Bennett v. APG Media of Ohio, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bennett and Patricia Bennett
Defendant: APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie and Dustin Magill
Case Number: 2:2016cv00353
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: PICKAWAY
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/3/2018. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 36 Consent MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. (Mueller, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #34 Order (7009 2820 0003 5798 2431). (jlk)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2019 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Jury Trial set for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed #32 Order was sent via certified mail. 7009 2820 0003 5798 3568. (jlk)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because neither party moved for summary judgment on APG Media, Mr. Magill, and Ms. Gillespies counterclaims, the counterclaims remain pending. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/27/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 26, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel (Farrell, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. (Mueller, John)
February 20, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Patricia Bennett. (jlk) (jlk).
February 20, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Copyright Claims by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Mueller, #2 Exhibit A-CH Spinners, #3 Exhibit B- CH Teets, #4 Exhibit C- PNG Spinners, #5 Exhibit D- PNG teets, #6 Exhibit E- Requests for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit F- Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit G- Computer Printouts, #9 Exhibit H- Third Draft of the CH Teets article) (Mueller, John)
January 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 1/18/2018. (sln)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed on or before 2/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 18, 2018. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The telephonic status conference previously scheduled for February 18, 2018 (ECF No. 25) is RESCHEDULED to JANUARY 18, 2018, at 3:30 PM EST. The parties are directed to call 614-719-3460 to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 12, 2018. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/18/2018 03:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified date of conf. on 1/15/2018 (er).
February 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 2/28/2017. Plaintiff will proceed pro se. Advised of obligations to comply with FRCP and Local Rules. (sln)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew James Schonauer and Jeffrey S Standley terminated. Additionally, the parties are to TAKE NOTICE that this matter is hereby scheduled for a telephonic status conference on TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 28, at 2:30 p.m. EDT. The parties are DIRECTED to call (614) 719-3460. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to call in to the conference on her own behalf or via new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/7/2017. (agm)
February 7, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/28/2017 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (agm)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorneys Schonauer and Stanley are DIRECTED to SUBMIT their affidavit in support of their Motion to Withdraw as Attorney directly to the Magistrate Judge's chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/2/2017. (mas)
February 1, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Patricia Bennett, Counter Defendant Patricia Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew J. Schonauer, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Standley) (Schonauer, Matthew)
January 13, 2017 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Counterclaim, filed by Patricia Bennett. (Schonauer, Matthew)
December 30, 2016 Filing 20 COUNTERCLAIM against Patricia Bennett, filed by Sarah Gillespie, APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Dustin Magill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - APG Urgent Care Photo in Circleville Herald, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - APG Urgent Care Photo on pickawaynewsjournal.com, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - APG Urgent Care Photo Copyright Registration) (Mueller, John)
November 7, 2016 Filing 19 Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Christopher M. Ernst to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 12/12/2016 at 10:30 AM. (sln)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/30/2016 to Amend Pleadings and File Counter-Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/3/2016. (sln)
November 3, 2016 ReSet Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2016. (sln)
November 2, 2016 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #14 Preliminary Pretrial Order, New date requested 12/30/2016. Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and File Counter-Claims by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. Responses due by 11/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and File Counter-Claims) (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Counsel to email the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, Sherry Nichols, at Sherry_Nichols@ohsd.uscourts.gov by November 3, 2016 to advise her if this case should not be set for the December 2016 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/27/2016. (sln)
August 23, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Mueller for Defendant APG Media of Ohio, LLC (Mueller, John)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December 2016 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 11/3/2016. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 8/30/2016. Primary Expert due by 3/30/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/27/2017. Discovery due by 6/1/2017. Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2017. Final Pretrial Conference ready by 1/1/2018. Settlement Week due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/17/2016. (mas)
August 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers:Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/16/2016. (sln)
August 9, 2016 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Patricia Bennett. (Schonauer, Matthew)
July 27, 2016 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant APG Media of Ohio, LLC. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
July 18, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Farrell for Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill (Farrell, Michael)
July 6, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2016 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 5, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
June 28, 2016 Reset Deadline: Answer due by 7/8/2016 as to all Defendants. (sln)
June 27, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time to Move or Pleae by Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
June 27, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Hilsheimer for Defendants APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
May 20, 2016 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Sarah Gillespie on 4/21/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. (Schonauer, Matthew)
May 20, 2016 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dustin Magill on 4/21/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. (Schonauer, Matthew)
May 20, 2016 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to APG Media of Ohio, LLC on 4/21/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. (Schonauer, Matthew)
April 21, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill. (pes)
April 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against APG Media of Ohio, LLC, Sarah Gillespie, Dustin Magill ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5467494), filed by Patricia Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form) (Schonauer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. APG Media of Ohio, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bennett
Represented By: Matthew James Schonauer
Represented By: Jeffrey S Standley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APG Media of Ohio, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Mueller
Represented By: Michael K Farrell
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Gillespie
Represented By: John Michael Mueller
Represented By: Michael K Farrell
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Magill
Represented By: John Michael Mueller
Represented By: Michael K Farrell
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?