Oster v. Huntington Bancshares Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jody M. Oster
Defendant: Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, The Huntington National Bank, F. Thomas Eck, IV and Richard Cheap
Case Number: 2:2015cv02746
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion in Limine; denying 121 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate; granting 122 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Witnesses; granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/28/17. (sem)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/19/2017. (cw)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 71 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 1/5/2017. (agm)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/27/2016. (agm)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 60 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/20/2016. (agm) Modified on 12/20/2016 (agm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oster v. Huntington Bancshares Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody M. Oster
Represented By: James Scott Mowery, Jr
Represented By: Sean P. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Bancshares Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Thomas Eck, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cheap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?