Commerce and Industry Insurance Company v. Century Surety Company
Plaintiff: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00320
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER allocating cost of litigation between the parties pursuant to 51 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); 52 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/22/2019. (cw)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. GRANTING Centurys Motion for Summary Judgment as to the cost of defending Weston and DENYING C&Is Motion for Summary Judgment as to the same. GRANTING Centurys Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING C&Is Motion for Summary Judgment as to the cost of defending Mr. Lind. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/19/2018. (cw)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION and ORDER addressing the discovery disputes; Discovery Deadline is extended to 4/28/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/10/17. (sem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company v. Century Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Represented By: Richard H. Nicolaides, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Sorem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Richard M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?