McQueen v. Commissioner of the IRS et al
Plaintiff: John McQueen
Defendant: Commissioner of the IRS
Case Number: 2:2015cv02777
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/22/2016. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This case is DISMISSED. Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/14/2016. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 2 Complaint filed by John McQueen be dismissed in its entirety. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days. Motion granted: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John McQueen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 10/22/2015. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Commissioner of the IRS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?