Campbell Family Trust et al v. J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anne H Bradley, Jack Hornstein, Joseph Lipovich, Valderrama Family Trust, Casey Leblanc, Campbell Family Trust and Jacqueline Peiffer
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc.
Petitioner: SunAmerica Asset Management, LLC and SEI Investments Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv02923
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 127 MANDATE of USCA as to #106 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er)
March 31, 2020 Filing 126 USCA JUDGMENT It is ORDERED that the district courts grant of summaryjudgment in favor of J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. is AFFIRMED as to #106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jack Hornstein, Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Valderrama Family Trust, Jacqueline Peiffer, Casey Leblanc Note: Mandate to issue. (pb)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER of USCA as to #106 Notice of Appeal: The Government's leave to proceed as amicus is GRANTED. Note: No Mandate details noted. (er)
May 8, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust of Withdrawal of Daniel L. Sachs as Counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.4(d) (Meyer, David)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying without prejudice #122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/7/2018. (ew)
April 16, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Daniel L. Sachs by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Boyle, Michael)
April 9, 2018 NOTICE VACATING Settlement Conference (previously scheduled for 4/20/2018 at 9:30 a.m.). (mas)
March 23, 2018 Filing 121 REDACTION to 85 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),,,, Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Boyle, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Boyle, Michael) (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/26/2018) (er).
March 22, 2018 Filing 120 REDACTION to 90 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. Wilson, #2 Exhibit 61, #3 Exhibit 62, #4 Exhibit 63, #5 Exhibit 64, #6 Exhibit 65, #7 Exhibit 66, #8 Exhibit 67, #9 Exhibit 68, #10 Exhibit 69) (Boyle, Michael)
March 22, 2018 Filing 119 REDACTION to 88 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),,,,,,, Declaration of Michael Boyle in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67) (Boyle, Michael)
March 22, 2018 Filing 118 REDACTION to 87 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-23) (Boyle, Michael)
March 22, 2018 Filing 117 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] REDACTION to 87 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-23) (Boyle, Michael) Modified Docket Text on 3/22/2018 (bjc).
March 22, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #117 Redacted Document, this document was filed in error and removed per the request of the filer. A corrected version of the document will be filed. (bjc)
March 21, 2018 Filing 115 REDACTION to 81 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),,,,,,, Declaration of Matthew R. Wilson in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18-1, #19 Exhibit 18-2, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60) (Wilson, Matthew)
March 21, 2018 Filing 114 REDACTION to 80 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Appendix 1-7) (Wilson, Matthew)
March 16, 2018 Filing 113 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by J. P. Morgan Investment Management Inc. and JP Funds Management, Inc. Redacted Version of doc filed on 12/6/17. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David Declaration and Exhibit) (er)
March 16, 2018 Filing 112 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on, Count II of the Goodman Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. Redacted Version of doc filed on 12/6/17. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brown Declaration & Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Emmert Declaration & Exhibits) (er)
March 16, 2018 Filing 111 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants' J.P. Morgan Investment Management Inc and JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc. Redacted Version of doc filed on 11/16/17. (Attachments: #1 Appendix F and G, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sejal Ajmera, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Marian Connolly, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth David with Exhibits, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Rene M. Stulz with Exhibit) (er)
March 16, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Redacted Version of October 2, 2017 Motion to Dismiss Filed Under Seal by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. (Tigges, Steven)
March 16, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted Version of October 2, 2017 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Under Seal by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-E, #2 Affidavit Shlissel Declaration & Exhibits, #3 Affidavit David Declaration & Exhibits) (Tigges, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 108 USCA Case Number 18-3238 for #106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jack Hornstein, Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Valderrama Family Trust, Jacqueline Peiffer, Casey Leblanc. (pb)
March 15, 2018 Filing 107 USCA Case Number 18-3239 for #106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jack Hornstein, Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Valderrama Family Trust, Jacqueline Peiffer, Casey Leblanc. (pb)
March 13, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #104 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, #105 Clerk's Judgment (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number 0648-6355762) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the ORDER filed March 9, 2018, Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/9/2018. (mas)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION AND ORDER granting (106) Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot (110) Sealed Motion to Dismiss; granting (113) Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (123) Motion for Oral Argument ; granting (124) Sealed Motion to File Sur-Reply; granting (125) Sealed Motion to File Redacted Financial Documents and Partially Seal Filings; granting (126) Motion to Seal; granting (130) Motion to Join ; granting (131) Motion to Join ; granting (133) Motion for Leave to File Response in case 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ; granting (75) Motion to Dismiss; denying (79) Sealed Motion; granting (82) Sealed Motion; denying (92) Motion ; granting (93) Sealed Motion; granting (94) Sealed Motion; granting (95) Motion to Seal; granting (99) Motion ; granting (100) Motion ; granting (102) Motion for Leave to File Response in case 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/9/2018. (mas)
March 8, 2018 Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re (133 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 102 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Docket No. 132) filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
March 2, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Docket No. 132) ( Responses due by 3/23/2018) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Wilson, Matthew)
