Starkey v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Donald Starkey
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2016cv00525
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: LICKING
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS denying 11 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/19/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 8 in that 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution is GRANTED. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 2/13/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution and 5 MOTION for Expansion of Record Pursuant to Rule 7 filed by Donald Starkey in that it is RECOMMENDED that Respondent' s Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and this action be DISMISSED. It is also RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's Motion for Expansion of Record be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/27/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starkey v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?