A. Philip Randolph Institute et al v. Husted Featured Case
Plaintiff: A. Philip Randolph Institute and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless
Defendant: Jon Husted
Case Number: 2:2016cv00303
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Filing 119 Notice from Supreme Court of the United States. The petition for a writ of certiorari was granted on 5/30/17. (sct) Modified text on 6/1/2017 (sem).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/31/2017. (agm)
May 31, 2017 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Stay Remedy Proceedings by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Voigt, Steven)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/26/2017. (er)
May 23, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
May 22, 2017 Filing 113 MOTION to Exclude Initial Expert Report of Donald Palmer and Motion In Limine to Exclude His Testimony by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Initial Expert Report of Donald Palmer, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Excerpts from Deposition of Donald Palmer, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Curriculum Vitae of Donald Palmer, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Declarations Relied On) (Awan, Naila)
May 22, 2017 Filing 112 MOTION to Exclude the Report of Daniel Smith by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Smith Report, # 2 Exhibit B Pages from Smith Deposition Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C Matthew Walsh Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D Pages from Damschroder Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E Palmer Report, # 6 Exhibit F Smith Engagement Letter, # 7 Exhibit G Email (2017 04 14), # 8 Exhibit H Email (2017 05 08), # 9 Exhibit I Email (2016 12 06), # 10 Exhibit J Email (2016 12 21), # 11 Exhibit K Email (2017 01 30), # 12 Exhibit L Tweet, # 13 Text of Proposed Order) (Voigt, Steven)
April 27, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of Withdraw as Attorney of Kevin Hulick by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) Modified text and terminated motion on 5/1/2017 (jlk).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 107 Motion Joint Motion for Further Relief. Ohio Secretary of State Jon Husted is authorized to issue the Directive. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/24/2017. (agm)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 108 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions. Daubert Motions due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/24/2017. (agm)
April 21, 2017 Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/22/2017. Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
April 18, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION Further Relief Joint Motion for Further Relief by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Directive, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Voigt, Steven)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEEMNT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/13/17. (sem)
April 12, 2017 Filing 105 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER submitted by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) Modified text on 4/13/2017 (sem).
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/5/2017. (sln)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/5/2017. (agm)
April 3, 2017 Filing 102 Proposed STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. (agm)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 3/27/2017. (agm)
March 27, 2017 Filing 100 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
March 8, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Jon Husted. (Berman, Jordan)
February 13, 2017 Filing 98 Notice from Supreme Court of the United States. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 2/3/17 and placed on the docket on 2/8/17 as case number 16-980. (pb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Reports, if any, due by 3/15/2017; Rebuttal Expert Reports, if any, due by 4/14/2017; Discovery due by 5/1/2017; Daubert Motions due by 5/15/2017; Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunction due by 6/15/2017 - Defendant's Brief in Opposition due by 7/18/2017 - Plaintiff's Reply in Support due by 7/25/2017. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/6/2017. (kk)
January 4, 2017 Filing 96 JOINT MOTION to Update the Scheduling Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) Modified event and text on 1/5/2017 (er).
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion for Further Relief. Ohio Secretary of State Jon Husted is authorized to issue the Directive. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 11/21/2016. (kk)
November 18, 2016 Filing 94 Joint MOTION Further Relief by Defendant Jon Husted. Responses due by 12/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Draft Directive, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Voigt, Steven)
November 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER that the Ohio Secretary of State shall issue a directive regarding the absentee ballot requests of military and overseas voters. Signed by George C. Smith on November 5, 2016. (smr)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Joint Motion for Further Relief. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 10/25/16. (sem)
October 24, 2016 Filing 91 Joint MOTION Further Relief Authorization to Issue Directive by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 11/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Directive, # 2 Exhibit SOS Form 11-I-2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
October 20, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE by Defendant Jon Husted re 89 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for TRO,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Withdraw,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Notice of Issuance of Directive Pursuant to Court Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Directive 2016-39) (Voigt, Steven)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Defendant's Motion to Implement Remedy; granting in part and denying in part 74 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO; granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; finding as moot 86 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw and/or Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 10/19/2016. (smr)
October 18, 2016 Filing 88 Reply re 84 Notice (Other) Memorandum in Response to the United States of America's Statement of Interest by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
October 18, 2016 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Implement Remedy The Secretary's Reply in Support of the Secretary's Proposed Directive filed by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
October 18, 2016 Filing 86 First MOTION to Withdraw 82 Reply to Response to Motion , First MOTION for Reconsideration re 85 Order on Motion to Strike by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs filed a Reply in Support of their Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant has moved to strike that reply, or in the alternative, to be permitted to file a reply. Plaintiffs' Reply will not be stricken and Defendant shall have until 5 p.m. October 18, 2016 to file a reply. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 10/18/2016. (smr)
October 17, 2016 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Amicus Ohio Democratic Party. Responses due by 11/10/2016 SEE DOCKET # 78 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Motion for Leave to File Document." The filing was originally misfiled by counsel as a Brief. (kk)
October 17, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE by Interested Party United States of America of Statement of Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Horwitz, Matthew)
October 17, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION to Strike 82 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Jon Husted. Responses due by 11/10/2016 (Voigt, Steven)
October 17, 2016 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
October 17, 2016 Filing 81 Response in Opposition re 78 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Memorandum in Opposition to the Ohio Democratic Party's Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) Modified on 10/18/2016 to correct text & add doc link (kk).
