Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Rings et al
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Judy Rings, Chase Lee and Executor of the Estate of Teresa Lee Rings
Case Number: 2:2016cv00149
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion ECF No. 64 is DENIED. In addition, Plaintiff's request for leave to file a supplemental motion for attorneys' fees following resolution of the pending appeal is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/14/2018. (daf)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 44 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds in an Interest-Bearing Account, Injunction, and Dismissal of Plainitff with Prejudice and GRANTING 56 Judy Rings' Motion for Summary J udgment. The Court DISMISSES the counterclaims of Chase Lee and Estate of Teresa Lee Rings and ORDERS Minnesota Life Insurance Company to deposit the full amount of the death benefits from the two subject life insurance policies together with the interest specified in the policies, to be paid by the Clerk of Courts to counsel for Judy Rings. This action is CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/7/2017. (kdp)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER granting 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Judy Rings, and denying 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Executor of the Estate of Teresa Lee Rings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/7/2017. (agm)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 7/18/2016. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Rings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett K Bacon
Represented By: Jennifer L. Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Rings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executor of the Estate of Teresa Lee Rings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?