
September 14, 2015 Filing 323 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant South Central Power Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
September 3, 2015 Filing 322 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Belmont County Sewer District #3 - Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
September 2, 2015 Filing 321 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C. and Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. by Defendants Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Fusonie, Thomas)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #318 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss certain non-property owner defendants. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/2/15. (jk)
August 7, 2015 Filing 319 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Shimeall, S.) Modified by changing filing party on 8/7/2015 (mas).
June 19, 2015 Filing 318 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Non-Property Owner Defendants by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Flint, Jennifer)
June 9, 2015 Filing 317 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation - Dominion Transmission, Inc. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
May 29, 2015 Filing 316 Transcript of Show Cause Proceedings held on 03/13/2015, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2015. (DuFour, Lahana)
May 21, 2015 NOTICE - Preliminary Injunction Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, May 26, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED (jk)
May 21, 2015 Filing 314 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint and All Claims Against Defendant Ohio Edison Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
May 20, 2015 Exhibit A to #315 Sealed Consent Agreement received and manually filed by the Clerk's Office. (mas)
May 20, 2015 Filing 315 Sealed Consent Agreement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E) (mas)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 Joint Motion for Leave to File Consent Agreement under seal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/20/15. (jk)
May 20, 2015 Filing 312 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consent Agreement Manually With the Clerk of Court Under Seal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
May 19, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ohio Edison Company answer due 5/22/2015. (mas)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #309 Ohio Edison Company's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/18/15. (jk)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER - Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued until Tuesday, May 26, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/15/15. (jk)
May 15, 2015 Filing 309 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/22/2015. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Verified Amended Complaint (Doc. #290) by Defendant Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
May 15, 2015 Remark: Counsel notified the Clerk by e-mail of their attempt to file an answer in this matter on 5/14/2015. The Clerk has filed the document on their behalf. (er)
May 14, 2015 Filing 308 ANSWER to #290 Second Amended Complaint filed by SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY. (er)
May 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ohio Edison Company answer due 5/15/2015. (mas)
May 6, 2015 Filing 307 STIPULATION Withdrawing Motion to Strike (Doc. #301) and Granting Defendant Ohio Edison Company Until May 15, 2015 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Verified Amended Complaint (Doc. #290) by Defendant Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
May 6, 2015 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal of American Electric Power Company and Ohio Power Company d/b/a AEP Ohio by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
May 5, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE by Defendant Ohio Edison Company re #292 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Condemnation Order of Filing Supplemental Exhibit in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Final Complaint (filed 5-5-15)) (Funk, Stephen)
May 5, 2015 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Exhibits (Joint) by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Segment 1 of Stipulated Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit Segment 2 of Stipulated Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit Segment 1 of Stipulated Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit Segment 2 of Stipulated Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit Stipulated Exhibit 19) (Flint, Jennifer)
May 5, 2015 Filing 303 EXHIBIT in Support of #292 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Condemnation Order by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Answer and Answer of Texas Eastern Transmission, LP) (Shimeall, S.) Modified text on 5/6/2015 (mas).
May 4, 2015 Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re #301 MOTION to Strike #290 Amended Complaint (Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #290)) filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Shimeall, S.)
May 4, 2015 Filing 301 **WITHDRAWN per counsels Stipulation #307 ** MOTION to Strike #290 Amended Complaint (Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #290)) by Defendant Ohio Edison Company. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Funk, Stephen) Modified text on 5/7/2015 (mas).
