Myers et al v. Marietta Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Lynnett Myers, Carol Butler and Arva Lowther
Defendant: Marietta Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 2:2015cv02956
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: MEIGS
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 249 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Myers & Butler (17-CV-438), Weckbacher (16-CV-1187), and Booth (17-CV-439)have sufficient relationship that the elements of Rule 42 are met and are consolidated. Myers, et al (15-CV-2956) is not consolidated. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/3/2019. (cw)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying 176 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/27/2019. (cw)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying 219 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 224 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/12/2019. (cw)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER denying without prejudice 132 Defendants' Motion to Decertify; granting 152 Motion to Stay or Deny Decertification. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/23/2018. (cw)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 108 Motion to Dismiss Melinda Johnson as a Plaintiff. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs' counsel to provide a copy of this Order to Ms. Johnson and to file proof, in the form of an email reply or certified mail return, that Ms. Johnson has received it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/11/2018. (kpt)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Certify Class; the parties are to submit a joint proposed opt-out notice within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 09/11/2017. (cw)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/20/2017. (cw)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 37 Motion to Stay; granting 6 Motion to Certify Class. The Court ORDERS the parties to confer as to the proper form of the notice and opt-in consent form and submit to the Court a proposed notice and consent form and plan for their distribution within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, and in the alternative, to notify the Court by that date of any disputes as to the language or distribution of the notice and opt-in consent form. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/17/2016. (cw)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - re 36 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Arva Lowther, Carol Butler, Lynnett Myers, 6 Motion to Certify Class, filed by Arva Lowther, Carol Butler, Lynnett Myers, 37 Motion to Stay filed by Arva Lowther, Carol Butler, Lynnett Myers ( In Court Hearing set for 8/12/2016 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/20/16. (kn)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel; granting 30 Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply. Plaintiffs shall provide dates for their depositions within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/7/2016. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers et al v. Marietta Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnett Myers
Represented By: Lance Chapin
Represented By: Marcy J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Butler
Represented By: Lance Chapin
Represented By: Marcy J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arva Lowther
Represented By: Lance Chapin
Represented By: Marcy J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marietta Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?