October 17, 2016 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Damschroder Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Directive 2015-02, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - SOS 9/29/15 Press Release, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Masich Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - Shubat Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F - Directive 2016-37, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G - Billing Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. H - Controlling Board Submission, # 9 Exhibit Ex. I - Controlling Board Schedule, # 10 Exhibit Ex. J - Controlling Board Manual, # 11 Exhibit Ex. K - McDonald Declaration) (Voigt, Steven)
October 17, 2016 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Implement Remedy filed by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Tayala) (Awan, Naila)
October 17, 2016 Filing 78 **SEE 10/17/2016 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - BRIEF re 72 MOTION to Implement Remedy , 74 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Amicus Ohio Democratic Party. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Amicus Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Clinger, Derek) Modified on 10/18/2016 (kk).
October 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 72 MOTION to Implement Remedy & 74 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause - Responses due by 1:00pm on 10/17/2016 (kk)
October 14, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Defendant Jon Husted of Compliance with Court Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Directive 2016-37) (Voigt, Steven)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER -- Responsive briefs shall be filed on or before October 17, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 10/14/2016. (smr)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Heather L. Buchanan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/14/2016. (mas)
October 13, 2016 Filing 74 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 11/7/2016 [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Awan, Naila)
October 13, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number waived) of Heather L. Buchanan by Defendant Jon Husted. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Heather Buchanan-Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B Buchanan Affidavit) (Voigt, Steven)
October 13, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION to Implement Remedy by Defendant Jon Husted. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Directive) (Voigt, Steven)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal: Appellant's motion to expedite the issuance of the mandate is GRANTED. Note: No Mandate details noted. (er)
October 4, 2016 Filing 70 MANDATE of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 USCA OPINION AND JUDGMENT as to 68 Notice of Appeal: The Sixth Circuit Reverses the District Court's judgment and Remands the matter for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Note: Mandate to issue. (er)
September 23, 2016 USCA Case Number 16-3746 for 68 Notice of Appeal, filed by A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (er)
June 30, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 67 Clerk's Judgment, 66 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0648-5558561. Appeal Record due by 7/14/2016. (Awan, Naila)
June 29, 2016 Filing 67 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Jon Husted against A. Philip Randolph Institute. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 6/29/16. (lvw)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 9 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/29/16. (lvw)
June 29, 2016 Filing 65 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Secretary of State Directive 2015-09) (Voigt, Steven)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - The Exhibits to Document 63, and any reference thereto, are hereby STRICKEN as irrelevant. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/27/16. (lvw)
June 24, 2016 Filing 63 BRIEF re 62 Notice (Other), by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lvw).
June 24, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE by Defendant Jon Husted The Secretary's Position Statement Regarding the Procedural Posture of this Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Briefing Schedule, Obergefell v. Kasich, # 2 Exhibit B Briefing Schedule, Henry v. Wymyslo, # 3 Exhibit C Scheduling Order & Entry, NAACP v. Husted) (Voigt, Steven)
June 20, 2016 Filing 61 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc. (mas)
June 20, 2016 Filing 60 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation. (mas)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 54 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/20/2016. (mas)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris Fedeli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/20/2016. (mas)
June 17, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
June 17, 2016 Filing 56 BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Voigt, Steven)
June 17, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris Fedeli (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5541010) by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David)
June 17, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae of Judicial Watch, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Judicial Watch) (Langdon, David)
June 15, 2016 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2016. All parties were in attendance. (lvw)
June 10, 2016 Filing 52 BRIEF re 38 Brief, by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
June 10, 2016 Filing 51 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Purportedly Undisputed Material Facts by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
June 10, 2016 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Kidd, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Filing 49 BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (Voigt, Steven)
June 10, 2016 Filing 48 ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint filed by Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/26/2016. (sln)
May 25, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
May 24, 2016 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction Declaration of Cameron Bell (Unsealed) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T) (Awan, Naila)
May 24, 2016 Filing 41 STIPULATION Joint Proposed Stipulation of Facts and Stipulations af Authenticity, Admissibility, and Preserved Objections by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
May 24, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Awan, Naila)
May 24, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 6/10/2016 Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andre Washington, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Angaletta Pickett, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Delores Freeman, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Bonham, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of KaRon Waites, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Larry Harmon, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Chad McCullough, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa Keil, # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
May 24, 2016 Filing 38 BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 12/9/1994 Cancellation of Voter Reg., # 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Matthew Damschroder, # 3 Exhibit C Declaration of Pat Wolfe, # 4 Exhibit D 11/10/14 Settlement Agree., # 5 Exhibit E Geographic Rates 1948-2015, # 6 Exhibit F USPS Infor., # 7 Exhibit G 5/2009 Brunner Directive, # 8 Exhibit H Graph, # 9 Exhibit I National Voter Registration Act 1993, # 10 Exhibit J PEW Article, # 11 Exhibit K OH Election Summit 2008-2009, # 12 Exhibit L Declaration of Karla Herron, # 13 Exhibit M Transcript 3/21/16 ALM, # 14 Exhibit N - Part 1Report of Committee on Rules 1993, # 15 Exhibit N - Part 2 H927412/12/01, # 16 Exhibit O /reoirt ib Oribken 1995-1996, # 17 Exhibit P Implementation 1993, # 18 Exhibit Q Voter Registration Appl., # 19 Exhibit R FAQ's (Voigt, Steven) Modified on 6/21/2016 (lvw)to name exhibits.
