Nature's One, Inc. v. Spring Hill Jersey Cheese, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nature's One, Inc.
Defendant: Spring Hill Jersey Cheese, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02820
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 132 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/29/2017. (cw)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 122 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/24/17. (sh)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Defendant Spring Hill is DIRECTED to contemporaneously file a public version with any confidential, sensitive information redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/20/2017. (kdp)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and granting 64 Defendant Spring Hill Jersey Cheese, Inc. Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chad E Dworkin and Tina Taylor Pecuszok terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/26/16. (sem)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration and denying the Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/2/2016. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nature's One, Inc. v. Spring Hill Jersey Cheese, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nature's One, Inc.
Represented By: Marcel C Duhamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Hill Jersey Cheese, Inc.
Represented By: Chad E Dworkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?