September 23, 2020 |
Filing
179
OPINION and ORDER - Defendants' and Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED. The R&R is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Defendants motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 163, is GRANTED in part as outlined here and in the R&R and DENIED in part with resp ect to the remaining First Amendment retaliation claims outlined in this Opinion and Order and the R&R. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/23/2020. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing
174
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANTS FARRAR AND TROUTE BE: (1) GRANTED IN PART ON TWO OF SEVERAL CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT FARRAR; AND (2) DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS (DOC. 163 ). O bjections to R&R due by 5/1/2020. *** ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY (DOC. 172 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/17/2020. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 2, 2019 |
Filing
140
ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) VACATING THE APRIL 18, 2019 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (DOC. 138 ); (2) ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE JUNE 3, 2019; (3) DIRECTING THE CLERK TO MAIL BY CERTIFIED MAIL THE DOC KET SHEET IN THIS CASE AND ALL FILINGS IN THIS CASE SINCE THE BEGINNING OF 2019; AND (3) DENYING IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STAY OR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. 139 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/1/19. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
138
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT THIS CASE: (1) BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND (2) TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/18/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
133
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A NOTICE OF APPEAL (DOC. 132 ), WHETHER CONSTRUED AS A MOTION OR AS A REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, BE DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/24/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
131
ORDER AND ENTRY STAYING BRIEFING ON MOTIONS SERVED ON DEFENDANTS BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF BUT NOT YET FILED WITH THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/22/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 17, 2019 |
Filing
129
ORDER AND ENTRY TERMINATING THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 95 ) ON THE DOCKET. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/17/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing
123
ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) DENYING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MISCELLANEOUS MOTIONS (DOCS. 109, 117, 119); (2) ORDERING THE CLERK OF COURTS TO MAIL PLAINTIFF A COPY OF THE COURTS OCTOBER 5, 2018 ORDER; (3) DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE (DOC. 118 ); (4) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. 121); AND (5) SETTING A DEADLINE OF JANUARY 7, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO FILE A CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/13/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing
104
ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STAY PRETRIALDEADLINES (DOCS. 96, 99, 103); (2) GRANTING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TOCOMPEL (DOC. 97); (3) ORDERING DEFEENDANTS TO SERVE WRITTENDISCOVERY RESPONSES WITH 14 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER; (4)ORDERING THAT DEFENDANTS MAY SUPPLEMENT THEIR MOTION FORJUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITH A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 7, 2018; AND (5) DENYING PRO SE PLAINTIFFSMOTION FOR SANCTIONS (DOC. 101) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/6/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying as moot 74 Motion for a Pretrial Conference. The Ohio Attorney General is DIRECTED to file the last known address of Theresa MaGill under seal WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. Upon receipt of her address, the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve by certified mail upon Defendant Magill a summons and a copy of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/25/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER adopting and affirming 50 the Report and Recommendation; denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/28/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
50
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER - It is recommended that 39 MOTION for FRCP 65 Injunction and Restraining Order be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2017. The MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Doc. 47 ) is granted. The MOTION for General Reli ef (Doc. 49 ) is granted in part and denied in part as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 1/30/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER finding as moot 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 33 Motion to Address Access to Copies and Full Access to the Courts; granting 28 Motion for Order to provide a definite statement; granting 31 Motion or Leave to Supplement the Current Issues and Defendants When the New Definite Statement is Filed; finding as moot 34 Motion Pursuant to FRCP 7(b)(1)(2)(3); finding as moot 36 Motion for Order of the Court Pursuant to FRCP 7(b); denying 45 Motion to St ay; granting 30 Motion to Address the Defendants that have not been Served at this Time; granting 43 Motion in Response to Present Evidence Information and Chronological Order of Retaliation; granting 42 Motion Requesting Permission to Respo nd to 40 Response in Opposition to Motion; denying 29 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/26/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER re IFP status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/3/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|