Tower et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tabatha Aumetra Tower, TAT Books, Tower Productions and BRT Adventure Books
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc, Rosedog Books, Kenkebooks and Anybooks
Case Number: 2:2015cv02405
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: LORAIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Defendants RoseDog Books and Dorrance Publishing, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/25/2019. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendants Kenkebooks and Anybooks. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/22/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/22/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE against Defendants Kenkebooks and Anybooks pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to timely effect service of process. Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/22/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/10/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/27/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 70 Motion to participate in settlement week conference via telephone for Defendant Amazon.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/7/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING as moot 35 Motion to Strike ; denying 41 Motion for Default Judgment; DENYING as moot 45 Motion to Change Venue; granting 49 Motion to Withdraw the Mo tion to Change Venue; denying 51 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 52 Motion to Move to Trial in the matter; denying 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/18/2016. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tower et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Aumetra Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAT Books
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tower Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRT Adventure Books
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosedog Books
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenkebooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anybooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?