Research Institute At Nationwide Children's Hospital v. Trellis Bioscience, LLC
Plaintiff: Research Institute At Nationwide Children's Hospital
Defendant: Trellis Bioscience, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv03032
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 AGREED ENTRY OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/18/2017. (dh1)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons outlined, RINCH's Motion is GRANTED (ECF Nos. 79 and 83). The Clerk is DIRECTED to file RINCH's Amended Complaint attached to its Motion as Exhibit A PUBLICLY(ECF No. 79-1), and Exhibits B through H of its sealed Motion UNDER SEAL (ECF Nos. 83-1--7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/26/2017. (agm) Modified text on 4/26/2017 (agm). Modified on 4/26/2017 (agm).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER denying 23 , 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/30/2016. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Research Institute At Nationwide Children's Hospital v. Trellis Bioscience, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Research Institute At Nationwide Children's Hospital
Represented By: Jeanne Marie Gills
Represented By: Michael Robert Houston
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Richard Spencer Montei
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trellis Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn D Duvall
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Represented By: Michelle S Rhyu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?