Sahaj Hotel, Inc. v. Desai
Plaintiff: Sahaj Hotel, Inc.
Defendant: Ashish Desai
Thirdparty_defendant: Nishith Parikh, Smita Patel and Brijen Patel
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Ashish Desai
Case Number: 2:2016cv00408
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - This case is hereby dismissed per the parties settlement agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/21/2019. (cmw)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Special Master Brian Russell. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2018. (agm)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Pursuant to mediation before the Magistrate Judge, the parties have reported this case has settled. The Clerk is directed to vacate the Order Setting Trial Date and Settlement Conference 55 and the Order setting a hearing on the Motion to Appoint a Receiver 78 . All other motions are denied as moot. The parties shall file the appropriate dismissal within 60 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/27/2017. (dh1)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/6/2016. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahaj Hotel, Inc. v. Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahaj Hotel, Inc.
Represented By: Philomena S Ashdown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashish Desai
Represented By: Samir Dahman
Represented By: Heather R Zilka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Nishith Parikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Smita Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Brijen Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Ashish Desai
Represented By: Samir Dahman
Represented By: Heather R Zilka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?