May 17, 2016 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Jon Husted, filed by A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless, Larry Harmon. (Awan, Naila)
May 13, 2016 Reset Deadlines: All Fact Discovery due by 5/20/2016. Opening Briefs due by 5/24/2016. Opposition Briefs due by 6/10/2016. Reply Briefs due by 6/17/2016. (sln)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/13/2016. (sln) Modified on 5/14/2016 (lvw).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/13/2016. (sln) Modified on 5/14/2016 (lvw).
May 12, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
May 12, 2016 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) Modified ECF event on 5/13/2016 (sln).
May 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Settlement Conference held on 5/3/2016. (Court Reporter: Denise Errett) (sln)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/2/2016. (sln)
May 2, 2016 Filing 31 STIPULATION [Proposed] Joint Stipulation and Protective Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cameron Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/2/2016. (mas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION Renewal of Pro Hac Motion for Cameron Bell re 14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/23/2016 (Awan, Naila)
April 29, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2016 01:30 PM in Chambers, Room 301, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers. (sln)
April 28, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 4/28/2016. (sln)
April 28, 2016 Filing 27 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven)
April 27, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/28/2016 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
April 26, 2016 Filing 25 Transcript of Proceedings of end of Settlement Conference held on April 14, 2016, before Judge Magistrate-Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina L. Wells, Telephone number 614-719-3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 5/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2016. (Wells, Gina) (jr).
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Tokaji. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/26/2016. (mas)
April 25, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Tokaji (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5472482) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/19/2016 (Awan, Naila)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER memorializing the 4/14/16 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/15/16. (sem)
April 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Settlement Conference held on 4/14/2016. (sln)
April 13, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Hulick for Defendant Jon Husted (Hulick, Kevin)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/12/2016. (mas)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court orders counsel for the parties and a representative with settlement authority from each of the respective parties participate in a mediation with Magistrate Judge Deavers on 04/14/16 at 10:00 a.m. The Informal Preliminary Conference scheduled for 04/12/16 at 11:00 a.m. via telephone is vacated and will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge George C. Smith, Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr., and Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/11/2016. (dh1)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/11/16. (lvw)
April 11, 2016 Filing 17 Response re 15 Response (non motion) Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
April 11, 2016 Filing 16 STIPULATION and Order Filed Jointly by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) (Voigt, Steven)
April 8, 2016 Filing 15 Response re 2 Notice (Other) of Related Case by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Voigt, Steven)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cameron Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/8/2016. (mas)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stuart C. Naifeh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/8/2016. (mas)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Conference 4/12/16 at 11:00 a.m. via telephone.. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/8/16. (lvw)
April 7, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cameron Bell (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5452491) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/2/2016 (Awan, Naila)
April 7, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stuart C. Naifeh (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5452484) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/2/2016 (Awan, Naila)
April 7, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/2/2016 [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cameron Bell, # 2 Declaration of KaRon Waites, Jr., # 3 Declaration of Brian Davis, # 4 Declaration of Larry Harmon, # 5 Declaration of Chad McCullough, # 6 Declaration of Lisa Keil, # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
April 7, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Berman for Defendant Jon Husted (Berman, Jordan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T Voigt for Defendant Jon Husted (Voigt, Steven)
April 7, 2016 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jon Husted on 4/6/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Awan, Naila)
April 6, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jon Husted. (lvw)
April 6, 2016 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila)
April 6, 2016 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Awan, Naila)
April 6, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless of Related Case (Awan, Naila)
April 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jon Husted ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5449725), filed by A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Form) (Awan, Naila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. Philip Randolph Institute et al v. Husted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Cameron Bell
Represented By: Freda J Levenson
Represented By: Paul Frederick Moke
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Richard Burt Saphire
Represented By: Daniel P Tokaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Cameron Bell
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Daniel P Tokaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Husted
Represented By: Jordan S. Berman
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Steven T Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?