February 23, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. re (113 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 82 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All of Plaintiffs' Remaining Counts re (109 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed, (117 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 86 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, (122 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 91 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, (121 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 90 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, (111 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 80 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, (116 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 85 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),,,, Notice of Supplemental Authority Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
January 24, 2018 Filing 100 Non-Party Request for Joinder in Defendant JPMIM's Motion to Seal re (126 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) and Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Seal (129 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ), filed by Movant SunAmerica Asset Management, LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory N. Bressler, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (kpt)
January 24, 2018 Filing 99 Non-Party Request for Joinder in Defendant JPMIM's Motion to Seal re (126 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) and Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Seal (129 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ), filed by Movant SEI Investments Management Corporation. Responses due by 2/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron C. Buser, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (kpt)
January 24, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re (95 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ, 126 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Seal filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
January 10, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re (95 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) MOTION to Seal filed by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Wilson, Matthew)
January 4, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re (93 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ, 124 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION filed Defendants' Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File A Sur-Reply filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION to Seal ( Responses due by 1/10/2018) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sejal Ajmera, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Connelly, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Egert, #5 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Finn, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Shlissel, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Rene M. Stulz, #8 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Weeda, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth S. David and Exhibits - Part 1, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth S. David and Exhibits - Part 2, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth S. David and Exhibits - Part 3) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
December 6, 2017 Filing 92 Joint MOTION Request for Oral Argument on Dispositive Motions re (113 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All of Plaintiffs' Remaining Counts re (109 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed, (110 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION Dismiss Count II of Amended Complaint in Goodman, Case No. 2:14-cv-414, for lack of standing. re (109 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed ( Responses due by 12/27/2017) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time:Responses to 79 Sealed MOTION Dismiss Count II of Amended Complaint, 82 Sealed MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All of Plaintiffs' Remaining Counts due by 11/16/2017. Replies due by 12/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/18/2017. (ew)
October 18, 2017 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (113 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All of Plaintiffs' Remaining Counts re (109 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed, (110 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed MOTION Dismiss Count II of Amended Complaint in Goodman, Case No. 2:14-cv-414, for lack of standing. re (109 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed, (111 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Sealed Document (Attorney Filing),, New date requested 11/16/2017. ( Responses due by 11/8/2017) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Boyle, Michael)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #108 (in lead case 2:14-cv-414) Motion to File Dispositive Motions and subsequent briefings Under Seal. Motions to permanently seal due within 14 days of filing reply memoranda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/29/2017. (ew)
September 28, 2017 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Dispositive Motions and Exhibits Under Temporary Seal ( Responses due by 10/19/2017) by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Funds Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Temporarily Sealing Dispositive Motions) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Parsell, Stuart) Modified event type on 9/29/2017 (kdp). Modified event type on 9/29/2017 (ew).
September 19, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart G Parsell for Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Parsell, Stuart)
September 15, 2017 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Amended Complaint in Goodman et al. v. JPMorgan Investment Management et al. ( Responses due by 10/6/2017) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Wilson, Matthew)
July 14, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Ferrell, Bradley)
May 26, 2017 Filing 73 Joint Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/26/2017. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (dh1)
May 25, 2017 Filing 72 STIPULATION (Joint) re: Testimony of Certain Parties by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Boyle, Michael)
May 9, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Funds Management, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
April 28, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer of the Death of Plaintiff Jack Hornstein Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Boyle, Michael)
April 27, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. of Non-Party Document Subpoena of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Ferrell, Bradley)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting ((98) in case 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, (67) in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth S. David . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/23/2017. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (agm) Modified text on 3/23/2017 (agm).