May 4, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by James Joseph Hughes, III for Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Hughes, James)
April 30, 2015 Filing 299 NOTICE by Defendant Ohio Edison Company re #295 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Answer of FirstEnergy Service Company and Renewed Requset for Expedited Action on Emergency Motion, filed on April 30, 2015 with Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Docket No. CP14-68-000) (Funk, Stephen)
April 30, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP re #297 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Filing Exhibits to Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Condemnation Order, Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession as to Certain Property Interests Held by Defendant Ohio Edison Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--TE Answer to FE Mot. to Intervene at FERC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B--FERC Portland Natural Gas (1997), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C--FERC Portland Natural Gas (1996), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D--Segment 1 of Initial Pre-Filing Draft Resource Report I, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D--Segment 2 of Initial Pre-Filing Draft Resource Report I, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D--Segment 3 of Initial Pre-Filing Draft Resource Report I, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E--Segment 1 of Resource Report I, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E--Segment 2 of Resource Report I, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E--Segment 3 of Resource Report I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit E--Segment 4 of Resource Report I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit F--Resource Report 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G--Segment 1 of Alignment Sheets for First 11 Miles of OPEN Project, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G--Segment 2 of Alignment Sheets for First 11 Miles of OPEN Project, #14 Exhibit Exhibit G--Segment 3 of Alignment Sheets for First 11 Miles of OPEN Project, #15 Exhibit Exhibit G--Segment 4 of Alignment Sheets for First 11 Miles of OPEN Project) (Hughes, James)
April 30, 2015 Filing 297 REPLY to Response to Motion re #292 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Condemnation Order filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Hughes, James)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER - Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for 5/5/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/27/15. (jk)
April 24, 2015 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #292 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Condemnation Order filed by Defendant Ohio Edison Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clyde E. Cessna, Jr., #2 Declaration of Mark Fowler, #3 Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, 104 FERC 61,080 (2003), #4 Texas Eastern FERC Variances) (Funk, Stephen)
April 24, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
April 21, 2015 Filing 293 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action and Attachment to Notice served on Ohio Edison Company, Debbie Justice on April 21, 2015, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
April 20, 2015 Filing 292 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Condemnation Order by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Martin Aff. (Original), #2 Exhibit 2 Petkovich Aff., #3 Exhibit 3 Savage Aff., #4 Exhibit 4 First Energy Emergency Motion for Leave to Intervene (FERC), #5 Exhibit 5 Gerken Aff., #6 Exhibit 6 Example of Easements, #7 Exhibit 7 Newcomer Aff., #8 Exhibit 8 Martin Aff. (New), #9 Exhibit 9 Adams Aff., #10 Exhibit 10 Collected Federal Register Notices, #11 Exhibit 11 Hy-Tech Co. Decision, #12 Exhibit 12 Black Marlin Pipeline Co. Decision, #13 Exhibit 13 Allen Aff.) (Hughes, James)
April 20, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Flint for Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
April 20, 2015 Filing 290 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALL OF PART 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OF PART 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF.04 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 2.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF.03 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 0.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA, ALL OR PART OF 1.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN EAST AND FRANKLIN TOWNSHIPS, CARROLL AND COLUMBIANA COUNTIES, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.52 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.24 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 14.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN HANOVER TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 2.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 4.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, ALL OR PART OF 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 7.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, Ohio Edison Company, Ohio Edison Company, filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. List of Properties-Easements, #2 Exhibit B. FERC Certificate, #3 Exhibit C. Map of Ohio Pipeline Route, #4 Exhibit D. Map of Eastern US, #5 Exhibit E. 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action) (Flint, Jennifer) Modified text on 4/21/2015 (mas).
April 20, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/1/15. (jk1)
March 31, 2015 Filing 287 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
March 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/13/2015. (Court Reporter Lahana DuFour) (jk1)
March 11, 2015 Filing 286 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #285 Order to Show Cause sent to Robert E. Keenan delivered by the U.S. Marshal on 3/10/2015. (er)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 3/13/2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/5/15. (jk1)
March 4, 2015 Filing 284 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
March 4, 2015 Filing 283 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughes, James)
March 4, 2015 Filing 282 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
March 3, 2015 NOTICE - Preliminary Conference scheduled for 3/3/15 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED. (jk1)
February 27, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing - Preliminary Conference set for 3/3/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk1)
February 19, 2015 Filing 281 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Condemnation Order, and Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Martin, #2 Affidavit Warnock, #3 Affidavit Savage) (Hughes, James)
February 18, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP of Posting of Surety Bond Pursuant to Stipulation of Entry for (Widmor) Martinkosky Defendants-Properties (Flint, Jennifer)
February 18, 2015 Injunction BOND in the amount of $ 4,000,000 posted by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (mas1)
February 18, 2015 Filing 279 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Baltimore & Ohio Railroad a/k/a CSX Transportation, Inc. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
February 17, 2015 Filing 278 STIPULATION of Entry (Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP and Defendants Phyllis A. (Widmor) and Richard E. Martinkosky) by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
February 13, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
February 12, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
February 12, 2015 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal of United States Environmental Protection Agency by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
February 10, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
February 9, 2015 Filing 273 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint filed by SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY. (agm1)
February 6, 2015 Filing 272 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, filed by BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD, CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Norman, Forrest)
