Smith v. State of Ohio Rehabilitation and Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Smith
Defendant: Correctional Officer Herren
Case Number: 2:2015cv01272
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION and ORDER adopting 42 the Report and Recommendation; granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/28/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by James Smith (Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2017), ORDER - Denying 18 and 20 Motion for Order to Compel filed by James Smith; Denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James Smith; and GRANTING 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Correctional Officer Herren. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 29, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting 3 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 5/7/15. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND INITIAL SCREEN REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Complaint. Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Pursuant to the Court's initial screen, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Defendants ODR C and MCI from this action.Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/17/2015. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of Ohio Rehabilitation and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?