March 22, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5889457) of Elizabeth S. David( Responses due by 4/12/2017) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven) Modified on 3/23/2017 (agm).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting (96 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 65 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Primary Expert due by 5/26/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/13/2017. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/20/2017. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (agm)
March 17, 2017 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/26/2017. OF EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER ( Responses due by 4/7/2017) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Ferrell, Bradley)
March 17, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman of Withdrawal of Jury Demand Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Boyle, Michael)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2018 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2018 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 6/11/2018 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/15/2017. (Attachment: FPTO Form) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (dh1)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims and Parties ( #92 in case 2:14-cv-00414; #61 in case 2:15-cv-02923). The Court orders Plaintiff Joseph Lipovich dismissed from the case; all claims asserted by Plaintiffs regarding, and on behalf of, the J.P. Morgan Strategic Income Opportunities Fund are dismissed; and all claims asserted by Plaintiff Jacqueline Peiffer regarding, and on behalf of, the JP Morgan Mid Cap Value Fund are dismissed, without prejudice to the claims asserted by other Plaintiffs with regard to the same fund. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/13/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (dh1)
December 12, 2016 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims and Parties by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilson, Matthew)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART (58 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ, 89 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants are granted until 11/29/2016 to complete their document production. Discovery due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/2/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (pes)
August 24, 2016 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re (58 in 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ, 89 in 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/21/2017. OF THE PRETRIAL DATES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust, Nancy Goodman, Jacqueline Peiffer. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Wilson, Matthew)
August 24, 2016 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/21/2017. OF THE PRETRIAL DATES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER ( Responses due by 9/19/2016) by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Funds Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-KAJ, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-KAJ (Tigges, Steven)
August 23, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/6/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/11/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Status Report on mediation due by 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/18/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (pes)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting (84) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Brown in case 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/11/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (pes)
July 11, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Brown (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5569772)( Responses due by 8/4/2016) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (Ferrell, Bradley)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DISCOVER CONFERENCE ORDER. Status Conference set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/9/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (pes)
June 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Discovery Conference held on 6/9/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (NMK)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Report on the status of mediation due by 7/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/2/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-EAS-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-EAS-NMK (pes)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Judge Gregory L Frost no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 4/29/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 5, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Merger by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Funds Management, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (Ferrell, Bradley) Modified on 4/5/2016 to correct text (kk)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting (77) Motion for Order Applying the Court's February 26, 2016 Opinion and Order in Campbell to the Pending Claims in Goodman. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 3/14/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (kk)
March 11, 2016 Filing 47 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER APPLYING THE COURTS FEBRUARY 26, 2016 OPINION AND ORDER IN CAMPBELL TO THE PENDING CLAIMS IN GOODMAN re (75 in 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, ( Responses due by 4/4/2016) by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Funds Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (Ferrell, Bradley)
March 11, 2016 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc. (Ferrell, Bradley)
March 3, 2016 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Primary Expert due by 4/14/2017. Incorrect date of 4/4/2017 was set by the Clerk when the continued preliminary pretrial order was docketed. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (kk)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONTINUED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER. Discovery due by 8/31/2017. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2017. Final Pretrial Conference ready by 1/1/2018. Motions to Amend due by 3/28/2016. Primary Expert due by 4/14/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/15/2017. Report on timing and vehicle for mediation due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/2/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (pes) Modified on 3/3/2016 to correct primary expert due date (kk)
March 2, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2016. (NMK)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (32) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 2/26/2016. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK, 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK (kk)
February 25, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Attorney Withdrawal (Chen, David)
February 18, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 2/18/16. (kn)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order The Order of Reassignment issued by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/11/16 is recalled and this case will remain assigned to Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (sem)
February 3, 2016 Filing 39 RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Wilson, Matthew)
February 1, 2016 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tigges, Steven)
January 14, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Wilson, Matthew)
January 8, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 2:14-cv-414 filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ferrell, Bradley)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING (65 in 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK), (34 in 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Response to Motion to Consolidate due by 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/23/2015. (pes)