February 2, 2015 Filing 271 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 30, 2015 Filing 270 STIPULATION For Second Extension of Time to Move Or Plead by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 28, 2015 Filing 269 STIPULATION Texas Eastern Transmission, LP and Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C. and Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 28, 2015 Filing 268 STIPULATION Texas Eastern Transmission, LP and South Central Power Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #260 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/28/15. (jk1)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #261 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/28/15. (jk1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 265 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation, Dominion Transmission, Inc., Dominion Gas Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Transmission, Inc., Other Affiliate Dominion Gas Holdings, LLC for Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation. (mas1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 27, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 27, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 27, 2015 Filing 261 Joint MOTION to Stay for an 11-Day Extension of the Previously Granted Stay of Proceedings with Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendants Phyllis A. (Widmor) and Richard E. Martinkoski by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 26, 2015 Filing 260 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 26, 2015 Filing 259 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RCVV Inc.. (Price, Gary)
January 23, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 23, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 23, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #252 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/23/15. (jk1)
January 23, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Notice of Deposit and Posting of Surety Bonds (Flint, Jennifer)
January 23, 2015 Filing 253 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Reserve Energy Exploration Corporation by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 23, 2015 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 6,165.00 (bond no. 022050408) posted by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (er1)
January 23, 2015 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 19,305.00 (bond no. 022051059) posted by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (er1)
January 23, 2015 Cash BOND in the amount of $ 19,592.00 (receipt no 200COL035767) posted by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (er1)
January 23, 2015 Filing 252 Joint MOTION to Stay 21-Day Extension of the Previously Granted Stay of Proceedings With Respect to Defendants Ohio Resources Company and United States Environmental Protection Agency by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 22, 2015 Filing 251 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hess Ohio Resources LLC by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 21, 2015 Filing 250 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Ohio Bell Telephone Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #246 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/21/15. (jk1)
January 21, 2015 Filing 248 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Dale Property Services Penn, LP by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 20, 2015 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ohio Edison Company, FirstEnergy Corp. identifying Corporate Parent FirstEnergy Corp. for Ohio Edison Company.. (Funk, Stephen)
January 20, 2015 Filing 246 Joint MOTION to Stay 7-Day Extension of the Previously Granted Stay of Proceedings with Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendants Bonnie J. Proger, Alex J. Proger, Guianne, LLC, Kriechbaum Management, Karen Sue Saladin, Keith A. Taylor, Linda J. Taylor, John E. Saladin, Jr., Charles E. Anderson, Julie A. Anderson, Donna A. Current, Bernard L. Ravasio, Donald Bishop, and Yancey Clark by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 20, 2015 Filing 245 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 20, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY answer due 2/10/2015. (mas1)
January 20, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/30/2015. by Defendant BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD. (Norman, Forrest)
January 16, 2015 Filing 243 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY and Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (er1)
January 16, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 238 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 235 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ohio Power Company, American Electric Power Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Ohio Power Company.. (Grayem, Jeremy)
January 16, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Forrest A Norman, III for Defendant BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD (Norman, Forrest)
January 13, 2015 Filing 233 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint filed by Ohio River System LLC, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
January 12, 2015 Filing 232 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, American Electric Power Company, Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy) Modified text on 1/13/2015 (mas1).
January 12, 2015 Filing 231 Defendant Ohio Resources Co. ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Including Objections and Affirmative Defenses filed by Ohio Resources Company. (Moore, April) Modified text on 1/13/2015 (mas1).
January 12, 2015 Filing 230 STIPULATION by Defendants American Electric Power Company, Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPINION AND ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Condemnation Order, and TRO and Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/12/2015. (er1)
January 12, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Matthew Warnock, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Matt Warnock, #2 Exhibit A) (Gerken, Daniel)
January 12, 2015 Filing 227 Response re #218 Notice (Other), for Clarifying Modifications by Defendants Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Fusonie, Thomas)
January 10, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 225 Response re #218 Notice (Other), of Filing Proposed Order (Doc. #218) by Defendant Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 224 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 223 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #213 Joint Corrected Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/9/15. (jk1)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER - The Court VACATES its previous Order, ECF No. 189. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/9/15. (jk1)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #212 Amended Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/9/15. (jk1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 219 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY. (er1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 217 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Cardinal Gas Services LLC by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #206 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/9/15. (jk1)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #208 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/9/15. (jk1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 214 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation. (agm1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION Corrected Joint Motion for a 14-Day Stay of Proceedings With Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendant Linda K. Kessler Living Trust by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 212 AMENDED Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION 14-Day Stay With Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendants The James Deen Polen Trust, The Jon Craig Polen Trust, and The Rodney Charles Polen Trust by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer) Modified text on 1/9/2015 (mas1).
