Hughes et al v. City of Dublin et al
Petitioner: James Hughes and James Bott
Respondent: City of Dublin, Ohio Department Of Public Safety, Corrie Bott and John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv00153
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/16/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Bott, James Hughes be denied and that Plaintiffs be given a reasonable amount of time, not to exceed 21 days, to submit the necessary filing fee. It i s further recommended that if they do not, the case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/15/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - If Petitioners wish to have the Court act on the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, they must (1) for Mr. Hughes, submit a revised application which provides dollar amounts in response to the key questions - income (that is, money ) received from any source in the last twelve months, assets (including cash, in the form of United States currency, on hand), and liabilities, and (2) for Mr. Bott, submit a signed application which does the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/29/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. City of Dublin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Bott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Dublin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ohio Department Of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corrie Bott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?