December 23, 2015 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/8/2016. by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 1/19/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Tigges, Steven)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. & JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc.: Non-Oral Hearing set for 2/5/2016 @ 8:00am before Judge Gregory L. Frost. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 12/22/2015. (kk)
December 21, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 1/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Tigges, Steven)
December 21, 2015 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.. (Tigges, Steven)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/8/2016. Motions or stipulations for leave to amend the pleadings due within thirty (30) days following the resolution ofany motion to dismiss or April 15, 2016, whichever is later. The Court will conduct a continued preliminary pretrial conference following resolution of the Motion to Consolidate in 2:14-cv-414. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/17/2015. (pes)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ana M. Cabassa-Torres. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/17/2015. (pes)
December 17, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ana M, Cabassa-Torres (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5315225) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2015. (NMK)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 , #24 , #25 and #26 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robin F. Zwerling, Jeffrey C. Zwerling, Susan Salvetti, and Andrew W. Robertson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/16/2015. (pes)
December 16, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Robertson (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5313703) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 16, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan Salvetti (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5313697) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 16, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Zwerling (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5313685) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 16, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robin F. Zwerling (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5313677) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re (20 in 2:15-cv-02923-GLF-NMK) Motion to Consolidate Cases & (61 in 2:14-cv-00414-GLF-NMK) Motion to Consolidate Cases: Non-Oral Hearing set for 1/25/2016 @ 8:00am before Judge Gregory L. Frost. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 12/11/2015. (kk)
December 10, 2015 Filing 21 RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. (Wilson, Matthew)
December 10, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 2:14-cv-414 by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust. Responses due by 1/4/2016 (Wilson, Matthew)
December 4, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 12/17/2015 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr)
December 3, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 12/15/2015 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Valerie A. Haggans and Tsz Ting Tam. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/30/2015. (pes)
November 30, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Valerie A. Haggans and Tsz Ting Tam (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0648-5292282) by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/24/2015 (Tigges, Steven)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holland, Michael K. Isenman, and David Y. Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/23/2015. (pes)
November 23, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holland, Michael K. Isenman, and David Yiding Chen (Filing fee $ 600, receipt number 25OHNH9G) by Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/17/2015 (Tigges, Steven)
November 3, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2015 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr)
October 29, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Ferrell for Defendants J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Ferrell, Bradley)
October 28, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anne H Bradley, Campbell Family Trust, Jack Hornstein, Casey Leblanc, Joseph Lipovich, Jacqueline Peiffer, Valderrama Family Trust re #1 Complaint,, of Omitted Document [Exhibit A to the Complaint] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boyle, Michael)
October 27, 2015 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 10/20/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Boyle, Michael)
October 27, 2015 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc. on 10/20/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Boyle, Michael)
October 27, 2015 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. on 10/20/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Boyle, Michael)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:14-cv-414 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Gregory L. Frost for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 10/20/2015. (sr)
October 19, 2015 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc. & JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (er)
October 16, 2015 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Boyle, Michael)
October 16, 2015 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Boyle, Michael)
October 16, 2015 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Boyle, Michael)
October 16, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons. (sr)
October 16, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc., JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5244463), filed by Joseph Lipovich, Anne H Bradley, Jack Hornstein, Campbell Family Trust, Casey Leblanc, Valderrama Family Trust, Jacqueline Peiffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form JP Morgan Investment Management, #3 Summons Form JP Morgan Funds Management, #4 Summons Form JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.) (Boyle, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell Family Trust et al v. J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne H Bradley
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hornstein
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lipovich
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valderrama Family Trust
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Leblanc
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell Family Trust
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Peiffer
Represented By: Ana M. Cabassa-Torres
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Susan Salvetti
Represented By: Andrew W. Robertson
Represented By: Robin F Zwerling
Represented By: Jeffrey C Zwerling
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SunAmerica Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SEI Investments Management Corporation
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Investment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. David
Represented By: Mark Holland
Represented By: David Y. Chen
Represented By: Valeria A. Haggans
Represented By: Tsz Ting Tam
Represented By: Stuart G Parsell
Represented By: Charles A. Brown
Represented By: Steven Walter Tigges
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Ferrell
Represented By: Michael K Isenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Holland
Represented By: David Y. Chen
Represented By: Valeria A. Haggans
Represented By: Tsz Ting Tam
Represented By: Stuart G Parsell
Represented By: Steven Walter Tigges
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Ferrell
Represented By: Michael K Isenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Funds Management, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Holland
Represented By: David Y. Chen
Represented By: Valeria A. Haggans
Represented By: Tsz Ting Tam
Represented By: Stuart G Parsell
Represented By: Steven Walter Tigges
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Ferrell
Represented By: Michael K Isenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?