January 9, 2015 Filing 211 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION 14-Day Stay with Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendants The James Deen Polen Trust, The Jon Craig Polen Trust, and The Rodney Charles Polen Trust by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of John Sheridan (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Sheridan, #2 Exhibit A) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 209 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Carroll Electric Cooperative Inc. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 208 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION for 14-Day Stay of Proceedings With Respect to the Parcel Encumbered by Defendant South Central Power Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 207 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of Jennifer A. Flint, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jennifer Flint, #2 Exhibit A) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 206 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION 14-Day Stay With Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendant Linda K. Kessler Living Trust by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Rand L McClellan for Defendant SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY. (er1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 203 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of Matthew W. Warnock, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Matt Warnock, #2 Exhibit A) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of Chris Savage (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chris Savage) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 201 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Proof of Publication 2013 in Monroe County Beacon (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Monroe County Beacon 2013) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Proof of Publication 2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Open Legal Notices) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Proof of Publication 2013 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Salem News, #2 Affidavit Herald Star) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 197 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of Daniel E. Gerken, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel Gerken) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 9, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP Affidavit of William Brett (Attachments: #1 Affidavit William Brett, #2 Exhibit A) (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Robert E. Keenan on 01/08/2015, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 8, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER regarding #189 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/8/15. (jk1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #187 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/8/15. (jk1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #184 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/8/15. (jk1)
January 8, 2015 Filing 189 MOTION for Service by Publication Corrected by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerken, Daniel)
January 8, 2015 Filing 188 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ohio River System LLC, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
January 8, 2015 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Stay for a 7-Day Stay of Proceedings for Parcels Encumbered by Defendant The Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Buzby, Brian)
January 8, 2015 Filing 186 STIPULATION and Agreement by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 185 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to Amended Complaint filed by The Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Buzby, Brian)
January 8, 2015 Filing 184 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION 14-Day Stay of Proceedings With Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendant RCVV, Inc. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 183 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 181 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION for Service by Publication Upon Defendant Robert E. Keenan by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Michael Braunstein, William Alan Goldman substituting for Craig J Wilson, Esq and Richard Emens, Esq. as to Defendants Janet L Householder, Thomas W Householder. (agm1)
January 7, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 7, 2015 Filing 174 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO. (Markowitz, Dale)
January 7, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay Kenneth Keller for Defendant CARDINAL GAS SERVICES, LLC (Keller, Clay)
January 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2015 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Court Reporter Lahana DuFour) (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 172 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Dale Property Services Penn, LP. (Kuhl, John)
January 6, 2015 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by David Kevin Liberati for Defendant 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO (Liberati, David)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #120 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #118 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #121 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1) (This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #45 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/15. (jk1) (This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 6, 2015 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on North American Coal Corporation on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Rice Energy aka Rice Drilling D LLC on 12/19/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 160 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc. on 12/19/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 159 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Thomas M. Wargo, Beneficiary on 12/23/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 158 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Reserve Energy Exploration Company. (Kuhl, John)
January 6, 2015 Filing 157 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Kuhl, John)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/6/14. (jk1)(This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 6, 2015 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Martin M. Miller and Emma J. Miller on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Diane Barack on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Eleanor J. Yoder on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Rhonda S. Yoder on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Todd C. Yoder on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on John Spencer Yoder on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Karen K. Yoder on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 148 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Gerald G Ciofani and Doris E. Ciofani on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on David H. Barnes on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 146 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Donald P. Barnes on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Daniel J. Barnes on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Doris Starckey on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Deborah J. Picetti on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 142 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Dale R. Barnes on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Lloyd Boyd on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Mary Ann Boyd on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Bruce Grywalski and Frank Grywalski, Jr. on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Allen Jaworski and Michelle Jaworski on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Michelle Jaworski on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Allen Jaworski on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Thomas Eugene Sutherland on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Cindy Sutherland on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on John David Sutherland on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Nina Sutherland on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Darrell Lee Burkey on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Judith C. Hasko on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Steve Hasko on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on W&P McKarns Lands LTD on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Cynthia M. Carpico on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on XTO Energy Inc on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Rick J. Barone and Patricia L. Barone on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Barbara Lynn and Michael Lynn on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Michael P. French on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Karen French on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 121 Joint MOTION to Stay for a 7-Day Stay of Proceedings with Respect to Parcels Encumbered by Defendants American Electric Power and Ohio Power Company by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Stay for a 14-Day Stay of Proceedings with Respect to Parcels Encumbered by Defendant Carroll Electric Cooperative, Inc. by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Stay 14-Day Stay of Proceedings With Respect to Parcels Owned by Ciofani, Proger, Clark, Whetzel, Kriechbaum Management, Saladin, Taylor, Mapel, Anderson, Burgett, Powley Revocable Trust, Current, Ravasio, Waller, Householder, Bishop and Clark by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 NOTICE - Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order RESCHEDULED for 1/6/15 at 10:00 a.m. (jk1)
