Doe v. The Ohio State University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: The Ohio State University, Javaune Adams-Gaston and Matthew Page
Case Number: 2:2015cv02830
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/24/2018. (ds)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/22/2017. (agm)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting motions seeking to file certain documents under seal (Docs. 106 , 108 , and 109 ). Defendants shall file a redacted version of the motion for summary judgment on the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/12/2017. (agm)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Stay 97 ORDER - the Court grants 88 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/24/2017. (agm)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/20/2016. (agm)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/7/2016. (ds)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 66 Report and Recommendations & denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 4/20/2016. (kk)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Objections to R&R due within seven (7) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/22/2016. (agm)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/11/2016. (agm)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER finding as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the amended complaint 44 . Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/21/16. (kn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/20/15. (kn)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Deposition of Non-party Jane Roe.. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 12.15.15. (kn)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 10/16/15. (kn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Ohio State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Joshua A Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio State University
Represented By: Reid T Caryer
Represented By: Christina Corl
Represented By: Michael Cannon McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javaune Adams-Gaston
Represented By: Reid T Caryer
Represented By: Christina Corl
Represented By: Michael Cannon McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Page
Represented By: Reid T Caryer
Represented By: Christina Corl
Represented By: Michael Cannon McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?