Ball et al v. Kasich et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Ball, Antonio Butler, Caryl Mason, Richard Walters, Nathan Narowitz, Ross Hamilton and The Ability Center of Greater Toledo
Defendant: John Kasich, John Martin, John McCarthy and Kevin Miller
Case Number: 2:2016cv00282
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: HIGHLAND
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 OPINION AND ORDER granting ECF No. 478 Joint Motion for Rule 54(b) Certification. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/6/2020. (cmw)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting 413 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/8/2020. (cmw)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 OPINION AND ORDER - The Court GRANTS ECF No. 454 Joint Motion for Final Approval of the Proposed Class Action Settlement Agreement and APPROVES the Modified Settlement Agreement docketed at ECF No. [466-1]. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 4/24/2020. (cmw)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting 325 Motion to Join Additional Parties. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/17/2018. (plb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER denying 344 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/7/2018. (plb)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 370 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 345 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/29/2018. (sln)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER DENYING Disability Rights Ohio's Request for Urgent Consideration of a Motion made in its Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/17/2018. (plb)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER - Memorializing Clarification of Class Definition. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/25/2018. (plb)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER denying 310 Expedited Motion of Amicus Curie Ohio Provider Resource Association ("OPRA") to Participate in Settlement participate in settlement. The Court DENIES OPRA's request to participate in the settlement negotiations. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/29/2018. (cmw)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/30/2018. (mas)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OPINION AND ORDER granting 276 Plaintiffs' Motion to Include Supplemental Evidence and a Revised, Proposed Class Definition in Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/19/2017. (dh1)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 OPINION AND ORDER granting 270 Defendants' and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Leave, Instanter, to File Brief with Redactions and Deposition Transcripts Under Seal. Defendants may file the redacted portions of the exhibits and deposition transcripts with their Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. The Clerk is directed to permit Defendants to file the un-redacted exhibits and deposition transcripts under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 08/17/2017. (dh1)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 OPINION AND ORDER granting 68 the Ohio Association of County Board's Motion to Intervene ; granting 107 the Guardians' Motion to Intervene; denying as moot 145 the Guardians' Motion for Oral Argument; granting 164 VOR's M otion to File an Amicus Brief; and granting the Additional Guardians' Motion to Join the Guardians' Motion to Intervene: 123 , 125 , 126 , 127 , 128 , 129 , 138 , 139 , 141 , 142 , 143 , 144 , 146 , 147 , [148[, 152 , 153 , 155 160 , 161 , 166 , 167 168 , 169 , 170 , 171 , 172 , 173 , 174 , 175 , 176 , 177 , 182 , 183 , 184 , 185 , 186 , 192 , 193 , 194 , 195 , 196 , 197 , 198 , 199 , 200 , 201 , 202 , 203 , 204 , 205 , 206 , [ 207], 208 , 209 , 210 , 211 , 212 , 213 , 214 , 215 , 216 , 217 , 218 , 219 , 220 , 223 , 224 , 225 , [226[, 227 , 228 , 229 , 230 , 231 , 232 , 234 , 235 , 236 , 237 , 238 , 239 , 240 , 241 , 243 , 244 , 245 ,[247 ], 248 , 249 , 251 , 252 , 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , 258 , 259 , 260 . The Clerk is directed to file the Ohio Association of County Board's Answer that is currently filed as Exhibit A to its Motion to Intervene [68-1] and is dire cted to file VOR's brief [164-1] and title the docket entry "VOR's Amicus Brief in Support of the Guardian's Motion to Intervene.". Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/24/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Quash Subpoena and hereby SQUASHES the subpoena issued on behalf of DODD to obtain the medical records of putative class member Nathan Narowitz. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/10/2017. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 92 Defendants' Motion to Expedite Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. The Court's Opinion and Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 91 is vacated. Upon completion of the briefing schedule set by Magistrate Judge Deavers on 04/07/17, the Court will reconsider Plaintiffs' currently pending Motion for Class Certification 42 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 04/12/2017. (dh1)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Class Certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(a) and 23(b)(2). The Court designates Disability Rights Ohio, Sidley Austin, LLP, Samuel Bagenstos, and the Center for Public Representation as co-class counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/27/17. (dh1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Defendant Kevin Miller's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 28 Defendant John Kasich's Motion to Dismiss; and denying 27 Defendants John McCarthy's and John Martin's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/23/2017. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball et al v. Kasich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Ball
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Butler
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Mason
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Walters
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Narowitz
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Hamilton
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ability Center of Greater Toledo
Represented By: Cathy E Costanzo
Represented By: Neil R. Ellis
Represented By: Anna M Krieger
Represented By: Alison A. McKay
Represented By: Kristen E Rau
Represented By: Kathryn Lesley Rucker
Represented By: Kerstin Sjoberg-Witt
Represented By: Kevin J Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Martin
Represented By: Larry Holliday James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCarthy
Represented By: Jeffrey Jarosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Jarosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?