January 5, 2015 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Rodney Charles Polen Trust on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on PVR Utica Gas Gathering LLC on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Dale Property Services Penn, LP on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Hess Ohio Resources LLC fka Marquette Orri Holdings on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Hess Ohio Resources LLC fka Marquette Exploration LLC on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Guianne LLC on 12/26/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Brian Powley Revocable Trust c/o Betty Powley on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on RCVV Inc on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Charles J. Kolb on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Meghann Kolb on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Ohio Resources Co on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Donna Current on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District #3 on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Alex J. Proger on 12/19/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Alex J Proger and Bonnie J Proger on 12/19/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Randall Imhoff on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Charles Bell on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Tracy Bell on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Roger Barack on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Lana J. Barack on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Daneen M. Clark and Nancy Jane Clark on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Gary A Clark and Gregory A. Clark on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Kriechbaum Management on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Carol L. Whetzel Revocable Trust c/o Kenneth Whetzel on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Kenneth O Whetzel on 12/20/14, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on James Herbert Mehlman and Peggy J Mehlman on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on John M Dolak and Carol A Dolak on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Wesley W Burgett and Mary J Burgett on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Lisa A. Clark on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Lisa A. Clark on 12/21/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on James Deen Polen Trust on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on John E. Saladin, Jr. on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Karen Sue Saladin on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on American Electric Power Company on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation dba Dominion Hope Gas on 12/19/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Thomas W. Householder and Janet L. Householder on 12/27/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Linda K. Kessler Living Trust, Linda Kessler Trustee on 12/27/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Kriechbaum LLC on 12/26/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Blaine Wildlife Sanctuary LLC on 12/26/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Donald Bishop on 12/27/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Ohio Power Company on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Ohio Power Company on 12/17/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Yancey Clark on 12/30/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on South Central Power Company on 12/30/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on U.S. Environmental Protection Agency on 12/22/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Francis J. Wargo, beneficiary on 12/24/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Baltimore & Ohio Railroad aka CSX Transportation, Inc. on 12/26/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Chesapeake Exploration LLC on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Rosemary C. Serra, Beneficiary on 12/29/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Rosemary C. Serra, Administratrix on 12/18/14, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Margaret M. Viancourt, beneficiary on 12/29/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Estate of David M. Wargo c/o Katheryn M. Cancelliere, Beneficiary on 12/29/14, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Hilda Pearl Briceland Revocable Trust, Patty Jarvis on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Barbara Parks on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Carroll Electric Cooperative on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Timothy Mapel on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Great River Energy, LLC on 12/26/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on The Edward Barr Corp. fka Northern Ohio Oil and Gas Co., Inc. on 12/29/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Julie A. Anderson on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Charles E. Anderson on 12/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Cardinal Gas Service LLC on 12/29/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Regency Utica Gas Gathering, LLC on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Ohio River System LLC on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Ohio Edison Company on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Chesapeake Appalacia LLC on 12/18/14, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on The Ohio Bell Telephone Company on 12/18/14, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on Reserve Energy Exploration Company on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Action, Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission Order served on PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC on 12/18/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Gerken, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Filing 47 STIPULATION by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Condemnation Act. Motion for Condemnation Order and Motion for Appointment of Commission served on Pencheron LLC fka Mason Dixon Energy LLC on 12/29/2014, filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION for a 21-Day Stay of Proceedings with Respect to Parcels Owned by Defendant Phyllis A. (Widmor) and Richard E. Martinkoski by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 44 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Defendants Charles E Anderson, Julie A Anderson, Donald B Bishop, Mary J Burgett, Wesley W Burgett, Doris E. Ciofani, Gerald G Ciofani, Gary A Clark, Gregory Clark, Yancey J Clark, Donna A Current, Guianne LLC, Janet L Householder, Thomas W Householder, Kriechbaum LLC, Kriechbaum Management, Timothy A Mapel, Brian Powley Revocable Trust, Alex J Proger, Bonnie J Proger, Bernard L Ravasio, John E Saladin, Karen Sue Saladin, Keith A Taylor, Linda J Taylor, Beth Renee Waller, Lucas Cameron Waller, Kenneth O. Whetzel, Carol L. Whetzel, Trustee of the Carol L. Whetzel Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Braunstein, Michael)
January 5, 2015 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Defendants American Electric Power Company, Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy)
January 5, 2015 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION and Condemnation Order filed by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Defendants 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, Lana J. Barack, Roger Barack. (Thompson, Maurice)
January 5, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Braunstein for Defendants Janet L Householder, Thomas W Householder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Braunstein, Michael)
January 5, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 1/5/2015 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel are to call 888.684.8852, access code 3470668. (jk1)
January 5, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer)
January 5, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for a 21 Day Stay with Respect to Parcels owned by Defendant Ohio Resources Company by Plaintiff and by Defendant USEPA and by Defendant Ohio Resources Company. (Moore, April) Modified text on 12/31/2014 (mas1).
