Kendle v. WHIG Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John F Kendle
Defendant: WHIG Enterprises, LLC, RxPro Mississippi, Inc., Mitchell Chad Barrett and David Jason Rutland
Case Number: 2:2015cv01295
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: WASHINGTON
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION and ORDER granting 139 140 145 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment in that all three of Kendles breach of contract claims are DISMISSED as against Rutland, Barrett, and Rx Pro of Mississippi. Kendles tortious interference and unjust enrichment claims are DISMISSED as against Barrett and Rx Pro of Mississippi. All claims against WHIG and the tortious interference, unjust enrichment, and spoliation claims against Rutland remain pending. Further, 150 denying Plaintiff' ;s Motion to Defer Ruling on Defendant Rx Pro of Mississippi, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/18/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting in part 157 Motion to File Document Under Seal: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to submit the affidavit via email for in camera review. Following review, the Court will rule on the portion of the Motion seeking leave to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/11/2017. (ew)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying without prejudice 128 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/19/2017. (ew)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION and ORDER denying 99 MOTION for Court Order Related to Documents Seized by the Federal Bureau of Investigation, granting in part and denying in part 81 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Seco nd Amended Complaint consistent with this Order within seven (7) days. Discovery due by 8/14/2017. Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2017. No further extensions of these deadlines will be permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/7/2017. (ew)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 37 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Defendant Rutland and denying 36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Defendant Barrett. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 9/30/16. (sem)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/9/2016. (pes)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 30 Defendant Jason Rutland's Motion to Transfer Venue and 31 Motion to Transfer Venue of Defendants Whig Enterprises, LLC, RXPRO of Mississippi, Inc. and Mitchell Chad Barrett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/29/2016. (pes)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 6/26/15. (kn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendle v. WHIG Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Kendle
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Alvin Earl Mathews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIG Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RxPro Mississippi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Chad Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jason Rutland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?