Schwab v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Terry Schwab
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2015cv00491
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ATHENS
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER adopting and affirming 25 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Objection 28 is OVERRULED. This action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/12/2017. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terry Schwab in that it is RECOMMENDED that the petition be DENIED and that this action be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/16/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be DISMISSED as a mixed petition unless, within 30 days, Petitioner elects to withdraw his first ground for relief or moves for a stay and abeyance under Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269 (2005). Objectio ns to R&R due by 8/18/2016. Petitioner has also filed a motion for change of caption and to change his address on the docket, which isgranted (ECF 14 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 8/1/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?