December 31, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - Parties who wish to file briefs shall do so by noon on Monday, January 5, 2015. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/31/14. (jk1)
December 30, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall, Lindsay M Bouffard for Defendant Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation. (agm1)
December 29, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Ondrey for Defendants PHYLLIS A. MARTINKOSKI, RICHARD E. MARTINKOSKI, Phyllis A. Martinkoski, Richard E. Martinkoski (Ondrey, David)
December 29, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale H. Markowitz for Defendants PHYLLIS A. MARTINKOSKI, RICHARD E. MARTINKOSKI, Phyllis A. Martinkoski, Richard E. Martinkoski (Markowitz, Dale)
December 28, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice A Thompson for Defendants Diana L Barack, Lana J. Barack, Roger Barack (Thompson, Maurice)
December 24, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (Flint, Jennifer)
December 24, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Ondrey for Defendants Charles F Bell, Tracy Bell, Carol A Dolak, John M Dolak, Allen K Jaworski, Michelle L Jaworski, Charles J Kolb, Meghann Kolb, James Herbert Mehlman, Peggy J Mehlman (Ondrey, David)
December 24, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale H. Markowitz for Defendants Charles F Bell, Tracy Bell, Carol A Dolak, John M Dolak, Allen K Jaworski, Michelle L Jaworski, Charles J Kolb, Meghann Kolb, James Herbert Mehlman, Peggy J Mehlman (Markowitz, Dale)
December 24, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D Brunton for Defendant Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC (Brunton, Gregory)
December 23, 2014 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN AND RICHLAND TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND MEAD TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT AND SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.9 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 4.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN PEASE TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND YORK TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.33 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MEAD TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 2.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS AND SALEM TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 4.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 6.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 13 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 7.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 5.83 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 8.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, American Electric Power Company, Charles E Anderson, Julie A Anderson, BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD, BLAINE WILDLIFE SANCTUARY, LLC, Diana L Barack, Lana J. Barack, Roger Barack, Dale R Barnes, Daniel J Barnes, David H. Barnes, Donald P Barnes, Patricia L. Barone, Rick J Barone, Charles F Bell, Tracy Bell, Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District #3, Donald B Bishop, Lloyd Boyd, Mary Ann Boyd, Hilda Pearl Briceland Revocable Trust, Josephine L Brinker, Mary Jane Brown, Robert E Brown, Mary J Burgett, Wesley W Burgett, Darrell Lee Burkey, Susan L Burkey, CARDINAL GAS SERVICES, LLC, CLARENCE R. CRONIN, Cynthia M Carpico, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Doris E. Ciofani, Gerald G Ciofani, Daneen M Clark, Gary A Clark, Gregory Clark, Lisa A Clark, Nancy Jane Clark, Yancey J Clark, Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation, Donna A Current, Dale Property Services Penn, LP, Carol A Dolak, John M Dolak, Karen Louise French, Michael Peter French, Montserrat D Friedrich, GREAT RIVER ENERGY, LLC, Bruce Grywalski, Frank W Grywalski, Jr, Guianne LLC, HESS OHIO RESOURCES, LLC, HESS OHIO RESOURCES, LLC, Judith C Hasko, Steve Hasko, Janet L Householder, Thomas W Householder, Randall Imhoff, Allen K Jaworski, Michelle L Jaworski, KRIECHBAUM LLC, Robert E Keenan, Charles J Kolb, Meghann Kolb, Kriechbaum Management, LINDA K. KESSLER LIVING TRUST, Barbara Lynn, Michael Lynn, PHYLLIS A. MARTINKOSKI, RICHARD E. MARTINKOSKI, Timothy A Mapel, Marquette Orri Holdings, LLC, James Herbert Mehlman, Peggy J Mehlman, Emma J Miller, Martin M Miller, NORTH AMERICAN COAL CORPORATION, Northern Ohio Oil and Gas Co. Inc., Ohio Edison Company, Ohio Power Company, Ohio Resources Company d/b/a Craval Coal Co., Ohio River System LLC, PERCHERON, LLC, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC, Barbara Parks, Carl J Parks, Deborah J Picetti, James Deen Polen Trust, Jon Craig Polen Trust, Rodney Charles Polen Trust, Brian Powley Revocable Trust, Alex J Proger, Bonnie J Proger, RCVV Inc., Bernard L Ravasio, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC, Reserve Energy Exploration Company, Rice Drilling D LLC, Mary K Robinson, Michael J Robinson, SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY, John E Saladin, Karen Sue Saladin, James E Schlernitzauer, June M Schlernitzauer, Doris Starckey, Cindy Sutherland, John David Sutherland, Nina Sutherland, Thomas Eugene Sutherland, THE EDWARD BARR CORP., Keith A Taylor, Linda J Taylor, The Claylick Farms Family Limited Partnership, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc., U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, W&P McKarns Land LTD, Beth Renee Waller, Lucas Cameron Waller, John J Wargo, Estate of David M Wargo, Executrix, Kenneth O. Whetzel, Carol L. Whetzel, Trustee of the Carol L. Whetzel Revocable Trust, XTO Energy, Inc., Eleanor Yoder, John Spencer Yoder, II, Karen K Yoder, Rhonda S. Yoder, Todd Charles Yoder, filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Flint, Jennifer)
December 23, 2014 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Status Conference held on 12/23/2014. (Court Reporter Lahana Dufour.) (Attachments: #1 List of Counsel) (lvw1)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #2 Motion for TRO, filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP; Oral Hearing on said motion set for 1/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/23/14. (sem1)
December 23, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M Grayem for Defendants American Electric Power Company, Ohio Power Company (Grayem, Jeremy)
December 23, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant A Mason for Defendant Carroll Electric Cooperative (Mason, Grant)
December 23, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D Brunton for Defendants Ohio River System LLC, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC (Brunton, Gregory)
December 23, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Young for Defendant Ohio Edison Company (Young, Jeremy)
December 23, 2014 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Defendant Ohio Resources Company d/b/a Craval Coal Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit April Bott Moore Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Moore, April)
December 22, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by April Bott Moore for Defendant Ohio Resources Company d/b/a Craval Coal Co. (Moore, April)
December 19, 2014 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION filed by Defendant 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN PEASE TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO. (Braunstein, Michael)
