Gordon v. United States of America
Petitioner: Michael Lee Gordon
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv02680
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 12 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 2/24/2017. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be DISMISSED WITH PREJDUICE. The Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/13/2016. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - The Motion for Reconsideration is therefore DENIED. The Clerk shall file this Order in all three of the above cases. The Magistrate Judge notes that the Clerk accepted the instant Motion for filing despite Judge Graham's Order to the contrary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/27/2015. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Lee Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?