Lindsey et al v. Tire Discounters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin Lindsey and Matthew Titus
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv03065
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Gregory L. Frost
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 68 Defendant's Motion to Decertify ; denying 69 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class; denying 79 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 80 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying 95 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 12/1/17. (sem)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer regarding the portion of the Motion dealing with written spiffs; and as to the portion of the motion dealing with the alarm data, Plaintiff s are DIRECTED to submit via email any evidence detailing how the data sought is consistent and/or accurate enough to justify additional discovery within seven days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/3/2017. (ew) Modified docket text on 5/4/2017 (ew).
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - re 20 Stipulation filed by Justin Lindsey, Matthew Titus. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 3/1/16. (kn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey et al v. Tire Discounters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lindsey
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Drew T Legando
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Represented By: Susan H Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Titus
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Drew T Legando
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Represented By: Susan H Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Represented By: Colleen P Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?