December 19, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Dertke for Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Dertke, Daniel)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Informal Preliminary Conference set for 12/23/2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/23/14. (jk1)
December 16, 2014 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, Spectra Energy Partners, LP, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Corp identifying Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Partners, LP, Other Affiliate Spectra Energy Corp, Other Affiliate Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC for Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.. (Flint, Jennifer)
December 16, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to APPOINT COMMISSION by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Flint, Jennifer) Modified by terming motion on 9/24/2015 (mas).
December 16, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Condemnation Order, and Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by Plaintiff Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Flint, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/17/2014 (mas1).
December 16, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CONDEMNATION against 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN PEASE TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND YORK TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.33 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 1.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 1.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MEAD TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 2.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS AND SALEM TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN AND RICHLAND TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND MEAD TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT AND SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIPS, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.9 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 4.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 4.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 6.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 13 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 7.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO, 5.83 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 8.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO, American Electric Power Company, Charles E Anderson, Julie A Anderson, Diana L Barack, Lana J. Barack, Roger Barack, Dale R Barnes, Daniel J Barnes, David H. Barnes, Donald P Barnes, Rick J Barone, Charles F Bell, Tracy Bell, Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District #3, Donald B Bishop, Lloyd Boyd, Mary Ann Boyd, Hilda Pearl Briceland Revocable Trust, Josephine L Brinker, Mary Jane Brown, Robert E Brown, Mary J Burgett, Wesley W Burgett, Darrell Lee Burkey, Susan L Burkey, Cynthia M Carpico, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Doris E. Ciofani, Gerald G Ciofani, Daneen M Clark, Gary A Clark, Gregory Clark, Lisa A Clark, Nancy Jane Clark, Yancey J Clark, Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation, Donna A Current, Dale Property Services Penn, LP, Carol A Dolak, John M Dolak, Karen Louise French, Michael Peter French, Montserrat D Friedrich, Bruce Grywalski, Frank W Grywalski, Jr, Guianne LLC, Judith C Hasko, Steve Hasko, Janet L Householder, Thomas W Householder, Randall Imhoff, Allen K Jaworski, Michelle L Jaworski, Robert E Keenan, Charles J Kolb, Meghann Kolb, Kriechbaum Management, Barbara Lynn, Michael Lynn, Timothy A Mapel, Marquette Orri Holdings, LLC, James Herbert Mehlman, Peggy J Mehlman, Emma J Miller, Martin M Miller, Northern Ohio Oil and Gas Co. Inc., Ohio Edison Company, Ohio Power Company, Ohio Resources Company d/b/a Craval Coal Co., Ohio River System LLC, PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC, Barbara Parks, Carl J Parks, Deborah J Picetti, James Deen Polen Trust, Jon Craig Polen Trust, Rodney Charles Polen Trust, Brian Powley Revocable Trust, Alex J Proger, Bonnie J Proger, RCVV Inc., Bernard L Ravasio, Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC, Reserve Energy Exploration Company, Rice Drilling D LLC, Mary K Robinson, Michael J Robinson, John E Saladin, Karen Sue Saladin, James E Schlernitzauer, June M Schlernitzauer, Doris Starckey, Cindy Sutherland, John David Sutherland, Nina Sutherland, Thomas Eugene Sutherland, Keith A Taylor, Linda J Taylor ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4852784), filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flint, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP v. 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALTIMORE & OHIO RAILROAD
Represented By: Forrest A Norman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda K. Kessler Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Charles Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Clark
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.9 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles F Bell
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancey J Clark
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Pearl Briceland Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie J Proger
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Peter French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCVV Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE EDWARD BARR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine L Brinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daneen M Clark
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B Bishop
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard L Ravasio
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montserrat D Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVR Utica Gas Gathering, LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.33 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MOUNT PLEASANT TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Orri Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SMITHFIELD TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen K Jaworski
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J Kolb
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana L Barack
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Grant A Mason
Represented By: Julie Gonzi Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah J Picetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of David M Wargo, Executrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 2.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick J Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Claylick Farms Family Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND COLERAIN TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY AND JEFFERSON COUNTY,OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Louise French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Thomas Howard Fusonie
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Power Company
Represented By: Jeremy M Grayem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Drilling D LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 2.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary K Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kriechbaum LLC
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June M Schlernitzauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 2.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT RIVER ENERGY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Jane Clark
