McQueen v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: John McQueen
Defendant: Lynn Fisher and Carolyn Einloth
Case Number: 2:2016cv00344
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: MARION
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION and ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 2/7/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 in that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE against Defendant Einloth. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 12/14/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that the this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE against Defendant Einloth pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to timely effect service of process. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/6/2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 11 Motion for Default Judgment; overruling 18 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order; denying 19 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/6/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Einloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?