Hogan v. Cleveland Ave Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Hogan
Defendant: Cleveland Ave Restaurant, Inc., Chad Sullivan, Francis Sharrak, Michael Sharrak and Dominick Alkammo
Case Number: 2:2015cv02883
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 OPINION and ORDER issued in that the Court APPOINTS John C. Camillus as the Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/20/21. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 307 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/29/2021. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER denying as premature and unripe 261 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Plaintiffs may seek leave to file a renewed motion for permanent injunction subsequently. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/15/2021. (cw)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting 315 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, the parties are ordered to confer regarding the nomination of a Special Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/23/2020. (cw)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting 283 Motion Approve Claims Administrator. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/8/2020. (cw)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and CERTIFICATION OF FACTS re 245 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Against Vanity Gentlemen's Club. It is RECOMMENDED that non-party Vanity Gentlemen's Club not be held in civil contempt. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/1/20. (sem)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 235 Motion to Enforce Settlement; granting 236 Motion to Expedite. Defendants are ORDERED to provide Plaintiffs with a complete and accurate list of all entertainers and bartenders and their contact information. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/14/2020. (cw)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 196 Motion to Compel. Defendant BACE is ORDERED to provide Plaintiffs with a list of its members within 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ODER. Defendant BACE is further ORDERED to respond to discovery requests from Plaintiffs concerning BACEs members' activities (Discovery due by 5/10/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 26, 2019. (jlk)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 93 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on March 26, 2018. (jlk)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADOPTING in part and DENYING in part the Report and Recommendation; GRANTING 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; sustaining 91 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order. ORDERING parties to appear before the Court on May 9, 2018, at 2:00 p. m., Courtroom 1, Room 331, before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley, at which time Defendants must show cause as to why they should not be further sanctioned or held in contempt. After such hearing, the Court will determine what, if any, further sanctions are warranted. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/22/2018. (cw)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER - granting re 101 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Class and Collective Action Certification by Dejha Valentine, Jessica Hogan. New date requested 10/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 19, 2017. (jlk)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Joint Motion to Stay Supplemental Briefing on Fees. Parties to file briefing on fees 14 days after the Court rules on Plt's pending objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/10/2017. (sln)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/8/2017. (kdp)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 46 BACE's Motion to Quash; denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt; granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct her response in opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/28/16. (sem)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Certify Class; granting 17 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/9/2016. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Cleveland Ave Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hogan
Represented By: Andrew Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Ave Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Sharrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sharrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick Alkammo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?