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald G Ciofani
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Utica Gas Gathering LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 6.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 13 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN MEAD TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Spencer Yoder, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Brian Lee Buzby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN YORK TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Martinkoski
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A Mapel
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Represented By: Jeremy M Grayem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH CENTRAL POWER COMPANY
Represented By: Rand L McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.5 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Gas Supply Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay M Cogley
Represented By: Vincent I Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Charles Polen Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Craig Polen Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J Taylor
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Howard Fusonie
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Barack
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 2.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghann Kolb
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL GAS SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Clay Kenneth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deen Polen Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana J. Barack
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.902 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.92 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Lee Burkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Company
Represented By: Jeremy M Grayem
Represented By: Marilyn McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 6.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Schlernitzauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.83 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 8.8 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank W Grywalski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Cameron Waller
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Anderson
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J Burgett
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF .03 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&P McKarns Land LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A Dolak
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN BRUSH CREEK TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Herbert Mehlman
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Starckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence R. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.9 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, IN COLUMBIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Edison Company
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Jones
Represented By: Jeremy Young
Represented By: Stephen W Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN EAST AND FRANKLIN TOWNSHIPS, CARROLL AND COLUMBIANA COUNTIES, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Grywalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont County Sanitary Sewer District #3
Represented By: David Kevin Liberati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W Householder
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Sue Saladin
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 7.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN ROSS TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley W Burgett
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN COLERAIN TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: David Kevin Liberati
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 5.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND MEAD TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex J Proger
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda S. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.2 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT,AND 0.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN WAYNE TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 10.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND, PEASE AND COLERAIN TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Ohio Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol L. Whetzel, Trustee of the Carol L. Whetzel Revocable Trust
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.8 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 1.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reserve Energy Exploration Company
Represented By: Thomas Howard Fusonie
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis A. Martinkoski
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Resources Company
Represented By: April Bott Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A Anderson
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 5.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth O. Whetzel
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN COAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.4 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 3.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN SALEM TOWNSHIP, JEFFERSON COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guianne LLC
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 4.4 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND TOWNSHIP, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.7 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 14.1 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN HANOVER TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Imhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 4.6 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 7.3 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.7 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Dolak
Represented By: Dale H. Markowitz
Represented By: David M. Ondrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio River System LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen K Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Taylor
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 1.1 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 2.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.0 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.0 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN RICHLAND AND YORK TOWNSHIPS, BELMONT COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation
Represented By: Forrest A Norman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OF PART 0.5 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.2 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L Burkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald P Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OR PART OF 0.3 ACRES PERMANENT EASEMENT, AND 0.6 ACRES TEMPORARY EASEMENT OF LAND IN FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIANA COUNTY, OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith C Hasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Daniel R Dertke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet L Householder
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: William Alan Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers